Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2684725

EP2684725 - Bearing system for a drive system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  04.01.2018
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.10.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
16.10.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Schaeffler Technologies AG & Co. KG
Industriestrasse 1-3
91074 Herzogenaurach / DE
[2015/10]
Former [2014/12]For all designated states
Schaeffler Technologies GmbH & Co. KG
Industriestrasse 1-3
91074 Herzogenaurach / DE
Former [2014/03]For all designated states
Schaeffler Technologies AG & Co. KG
Industriestrasse 1-3
91074 Herzogenaurach / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Maienschein, Stephan
Röderswaldweg 22a
76534 Baden-Baden / DE
02 / Krause, Thorsten
Im Grün 57a
77815 Bühl / DE
 [2014/03]
Representative(s)DTS Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schnekenbühl und Partner mbB
Marstallstrasse 8
80539 München / DE
[N/P]
Application number, filing date13172603.619.06.2013
[2014/03]
Priority number, dateDE20121021200010.07.2012         Original published format: DE102012212000
[2014/03]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2684725
Date:15.01.2014
Language:DE
[2014/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2684725
Date:22.10.2014
Language:DE
[2014/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:B60K17/02, F16H41/24
[2014/03]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/03]
TitleGerman:Lagerungssystem für ein Antriebssystem[2014/03]
English:Bearing system for a drive system[2014/03]
French:Système de logement pour un système d'entraînement[2014/03]
Examination procedure19.06.2013Examination requested  [2014/03]
09.05.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.07.2014Fee for grant paid
24.07.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
24.07.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.05.2014
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  15.04.2015  27.04.2015  ADMISSIBLE
ZF Friedrichshafen AG
Graf-von-Soden-Platz 1
88046 Friedrichshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
Ruttensperger Lachnit Trossin Gomoll
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
PartG mbB
Arnulfstraße 58
80335 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2017/12]
Opponent(s)01  15.04.2015  27.04.2015  ADMISSIBLE
ZF Friedrichshafen AG
Graf-von-Soden-Platz 1
88046 Friedrichshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
RLTG
Ruttensperger Lachnit Trossin Gomoll
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arnulfstraße 58
80335 München / DE
Former [2015/22]
Opponent(s)01  15.04.2015   
ZF Friedrichshafen AG
Graf-von-Soden-Platz 1
88046 Friedrichshafen / DE
28.08.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
29.02.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
06.12.2017Date of oral proceedings
05.01.2018Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
05.01.2018Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition14.02.2018Appeal received No.  T0469/18
02.05.2018Statement of grounds filed
12.11.2020Date of oral proceedings
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU19.06.2013
AL22.10.2014
BG22.10.2014
CY22.10.2014
CZ22.10.2014
DK22.10.2014
EE22.10.2014
ES22.10.2014
FI22.10.2014
HR22.10.2014
IT22.10.2014
LT22.10.2014
LV22.10.2014
MC22.10.2014
MK22.10.2014
MT22.10.2014
NL22.10.2014
PL22.10.2014
RO22.10.2014
RS22.10.2014
SE22.10.2014
SI22.10.2014
SK22.10.2014
SM22.10.2014
TR22.10.2014
NO22.01.2015
GR23.01.2015
IS22.02.2015
PT23.02.2015
IE19.06.2015
LU19.06.2015
BE30.06.2015
FR30.06.2015
CH30.06.2016
LI30.06.2016
GB19.06.2017
[2018/46]
Former [2018/29]HU19.06.2013
BG22.10.2014
CY22.10.2014
CZ22.10.2014
DK22.10.2014
EE22.10.2014
ES22.10.2014
FI22.10.2014
HR22.10.2014
IT22.10.2014
LT22.10.2014
LV22.10.2014
MC22.10.2014
MK22.10.2014
MT22.10.2014
NL22.10.2014
PL22.10.2014
RO22.10.2014
RS22.10.2014
SE22.10.2014
SI22.10.2014
SK22.10.2014
SM22.10.2014
TR22.10.2014
NO22.01.2015
GR23.01.2015
IS22.02.2015
PT23.02.2015
IE19.06.2015
LU19.06.2015
BE30.06.2015
FR30.06.2015
CH30.06.2016
LI30.06.2016
GB19.06.2017
Former [2018/21]HU19.06.2013
BG22.10.2014
CY22.10.2014
CZ22.10.2014
DK22.10.2014
EE22.10.2014
ES22.10.2014
FI22.10.2014
HR22.10.2014
IT22.10.2014
LT22.10.2014
LV22.10.2014
MC22.10.2014
MT22.10.2014
NL22.10.2014
PL22.10.2014
RO22.10.2014
RS22.10.2014
SE22.10.2014
SI22.10.2014
SK22.10.2014
TR22.10.2014
NO22.01.2015
GR23.01.2015
IS22.02.2015
PT23.02.2015
IE19.06.2015
LU19.06.2015
BE30.06.2015
FR30.06.2015
CH30.06.2016
LI30.06.2016
GB19.06.2017
Former [2017/39]HU19.06.2013
BG22.10.2014
CY22.10.2014
CZ22.10.2014
DK22.10.2014
EE22.10.2014
ES22.10.2014
FI22.10.2014
HR22.10.2014
IT22.10.2014
LT22.10.2014
LV22.10.2014
MC22.10.2014
MT22.10.2014
NL22.10.2014
PL22.10.2014
RO22.10.2014
RS22.10.2014
SE22.10.2014
SI22.10.2014
SK22.10.2014
TR22.10.2014
NO22.01.2015
GR23.01.2015
IS22.02.2015
PT23.02.2015
IE19.06.2015
LU19.06.2015
BE30.06.2015
FR30.06.2015
CH30.06.2016
LI30.06.2016
Former [2017/25]BG22.10.2014
CY22.10.2014
CZ22.10.2014
DK22.10.2014
EE22.10.2014
ES22.10.2014
FI22.10.2014
HR22.10.2014
IT22.10.2014
LT22.10.2014
LV22.10.2014
MC22.10.2014
MT22.10.2014
NL22.10.2014
PL22.10.2014
RO22.10.2014
RS22.10.2014
SE22.10.2014
SI22.10.2014
SK22.10.2014
NO22.01.2015
GR23.01.2015
IS22.02.2015
PT23.02.2015
IE19.06.2015
LU19.06.2015
FR30.06.2015
CH30.06.2016
LI30.06.2016
Former [2017/03]CY22.10.2014
CZ22.10.2014
DK22.10.2014
EE22.10.2014
ES22.10.2014
FI22.10.2014
HR22.10.2014
IT22.10.2014
LT22.10.2014
LV22.10.2014
MC22.10.2014
MT22.10.2014
NL22.10.2014
PL22.10.2014
RO22.10.2014
RS22.10.2014
SE22.10.2014
SI22.10.2014
SK22.10.2014
NO22.01.2015
GR23.01.2015
IS22.02.2015
PT23.02.2015
IE19.06.2015
LU19.06.2015
FR30.06.2015
Former [2016/25]CY22.10.2014
CZ22.10.2014
DK22.10.2014
EE22.10.2014
ES22.10.2014
FI22.10.2014
HR22.10.2014
IT22.10.2014
LT22.10.2014
LV22.10.2014
MC22.10.2014
NL22.10.2014
PL22.10.2014
RO22.10.2014
RS22.10.2014
SE22.10.2014
SI22.10.2014
SK22.10.2014
NO22.01.2015
GR23.01.2015
IS22.02.2015
PT23.02.2015
IE19.06.2015
LU19.06.2015
FR30.06.2015
Former [2016/20]CY22.10.2014
CZ22.10.2014
DK22.10.2014
EE22.10.2014
ES22.10.2014
FI22.10.2014
HR22.10.2014
IT22.10.2014
LT22.10.2014
LV22.10.2014
MC22.10.2014
NL22.10.2014
PL22.10.2014
RO22.10.2014
RS22.10.2014
SE22.10.2014
SI22.10.2014
SK22.10.2014
NO22.01.2015
GR23.01.2015
IS22.02.2015
PT23.02.2015
IE19.06.2015
LU19.06.2015
Former [2016/11]CY22.10.2014
CZ22.10.2014
DK22.10.2014
EE22.10.2014
ES22.10.2014
FI22.10.2014
HR22.10.2014
IT22.10.2014
LT22.10.2014
LV22.10.2014
MC22.10.2014
NL22.10.2014
PL22.10.2014
RO22.10.2014
RS22.10.2014
SE22.10.2014
SI22.10.2014
SK22.10.2014
NO22.01.2015
GR23.01.2015
IS22.02.2015
PT23.02.2015
LU19.06.2015
Former [2016/09]CY22.10.2014
CZ22.10.2014
DK22.10.2014
EE22.10.2014
ES22.10.2014
FI22.10.2014
HR22.10.2014
IT22.10.2014
LT22.10.2014
LV22.10.2014
MC22.10.2014
NL22.10.2014
PL22.10.2014
RO22.10.2014
RS22.10.2014
SE22.10.2014
SK22.10.2014
NO22.01.2015
GR23.01.2015
IS22.02.2015
PT23.02.2015
Former [2015/37]CY22.10.2014
CZ22.10.2014
DK22.10.2014
EE22.10.2014
ES22.10.2014
FI22.10.2014
HR22.10.2014
IT22.10.2014
LT22.10.2014
LV22.10.2014
NL22.10.2014
PL22.10.2014
RO22.10.2014
RS22.10.2014
SE22.10.2014
SK22.10.2014
NO22.01.2015
GR23.01.2015
IS22.02.2015
PT23.02.2015
Former [2015/36]CY22.10.2014
CZ22.10.2014
DK22.10.2014
EE22.10.2014
ES22.10.2014
FI22.10.2014
HR22.10.2014
LT22.10.2014
LV22.10.2014
NL22.10.2014
PL22.10.2014
RO22.10.2014
RS22.10.2014
SE22.10.2014
NO22.01.2015
GR23.01.2015
IS22.02.2015
PT23.02.2015
Former [2015/35]CY22.10.2014
DK22.10.2014
EE22.10.2014
ES22.10.2014
FI22.10.2014
HR22.10.2014
LT22.10.2014
LV22.10.2014
NL22.10.2014
PL22.10.2014
RS22.10.2014
SE22.10.2014
NO22.01.2015
GR23.01.2015
IS22.02.2015
PT23.02.2015
Former [2015/26]CY22.10.2014
ES22.10.2014
FI22.10.2014
HR22.10.2014
LT22.10.2014
LV22.10.2014
NL22.10.2014
PL22.10.2014
RS22.10.2014
SE22.10.2014
NO22.01.2015
GR23.01.2015
IS22.02.2015
PT23.02.2015
Former [2015/24]ES22.10.2014
FI22.10.2014
HR22.10.2014
LT22.10.2014
LV22.10.2014
NL22.10.2014
PL22.10.2014
RS22.10.2014
SE22.10.2014
NO22.01.2015
GR23.01.2015
IS22.02.2015
PT23.02.2015
Former [2015/23]ES22.10.2014
FI22.10.2014
LT22.10.2014
NL22.10.2014
NO22.01.2015
IS22.02.2015
PT23.02.2015
Former [2015/22]LT22.10.2014
NO22.01.2015
PT23.02.2015
Former [2015/21]LT22.10.2014
NO22.01.2015
Former [2015/20]LT22.10.2014
Documents cited:Search[A]DE4036270  (AISIN AW CO [JP]) [A] 1 * figure 1 *;
 [A]US6408718  (NOGLE THOMAS D [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2807799  (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5267488  (HARDEMAN MICHAEL L [US] ET AL) [A] 1 * the whole document *