Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2818133

EP2818133 - A device for dispensing dental material [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.12.2015
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.12.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.01.2016  [2016/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
3M Innovative Properties Company
3M Center
Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
[2015/01]
Inventor(s)01 / Maurer, Andreas
Weideweg 4
86863 Langenneufnach / DE
02 / Pauser, Helmut
Am Forellenbach 5
86911 Diessen am Ammersee / DE
 [2015/01]
Representative(s)Hohmann, Arno
3M Deutschland GmbH
Office of Intellectual Property Counsel
ESPE Platz
82229 Seefeld / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/01]Hohmann, Arno
3M Deutschland GmbH
Office of Intellectual Property Counsel
Espe Platz
82229 Seefeld / DE
Application number, filing date13173811.426.06.2013
[2015/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2818133
Date:31.12.2014
Language:EN
[2015/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.11.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61C5/06, A61C9/00
[2015/01]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/01]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Ausgabe von Dentalmaterial[2015/01]
English:A device for dispensing dental material[2015/01]
French:Dispositif pour la distribution de matériau dentaire[2015/01]
Examination procedure26.06.2013Examination requested  [2015/01]
01.07.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/01]
18.08.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2016/01]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201503   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[IY]US2012064482  (BOEHM ANDREAS JOHANNES [DE] ET AL) [I] 1-5,7,11-14 * paragraphs [0054] - [0094] * * figures 1-19 * [Y] 6,8-10;
 [Y]EP2133038  (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [Y] 6 * paragraphs [0045] - [0068] * * figures 1-10 *;
 [YDA]WO2007104037  (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]; BROYLES BRUCE R [US]; PEUKER MARC [D) [YD] 8-10 * pages 18-28 * * figures 1-31 * [A] 1-7,11-14;
 [A]GB2490365  (VENTON JAMES FRANCIS [GB]) [A] 1-14 * pages 4-9 * * figures 1-5 *;
 [A]US2003147688  (HATHAWAY CLARENCE EDUARD [US]) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0023] - [0032] * * figures 1-4b *;
 [A]DE628404  (MAX E ROCK) [A] 1-14 * pages 1-2 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]US2002023892  (SAVITZ STEVEN ROBERT [US] ET AL) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0021] - [0033] * * figures 1-8 *;
 [A]EP0157121  (ESPE PHARM PRAEP [DE]) [A] 1-14 * pages 6-11 * * figures 1-5 *
by applicantWO2007104037
 WO2010123800