Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2818434

EP2818434 - Conveyor device and a method for positioning a holding adapter on a conveyor chain [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2015/01]Push chain member of a conveyor chain, conveyor chain, conveyor device and a method for positioning a holding adapter on a conveyor chain
[2018/18]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.06.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  13.07.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  12.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SI
published on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dematic Logistics GmbH
Schelpmilser Weg 20
33609 Bielefeld / DE
[2018/26]
Former [2015/14]For all designated states
SDI Group Germany Material Handling Solutions GmbH
Schelpmilserweg 14 b
33609 Bielefeld / DE
Former [2015/01]For all designated states
Otto, Thomas
Sennehof 13a
33659 Bielefeld / DE
Inventor(s)01 / OTTO Thomas
Sennehof 13a
33659 Bielefeld / DE
 [2015/14]
Former [2015/01]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2018/33]
Former [2015/01]Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
Application number, filing date13173419.624.06.2013
[2015/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2818434
Date:31.12.2014
Language:DE
[2015/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2818434
Date:15.08.2018
Language:DE
[2018/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.11.2013
ClassificationInternational:B65G19/02, B65G19/20, B65G19/22, B61B10/02
[2015/01]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/33]
Former [2015/01]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Fördervorrichtung und Verfahren zur Positionierung eines Halteadapters an einer Förderkette[2018/18]
English:Conveyor device and a method for positioning a holding adapter on a conveyor chain[2018/18]
French:Dispositif de transport et procédé de positionnement d'un adaptateur de support au niveau d'une chaîne de transport[2018/18]
Former [2015/01]Schubkettenglied einer Förderkette, Förderkette, Fördervorrichtung und Verfahren zur Positionierung eines Halteadapters an einer Förderkette
Former [2015/01]Push chain member of a conveyor chain, conveyor chain, conveyor device and a method for positioning a holding adapter on a conveyor chain
Former [2015/01]Elément de chaîne de poussée d'une chaîne de transport, chaîne de transport, dispositif de transport et procédé de positionnement d'un adaptateur de support au niveau d'une chaîne de transport
Examination procedure30.06.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.06.2015Examination requested  [2015/33]
13.04.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.07.2018Fee for grant paid
09.07.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
09.07.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.04.2018
Opposition(s)16.05.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
22.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
25.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL15.08.2018
CZ15.08.2018
DK15.08.2018
EE15.08.2018
FI15.08.2018
HR15.08.2018
LT15.08.2018
LV15.08.2018
PL15.08.2018
RO15.08.2018
RS15.08.2018
SE15.08.2018
SI15.08.2018
SK15.08.2018
SM15.08.2018
BG15.11.2018
NO15.11.2018
GR16.11.2018
IS15.12.2018
[2019/37]
Former [2019/26]AL15.08.2018
CZ15.08.2018
DK15.08.2018
EE15.08.2018
FI15.08.2018
HR15.08.2018
LT15.08.2018
LV15.08.2018
PL15.08.2018
RO15.08.2018
RS15.08.2018
SE15.08.2018
SK15.08.2018
SM15.08.2018
BG15.11.2018
NO15.11.2018
GR16.11.2018
IS15.12.2018
Former [2019/24]AL15.08.2018
CZ15.08.2018
EE15.08.2018
FI15.08.2018
HR15.08.2018
LT15.08.2018
LV15.08.2018
PL15.08.2018
RO15.08.2018
RS15.08.2018
SE15.08.2018
SK15.08.2018
BG15.11.2018
NO15.11.2018
GR16.11.2018
IS15.12.2018
Former [2019/22]AL15.08.2018
CZ15.08.2018
FI15.08.2018
HR15.08.2018
LT15.08.2018
LV15.08.2018
PL15.08.2018
RO15.08.2018
RS15.08.2018
SE15.08.2018
BG15.11.2018
NO15.11.2018
GR16.11.2018
IS15.12.2018
Former [2019/12]AL15.08.2018
FI15.08.2018
HR15.08.2018
LT15.08.2018
LV15.08.2018
RS15.08.2018
SE15.08.2018
BG15.11.2018
NO15.11.2018
GR16.11.2018
IS15.12.2018
Former [2019/11]FI15.08.2018
HR15.08.2018
LT15.08.2018
RS15.08.2018
SE15.08.2018
BG15.11.2018
NO15.11.2018
GR16.11.2018
IS15.12.2018
Former [2019/10]FI15.08.2018
LT15.08.2018
RS15.08.2018
SE15.08.2018
BG15.11.2018
NO15.11.2018
GR16.11.2018
IS15.12.2018
Former [2019/08]FI15.08.2018
LT15.08.2018
NO15.11.2018
IS15.12.2018
Former [2019/07]LT15.08.2018
Documents cited:Search[XI]US5507233  (KWON O-WON [KR] ET AL) [X] 1,5,7 * column 2, line 30 - line 34; figures 4a,8 * [I] 2-4,6;
 [XI]FR2028030  (TAYLOR ET GASKIN) [X] 1,5,7 * page 4, line 3 - line 12; figure 2 * [I] 2-4,6;
 [A]US4292897  (WAKABAYASHI TAKAO) [A] 1,5,8,9 * abstract *
by applicantDE102010053426