Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2818887

EP2818887 - A radar transceiver [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  11.08.2017
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  17.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip11.08.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.09.2017  [2017/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NXP B.V.
High Tech Campus 60
5656 AG Eindhoven / NL
[2015/01]
Inventor(s)01 / Vaucher, Cicero Silveira
c/o NXP Semiconductors
Red Central
60 High Street
Redhill, Surrey RH1 1SH / GB
02 / Gehrels, Kees
c/o NXP Semiconductors
Red Central
60 High Street
Redhill, Surrey RH1 1SH / GB
 [2015/01]
Representative(s)Lee, Candice Jane
NXP SEMICONDUCTORS
Intellectual Property Group
Abbey House
25 Clarendon Road
Redhill, Surrey RH1 1QZ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/01]Crawford, Andrew
NXP B.V.
Intellectual Property & Licensing
Red Central
60 High Street
Redhill, Surrey RH1 1SH / GB
Application number, filing date13173852.826.06.2013
[2015/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2818887
Date:31.12.2014
Language:EN
[2015/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.11.2013
ClassificationInternational:G01S7/35, // G01S13/93
[2015/01]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/33]
Former [2015/01]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Radartransceiver[2015/01]
English:A radar transceiver[2015/01]
French:Émetteur-récepteur radar[2015/01]
Examination procedure11.03.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.03.2014Examination requested  [2015/01]
05.10.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.04.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/37]
10.05.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2017/37]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.10.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
30.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
30.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2011304500  (HIMMELSTOSS ARMIN [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,10-13,15 * the whole document * [I] 4-9,14;
 [A]DE102004051276  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0020]; figures 2,4 *;
 [A]US2011122014  (SZAJNOWSKI WIESLAW JERZY [GB]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0118] - paragraph [0162]; figure 7 *;
 [A]  - LINUS MAURER ET AL, "77 GHz SiGe based bipolar transceivers for automotive radar applications â An industrial perspective", NEW CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS CONFERENCE (NEWCAS), 2011 IEEE 9TH INTERNATIONAL, IEEE, (20110626), doi:10.1109/NEWCAS.2011.5981304, ISBN 978-1-61284-135-9, pages 257 - 260, XP031926311 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/NEWCAS.2011.5981304
 [A]  - SAUNDERS D ET AL, "A single-chip 24 GHz SiGe BiCMOS transceiver for FMCW automotive radars", RADIO FREQUENCY INTEGRATED CIRCUITS SYMPOSIUM, 2009. RFIC 2009. IEEE, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20090607), ISBN 978-1-4244-3377-3, pages 459 - 462, XP031480316 [A] 1-15 * sec. II,;; figure 1 *
 [A]  - JÜRGEN HASCH ET AL, "Millimeter-Wave Technology for Automotive Radar Sensors in the 77 GHz Frequency Band", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MICROWAVE THEORY AND TECHNIQUES, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20120301), vol. 60, no. 3, doi:10.1109/TMTT.2011.2178427, ISSN 0018-9480, pages 845 - 860, XP011428605 [A] 1-15 * figures 18,21, 23 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TMTT.2011.2178427
 [A]  - JRI LEE ET AL, "A Fully-Integrated 77-GHz FMCW Radar Transceiver in 65-nm CMOS Technology", IEEE JOURNAL OF SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS, (20101201), vol. 45, no. 12, doi:10.1109/JSSC.2010.2075250, ISSN 0018-9200, pages 2746 - 2756, XP055088008 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JSSC.2010.2075250
by applicantUS2012001791
    - REINHARD FEGER ET AL., "A 77-GHz FMCW MIMO Radar Based on an SiGe Single-Chip Transceiver", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MICROWAVE THEORY AND TECHNIQUES, (200905), pages 1020 - 1035, XP011255346