Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2816851

EP2816851 - ARCHITECTURE AND METHOD TO 4G-MOBILE POSITIONING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.08.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BlackBerry Limited
2200 University Avenue East
Waterloo, ON N2K 0A7 / CA
[2014/52]
Inventor(s)01 / Bani Hani, Mohammad Shafiq
2550 W. Golf Road
Ext. 65767
Rolling Meadows, Illinois 60008 / US
02 / Sheynman, Arnold
2550 W. Golf Road
Ext. 65647
Rolling Meadows, Illinois 60008 / US
03 / Bernhardt, Bruce Allen
2550 W. Golf Road
Ext. 65658
Rolling Meadows, Illinois 60008 / US
 [2014/52]
Representative(s)Fennell, Gareth Charles , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/52]Fennell, Gareth Charles , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date13172820.619.06.2013
[2014/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2816851
Date:24.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2816851
Date:28.09.2016
Language:EN
[2016/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.12.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04W64/00
[2014/52]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/52]
TitleGerman:Architektur und Verfahren zur mobilen 4G-Positionierung[2014/52]
English:ARCHITECTURE AND METHOD TO 4G-MOBILE POSITIONING[2014/52]
French:Architecture et procédé permettant un positionnement 4g-mobile[2014/52]
Examination procedure19.06.2013Examination requested  [2014/52]
17.08.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.12.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.04.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.08.2016Fee for grant paid
15.08.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.08.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.08.2015
Opposition(s)29.06.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU19.06.2013
AL28.09.2016
AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
IT28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
MC28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SI28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
IE19.06.2017
LU19.06.2017
MT19.06.2017
[2019/31]
Former [2018/47]AL28.09.2016
AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
IT28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
MC28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SI28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
IE19.06.2017
LU19.06.2017
MT19.06.2017
Former [2018/43]AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
IT28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
MC28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SI28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
IE19.06.2017
LU19.06.2017
MT19.06.2017
Former [2018/21]AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
IT28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
MC28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SI28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
LU19.06.2017
Former [2018/11]AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
IT28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
MC28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SI28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
Former [2017/52]AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
IT28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SI28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
Former [2017/34]AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
IT28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
Former [2017/32]AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
IT28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
Former [2017/13]FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
Former [2017/11]FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
Former [2017/10]FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
NO28.12.2016
Former [2017/09]FI28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
NO28.12.2016
Former [2017/07]LT28.09.2016
Documents cited:Search[A]US6564064  (CIGANER ANN [US] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * column 2, lines 15-24 * * column 3, lines 25-39 * * column 4, lines 6-39 *;
 [A]EP2200384  (NANOTRON TECHNOLOGIES GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0014] - [0024] *;
 [A]US2011285589  (BULL JEFFREY F [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0038] - [0043] *;
 [A]US2012264450  (KANGAS ARI [SE] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0030] - [0035] - [0050] - [0059] *