EP2819274 - Movable rotor package [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.11.2015 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.12.2015 [2015/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HILTI Aktiengesellschaft Feldkircherstrasse 100 9494 Schaan / LI | [2015/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mahler, Thomas Breesener Strasse 4 18299 Laage / DE | [2015/01] | Representative(s) | Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Corporate Intellectual Property Feldkircherstrasse 100 Postfach 333 9494 Schaan / LI | [2015/01] | Application number, filing date | 13174332.0 | 28.06.2013 | [2015/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2819274 | Date: | 31.12.2014 | Language: | DE | [2015/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H02K1/06, H02K15/02 | [2015/01] | CPC: |
H02K15/02 (EP);
H02K1/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verschiebliches Rotorpaket | [2015/01] | English: | Movable rotor package | [2015/01] | French: | Paquet rotorique déplaçable | [2015/01] | Examination procedure | 28.06.2013 | Examination requested [2015/01] | 01.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/53] | 10.08.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/53] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2015 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]EP0898354 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1,2,6-8 * the whole document * [A] 5 [Y] 3,4; | [XA]EP1617542 (MITSUI HIGH TEC [JP]) [X] 1,2,6,7 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0049]; figures 1, 2, 5, 6 * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0100] * [A] 3-5; | [XA]DE3408563 (KIENLE & SPIESS STANZ & DRUCK [DE]) [X] 1,2,6 * pages 7-16; figures 1-4 * [A] 3-5,7,8; | [YA]US3802068 (SCOTT R) [Y] 3,4 * the whole document * [A] 1,2,5-8; | [A]EP1850457 (SUNTECH GENERATOR CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE102007047715 |