Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2679444

EP2679444 - Multiple headlamp adjuster linkage [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  17.10.2014
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.05.2018New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Valeo Sylvania L.L.C.
1231 A Avenue North
Seymour, IN 47274 / US
[2014/01]
Inventor(s)01 / King, Robert Lee
213 Manor Court South
Seymour, Indiana 47274 / US
 [2014/01]
Representative(s)Schaffner, Jean
Valeo Vision
34, rue Saint-André
93012 Bobigny / FR
[N/P]
Former [2014/01]Viering, Jentschura & Partner
Am Brauhaus 8
01099 Dresden / DE
Application number, filing date13174317.128.06.2013
[2014/01]
Priority number, dateUS20121353723929.06.2012         Original published format: US201213537239
[2014/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2679444
Date:01.01.2014
Language:EN
[2014/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2679444
Date:30.04.2014
Language:EN
[2014/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.03.2014
ClassificationInternational:B60Q1/068
[2014/01]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/01]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Mehrfach-Scheinwerfer-Einstellverknüpfung[2014/01]
English:Multiple headlamp adjuster linkage[2014/01]
French:Liaison de réglage de phare multiples[2014/01]
Examination procedure10.10.2014Examination requested  [2014/47]
17.10.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
30.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
28.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]FR2410213  (CHRYSLER FRANCE [FR]) [X] 1,3-7,10 * page 3, lines 1-25 * * page 5, line 34 - page 6, line 6 * * figures 1-5 *;
 [XI]EP0081399  (DUCELLIER & CIE [FR]) [X] 11,12 * page 1, lines 1-5 * * page 2, line 10 - page 4, line 22 * * figures 1-6 * [I] 1,2,4-7,9,10;
 [A]WO2011045358  (HELLA KGAA HUECK & CO [DE], et al) [A] 1-12 * page 5, paragraph 6 - page 9, paragraph 3 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US2008266890  (MOCHIZUKI MITSUYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,4,7,10,11 * paragraphs [0038] - [0106]; figures 1,3,11-16 *;
 [A]GB2041188  (CIBIE PROJECTEURS) [A] 1,3-6,11,12 * page 2, line 119 - page 3, line 26; figures 3,4 *;
 [A]DE10003929  (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE102009033910  (AUTOMOTIVE LIGHTING REUTLINGEN [DE]) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0001] , [0003] , [0007] , [0009] , [0012] , [0015] , [0016] , [0032] , [0033] , [0039] - [0042]; figures 1-7 *
by applicantUS7975974
 US5530629
 US5260857