Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2645201

EP2645201 - Method, device and computer software product for controlling user interface of electronic device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  04.09.2014
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019Change - applicantpublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nokia Technologies Oy
Karakaari 7
02610 Espoo / FI
[2019/36]
Former [2015/32]For all designated states
Nokia Technologies Oy
Karaportti 3
02610 Espoo / FI
Former [2014/24]For all designated states
Nokia Corporation
Karakaari 7
02610 Espoo / FI
Former [2013/40]For all designated states
Nokia Corporation
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
Inventor(s)01 / Nurmi, Mikko
Atalankatu 7
33580 Tampere / FI
 [2013/40]
Representative(s)Kolster Oy Ab
(Salmisaarenaukio 1)
P.O. Box 204
00181 Helsinki / FI
[N/P]
Former [2013/40]Kolster Oy Ab
Iso Roobertinkatu 23
PO Box 148
00121 Helsinki / FI
Application number, filing date13173967.415.06.2006
[2013/40]
Priority number, dateFI2005000533020.06.2005         Original published format: FI 20055330
[2013/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2645201
Date:02.10.2013
Language:EN
[2013/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:G06F1/16, H04M1/02
[2013/40]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2013/40]
TitleGerman:Verfahren, Vorrichtung und Computersoftwareprodukt zur Steuerung der Benutzeroberfläche einer elektronischen Vorrichtung[2013/40]
English:Method, device and computer software product for controlling user interface of electronic device[2013/40]
French:Procédé, dispositif et produit logiciel informatique permettant de commander une interface utilisateur de dispositif électronique[2013/40]
Examination procedure28.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/19]
01.04.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.05.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.09.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.02.2015Date of oral proceedings
16.07.2015Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
16.07.2015Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination16.09.2015Appeal received No.  T2182/15
12.11.2015Statement of grounds filed
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP06764502.8  / EP1899787
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
27.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
27.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
27.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
27.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
10.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 10
10.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 11
16.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 12
12.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 13
13.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 14
Documents cited:Search[X]US2005083642  (SENPUKU TSUYOSHI [JP] ET AL) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0011] , [0013] , [0049] , [0111]; figures 3,6,7,15,17,19 *