Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2821032

EP2821032 - Variable mesh pharyngeal stent [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.04.2015
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.04.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 20.05.2015  [2015/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Otorino
Rue Rombaut 80
1410 Waterloo / BE
[2015/02]
Inventor(s)01 / Nawara, Gregory
Rue Rombaut, 80
1410 Waterloo / BE
 [2015/02]
Representative(s)Decamps, Alain René François , et al
Office Kirkpatrick S.A.
Avenue Wolfers, 32
1310 La Hulpe / BE
[2015/02]
Application number, filing date13174949.103.07.2013
[2015/02]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2821032
Date:07.01.2015
Language:FR
[2015/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.12.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/20
[2015/02]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/02]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Rachenstent mit variabler Maschenweite[2015/02]
English:Variable mesh pharyngeal stent[2015/02]
French:Stent pharyngé à maillage variable[2015/02]
Examination procedure14.02.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.06.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.06.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
deletedDeletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/02]
14.02.2014Examination requested  [2015/02]
06.08.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.12.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/21]
13.01.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2015/21]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.06.2014
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP1514525  (MAHLO HANS-WOLFGANG DR MED [DE]) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0014] - [0018]; figures 1-4 * [I] 4-11;
 [XI]WO2004103223  (CLEVELAND CLINIC FOUNDATION [US]) [X] 1-9,11 * page 13, line 5 - page 21, line 14; figures 1-3,5-14 * [I] 10;
 [XI]WO2009079418  (SINEXUS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-4,9-11 * paragraphs [0065] - [0067] - [0198]; figures 4A-4C,15 * [I] 5-8;
 [AD]US2010024830  (ROUSSEAU ROBERT A [US], et al) [AD] 1,11 * paragraphs [0071] - [0078]; figures 4A-4C *
by applicantEP1585468
 EP0408245