Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2767629

EP2767629 - Laundry machine and control method of the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.11.2016
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
128 Yeoui-daero
Yeongdeungpo-Gu
Seoul 150-721 / KR
[2015/49]
Former [2014/34]For all designated states
LG Electronics, Inc.
20, Yeouido-dong Yeoungdeungpo-gu
Seoul, 150-721 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Kim Heunggi
LG Electronics Inc. IP Group, 391-2
Gaeumjeong-dong, Changwon-si
641-711 Gyeongnam / KR
02 / Kim, Jaemun
LG Electronics Inc. IP Group, 391-2
Gaeumjeong-dong, Changwon-si
641-711 Gyeongnam / KR
03 / Lee, Kilryong
LG Electronics Inc. IP Group, 391-2
Gaeumjeong-dong, Changwon-si
641-711 Gyeongnam / KR
04 / Jung, Chanwoo
LG Electronics Inc. IP Group, 391-2
Gaeumjeong-dong, Changwon-si
641-711 Gyeongnam / KR
 [2014/34]
Representative(s)Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Nymphenburger Straße 4
80335 München / DE
[2016/03]
Former [2014/34]Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte
Mauerkircherstrasse 45
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date13173516.925.06.2013
[2014/34]
Priority number, dateKR2013001537613.02.2013         Original published format: KR 20130015376
KR2013001537713.02.2013         Original published format: KR 20130015377
[2014/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2767629
Date:20.08.2014
Language:EN
[2014/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2767629
Date:20.01.2016
Language:EN
[2016/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.11.2013
ClassificationInternational:D06F39/00, D06F39/08, D06F39/04, D06F58/20, D06F33/02
[2015/32]
Former International [2014/34]D06F39/00, D06F39/08, // D06F33/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/34]
TitleGerman:Waschmaschine und Steuerungsverfahren dafür[2014/34]
English:Laundry machine and control method of the same[2014/34]
French:Machine de traitement du linge et son procédé de commande[2014/34]
Examination procedure31.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/34]
10.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.09.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.11.2015Fee for grant paid
20.11.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
20.11.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.09.2015
Opposition(s)21.10.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU25.06.2013
AL20.01.2016
AT20.01.2016
BE20.01.2016
CY20.01.2016
CZ20.01.2016
DK20.01.2016
EE20.01.2016
FI20.01.2016
HR20.01.2016
LT20.01.2016
LV20.01.2016
MC20.01.2016
MK20.01.2016
RO20.01.2016
RS20.01.2016
SE20.01.2016
SI20.01.2016
SK20.01.2016
SM20.01.2016
BG20.04.2016
NO20.04.2016
GR21.04.2016
IS20.05.2016
PT20.05.2016
IE25.06.2016
LU25.06.2016
CH30.06.2016
LI30.06.2016
MT30.06.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/32]HU25.06.2013
AT20.01.2016
BE20.01.2016
CY20.01.2016
CZ20.01.2016
DK20.01.2016
EE20.01.2016
FI20.01.2016
HR20.01.2016
LT20.01.2016
LV20.01.2016
MC20.01.2016
MK20.01.2016
RO20.01.2016
RS20.01.2016
SE20.01.2016
SI20.01.2016
SK20.01.2016
SM20.01.2016
BG20.04.2016
NO20.04.2016
GR21.04.2016
IS20.05.2016
PT20.05.2016
IE25.06.2016
LU25.06.2016
CH30.06.2016
LI30.06.2016
MT30.06.2016
Former [2018/28]HU25.06.2013
AT20.01.2016
BE20.01.2016
CZ20.01.2016
DK20.01.2016
EE20.01.2016
FI20.01.2016
HR20.01.2016
LT20.01.2016
LV20.01.2016
MC20.01.2016
MK20.01.2016
RO20.01.2016
RS20.01.2016
SE20.01.2016
SI20.01.2016
SK20.01.2016
SM20.01.2016
BG20.04.2016
NO20.04.2016
GR21.04.2016
IS20.05.2016
PT20.05.2016
IE25.06.2016
CH30.06.2016
LI30.06.2016
Former [2017/25]AT20.01.2016
BE20.01.2016
CZ20.01.2016
DK20.01.2016
EE20.01.2016
FI20.01.2016
HR20.01.2016
LT20.01.2016
LV20.01.2016
MC20.01.2016
RO20.01.2016
RS20.01.2016
SE20.01.2016
SI20.01.2016
SK20.01.2016
SM20.01.2016
BG20.04.2016
NO20.04.2016
GR21.04.2016
IS20.05.2016
PT20.05.2016
IE25.06.2016
CH30.06.2016
LI30.06.2016
Former [2017/19]AT20.01.2016
BE20.01.2016
CZ20.01.2016
DK20.01.2016
EE20.01.2016
FI20.01.2016
HR20.01.2016
LT20.01.2016
LV20.01.2016
MC20.01.2016
RO20.01.2016
RS20.01.2016
SE20.01.2016
SI20.01.2016
SK20.01.2016
SM20.01.2016
BG20.04.2016
NO20.04.2016
GR21.04.2016
IS20.05.2016
PT20.05.2016
CH30.06.2016
LI30.06.2016
Former [2017/16]AT20.01.2016
BE20.01.2016
CZ20.01.2016
DK20.01.2016
EE20.01.2016
FI20.01.2016
HR20.01.2016
LT20.01.2016
LV20.01.2016
MC20.01.2016
RO20.01.2016
RS20.01.2016
SE20.01.2016
SI20.01.2016
SK20.01.2016
SM20.01.2016
BG20.04.2016
NO20.04.2016
GR21.04.2016
IS20.05.2016
PT20.05.2016
Former [2017/07]AT20.01.2016
BE20.01.2016
CZ20.01.2016
DK20.01.2016
EE20.01.2016
FI20.01.2016
HR20.01.2016
LT20.01.2016
LV20.01.2016
MC20.01.2016
RO20.01.2016
RS20.01.2016
SE20.01.2016
SK20.01.2016
SM20.01.2016
NO20.04.2016
GR21.04.2016
IS20.05.2016
PT20.05.2016
Former [2017/03]AT20.01.2016
BE20.01.2016
CZ20.01.2016
DK20.01.2016
EE20.01.2016
FI20.01.2016
HR20.01.2016
LT20.01.2016
LV20.01.2016
RO20.01.2016
RS20.01.2016
SE20.01.2016
SK20.01.2016
SM20.01.2016
NO20.04.2016
GR21.04.2016
IS20.05.2016
PT20.05.2016
Former [2016/50]AT20.01.2016
CZ20.01.2016
DK20.01.2016
EE20.01.2016
FI20.01.2016
HR20.01.2016
LT20.01.2016
LV20.01.2016
RO20.01.2016
RS20.01.2016
SE20.01.2016
SK20.01.2016
SM20.01.2016
NO20.04.2016
GR21.04.2016
IS20.05.2016
PT20.05.2016
Former [2016/49]AT20.01.2016
DK20.01.2016
EE20.01.2016
FI20.01.2016
HR20.01.2016
LT20.01.2016
LV20.01.2016
RS20.01.2016
SE20.01.2016
NO20.04.2016
GR21.04.2016
IS20.05.2016
PT20.05.2016
Former [2016/46]AT20.01.2016
DK20.01.2016
FI20.01.2016
HR20.01.2016
LT20.01.2016
LV20.01.2016
RS20.01.2016
SE20.01.2016
NO20.04.2016
GR21.04.2016
IS20.05.2016
PT20.05.2016
Former [2016/39]AT20.01.2016
FI20.01.2016
HR20.01.2016
LT20.01.2016
LV20.01.2016
RS20.01.2016
SE20.01.2016
NO20.04.2016
GR21.04.2016
IS20.05.2016
PT20.05.2016
Former [2016/38]AT20.01.2016
FI20.01.2016
HR20.01.2016
LT20.01.2016
NO20.04.2016
GR21.04.2016
IS20.05.2016
PT20.05.2016
Former [2016/36]AT20.01.2016
FI20.01.2016
HR20.01.2016
LT20.01.2016
NO20.04.2016
GR21.04.2016
Former [2016/35]FI20.01.2016
HR20.01.2016
NO20.04.2016
GR21.04.2016
Documents cited:Search[XYI]EP1275767  (V ZUG AG [CH]) [X] 1,5-10,12,13 * paragraphs [0009] - [0022] * * figure 1 * [Y] 3,4 [I] 11,14,15;
 [X]EP2341176  (ELECTROLUX HOME PROD CORP [BE]) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0015] * * paragraphs [0022] - [0028] * * paragraph [0035] * * figures 1-2 *;
 [Y]EP1505193  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 3,4 * paragraphs [0006] , [0 17] * * figure 1 *;
 [A]WO2006129912  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *