Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2816386

EP2816386 - Method of sticking an optical element to a base body [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.01.2019
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  25.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip18.01.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 20.02.2019  [2019/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TRUMPF Schweiz AG
Trumpf Strasse 8
7214 Grüsch / CH
[2018/16]
Former [2014/52]For all designated states
Trumpf Laser Marking Systems AG
Ausserfeld
7214 Grüsch / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Sipma, Henrik
Quadera 65D
7235 Fideris / CH
 [2014/52]
Representative(s)Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Gropiusplatz 10
70563 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/52]Kohler Schmid Möbus
Patentanwälte Ruppmannstraße 27
70565 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date13172697.819.06.2013
[2014/52]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2816386
Date:24.12.2014
Language:DE
[2014/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.10.2013
ClassificationInternational:G02B7/00
[2014/52]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/31]
Former [2014/52]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Ankleben eines Optikelements an einen Grundkörper[2014/52]
English:Method of sticking an optical element to a base body[2014/52]
French:Procédé de collage d'un élément optique à un corps de base[2014/52]
Examination procedure18.06.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.06.2015Examination requested  [2015/31]
29.11.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.03.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.05.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.09.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/08]
16.10.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2019/08]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.11.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
22.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
27.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
27.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2006280221  (SEITEL STEVEN C [US]) [X] 1,2,8-10,12 * paragraphs [0031] - [0034]; figure 1 * [I] 3-7,11;
 [AD]US6320706  (RICHARD DEREK J [US], et al) [AD] 1-12 * the whole document *
by applicantUS6320706