EP2821409 - Metal alkylidene complexes comprising an unsymmetrical unsaturated NHC ligand [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.11.2015 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.12.2015 [2015/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique (C.N.R.S.) 3 rue Michel-Ange 75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | For all designated states Ecole Nationale Supérieure de Chimie de Rennes Campus de Beaulieu Avenue du Général Leclerc, CS 50837 35708 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/02] | For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique (CNRS) 3, rue Michel-Ange 75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | ||
For all designated states Ecole Nationale Supérieure de Chimie de Rennes Campus de Beaulieu Avenue du Général Leclerc, CS 50837 35708 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mauduit, Marc 36 rue Nicolas Copernic 35500 Vitré / FR | 02 /
Basle, Olivier 1 rue de Nemours 35000 Rennes / FR | 03 /
Queval, Pierre Les Appelais 35520 La Chapelle des Fougeretz / FR | 04 /
Jahier, Claire 6 rue Millig Ar Skanv di Glenmor bat C, Appt 32 35235 Thorigné-Fouillard / FR | 05 /
Artur, Isabelle 31 bd Léon Bourgeois 35500 Rennes / FR | [2015/02] | Representative(s) | Palacci, Jeremie Cabinet Netter 36, avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | [2015/02] | Application number, filing date | 13175362.6 | 05.07.2013 | [2015/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2821409 | Date: | 07.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C07F15/00, B01J31/22, C07F1/08, C07F1/10, C07F1/12 | [2015/02] | CPC: |
C07F1/08 (EP);
C07F1/10 (EP);
C07F1/12 (EP);
C07F15/0033 (EP);
C07F15/006 (EP);
C07F15/008 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Metall-Alkyliden-Komplexe mit unsymmetrischem ungesättigtem NHC-Liganden | [2015/02] | English: | Metal alkylidene complexes comprising an unsymmetrical unsaturated NHC ligand | [2015/02] | French: | Complexes d'alkylidène métalliques comprenant un ligand NHC insaturé asymétrique | [2015/02] | Examination procedure | 05.07.2013 | Examination requested [2015/02] | 05.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/53] | 13.08.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/53] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2015 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2012056419 (BASF SE [DE]; BASF CHINA CO LTD [CN]; HASHMI A STEPHEN K [DE]; LOTHSCH) [X] 1-6,8-11 * page 41 - page 43; tables 16-20 * * page 88; example 55 * * claims 23-25 *; | [A] - MANUELA DELGADO-REBOLLO ET AL, "Catalytic Hydrocarbon Functionalization with Gold Complexes Containing N-Heterocyclic Carbene Ligands with Pendant Donor Groups", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF INORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (20120309), vol. 2012, no. 9, doi:10.1002/ejic.201101158, ISSN 1434-1948, pages 1380 - 1386, XP055086775 [A] 1-11 * page 1382; compounds 11, 12 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ejic.201101158 | [X] - DANOPOULOS A A ET AL, "Copper and palladium complexes with N-heterocyclic carbene ligands functionalised with carboxylate groups", JOURNAL OF ORGANOMETALLIC CHEMISTRY, ELSEVIER-SEQUOIA S.A. LAUSANNE, CH, (20080722), vol. 693, doi:10.1016/J.JORGANCHEM.2008.07.017, ISSN 0022-328X, pages 3369 - 3374, XP002529227 [X] 1-6 * page 3370; compound 6a * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jorganchem.2008.07.017 | [X] - KEL VIN TAN ET AL, "Nickel(II) and Palladium(II) Complexes with Chelating N-Heterocyclic Carbene Amidate Ligands: Interplay between Normal and Abnormal Coordination Modes", ORGANOMETALLICS, (20130325), vol. 32, no. 6, doi:10.1021/om4000133, ISSN 0276-7333, pages 1913 - 1923, XP055088773 [X] 1-3,6 * page 1914; compound 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/om4000133 | [X] - DEBKUMAR NANDI ET AL, "Pd(0)-Catalyzed Decarboxylative Coupling and Tandem C-H Arylation/Decarboxylation for the Synthesis of Heteroaromatic Biaryls", THE JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (20121019), vol. 77, no. 20, doi:10.1021/jo3015837, ISSN 0022-3263, pages 9384 - 9390, XP055088784 [X] 1-4,6,8-11 * compound 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo3015837 | [X] - WEIXI ZHANG ET AL, "Acyclic Palladium(II)-N-heterocyclic Carbene Metallacrown Ether Complexes: Synthesis, Structure and Catalytic Activity", CHINESE JOURNAL OF CHEMISTRY, (20120607), vol. 30, no. 7, doi:10.1002/cjoc.201100596, ISSN 1001-604X, pages 1423 - 1428, XP055088792 [X] 1-4,6,8-11 * compounds 5a, 5b * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cjoc.201100596 | [X] - GONZALO VILLAVERDE ET AL, "Chiral NHC-Complexes with Dioxolane Backbone Heterogenized on MCM-41. Catalytic Activity", CHEMCATCHEM, (20110620), vol. 3, no. 8, doi:10.1002/cctc.201100119, ISSN 1867-3880, pages 1320 - 1328, XP055088794 [X] 1-4,6,8-11 * compounds 4aPd, 4bPd, 5aPd, 5bPd, 6aPd, 6bPd * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cctc.201100119 | [X] - HUYNH H V ET AL, "Rotamers of palladium complexes bearing IR active N-heterocyclic carbene ligands: Synthesis, structural characterization and catalytic activities", JOURNAL OF ORGANOMETALLIC CHEMISTRY, ELSEVIER-SEQUOIA S.A. LAUSANNE, CH, (20081105), vol. 694, doi:10.1016/J.JORGANCHEM.2008.10.044, ISSN 0022-328X, pages 323 - 331, XP002529226 [X] 1-4,6,8-11 * compounds 3, 4, 5, 6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/J.JORGANCHEM.2008.10.044 | [X] - ARRAN A. D. TULLOCH ET AL, "Functionalised and chelate heterocyclic carbene complexes of palladium; synthesis and structural studies", DALTON TRANSACTIONS, (20030124), no. 4, doi:10.1039/b209231j, ISSN 1477-9226, pages 699 - 708, XP055088854 [X] 1-4,6,8-11 * compounds 10, 11, 12 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/b209231j | [X] - DIRK MEYER ET AL, "Palladium Complexes with Pyrimidine-Functionalized N-Heterocyclic Carbene Ligands: Synthesis, Structure and Catalytic Activity", ORGANOMETALLICS, (20090413), vol. 28, no. 7, doi:10.1021/om8009238, ISSN 0276-7333, pages 2142 - 2149, XP055054921 [X] 1-3,5,6,8-11 * compound 9c * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/om8009238 | [X] - KETZ B E ET AL, "STRUCTURE AND REACTIVITY OF AN ALLYLPALLADIUM N-HETEROCYCLIC CARBENE ENOLATE COMPLEX", ORGANOMETALLICS, ACS, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (20040101), vol. 23, no. 12, doi:10.1021/OM049838B, ISSN 0276-7333, pages 2835 - 2837, XP008049060 [X] 1-4,6 * compounds 2, 3, 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/om049838b | [AD] - REN ET AL, "A new class of o-hydroxyaryl-substituted N-heterocyclic carbene ligands and their complexes with palladium", JOURNAL OF ORGANOMETALLIC CHEMISTRY, ELSEVIER-SEQUOIA S.A. LAUSANNE, CH, (20070329), vol. 692, no. 10, doi:10.1016/J.JORGANCHEM.2007.01.028, ISSN 0022-328X, pages 2092 - 2098, XP022008542 [AD] 1 * compound 5b * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jorganchem.2007.01.028 |