Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2824699

EP2824699 - Providing a chip die with electrically conductive elements [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.12.2015
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.12.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 20.01.2016  [2016/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nederlandse Organisatie voor toegepast- natuurwetenschappelijk onderzoek TNO
Anna van Buerenplein 1
2595 DA 's-Gravenhage / NL
[N/P]
Former [2015/03]For all designated states
Nederlandse Organisatie voor Toegepast -Natuurwetenschappelijk Onderzoek TNO
Schoemakerstraat 97
2628 VK Delft / NL
Inventor(s)01 / Theeuwes, Johannes Adrianus Cornelis
c/o TNO-PLT
Schoemakerstraat 97
2628 VK Delft / NL
02 / Smeltink, Jeroen Anthonius
c/o TNO-PLT
Schoemakerstraat 97
2628 VK Delft / NL
03 / Brouwer, Egbert Anne Martijn
c/o TNO-PLT
Schoemakerstraat 97
2628 VK Delft / NL
04 / Oosterhuis, Gerrit
c/o TNO-PLT
Schoemakerstraat 97
2628 VK Delft / NL
 [2015/03]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2015/03]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date13175623.108.07.2013
[2015/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2824699
Date:14.01.2015
Language:EN
[2015/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.01.2014
ClassificationInternational:H01L21/768, B23K26/04, C23C14/04, H01L21/285
[2015/03]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/03]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Bereitstellung eines Chips mit elektrisch leitfähigen Elementen[2015/03]
English:Providing a chip die with electrically conductive elements[2015/03]
French:Fournir une microplaquette avec éléments électriquement conducteurs[2015/03]
Examination procedure08.07.2013Examination requested  [2015/03]
15.07.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/03]
04.09.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2016/03]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.201503   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[AD]WO2011145930  (TNO [NL], et al) [AD] 1-17 * page 1, line 5 - page 7, line 8 * * page 8, line 8 - line 16; figures 1,4,6 *;
 [A]WO2009081355  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-17 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 26 * * page 3, line 18 - page 4, line 13 * * page 4, line 29 - page 7, line 11 * * page 9, line 10 - line 15; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US2004111174  (HUNTER BRADLEY L [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0096] * * paragraph [0106] - paragraph [0108] * * paragraph [0116] - paragraph [0132]; figures 3,5 *;
 [A]WO2007077630  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-17 * abstract *
by applicantWO2011145930