EP2824822 - A power transmission and distribution system supplying a plurality of subsea loads [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.03.2018 Database last updated on 19.04.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Schweiz AG Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | [2017/15] |
Former [2015/03] | For all designated states ABB Technology Ltd Affolternstrasse 44 8050 Zürich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kolstad, Helge Eltonveien 53 0586 Oslo / NO | 02 /
Wiik, Jan Finnsvei 8 0575 Oslo / NO | 03 /
Hyttinen, Mats Anisstigen 11 771 42 Ludvika / SE | 04 /
Moen, Tor-Eivind Tverråsen 48 1397 Nesøya / NO | 05 /
Piasecki, Wojciech Friedleina 28A/28 30-009 Krakow / PL | 06 /
Szewczyk, Marcin Guderskiego 7 M. 7 03-982 Warsaw / PL | [2015/03] | Representative(s) | Savela, Reino Aleksi ABB AB Intellectual Property Forskargränd 7 721 78 Västerås / SE | [2017/18] |
Former [2015/03] | Savela, Reino Aleksi ABB AB Intellectual Property Ingenjör Bååths Gata 11 721 83 Västerås / SE | Application number, filing date | 13175753.6 | 09.07.2013 | [2015/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2824822 | Date: | 14.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2824822 | Date: | 03.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H02M7/49, H01F38/14 | [2015/03] | CPC: |
H02M7/49 (EP);
H01F38/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/34] |
Former [2015/03] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Stromversorgungs- und Verteilungssystem zur Speisung mehrerer unterseeischer Lasten | [2016/50] | English: | A power transmission and distribution system supplying a plurality of subsea loads | [2015/03] | French: | Système de transmission et de distribution d'énergie fournissant une pluralité de charges sous-marines | [2015/03] |
Former [2015/03] | Stromversorgungs- und Verteilungssystem zur Speisung mehrerer unterseeische Lasten | Examination procedure | 09.07.2013 | Examination requested [2015/03] | 01.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 23.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.04.2014 | Opposition(s) | 06.02.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.07.2013 | AL | 03.05.2017 | AT | 03.05.2017 | CY | 03.05.2017 | CZ | 03.05.2017 | DK | 03.05.2017 | EE | 03.05.2017 | ES | 03.05.2017 | FI | 03.05.2017 | HR | 03.05.2017 | IT | 03.05.2017 | LT | 03.05.2017 | LV | 03.05.2017 | MC | 03.05.2017 | MK | 03.05.2017 | NL | 03.05.2017 | PL | 03.05.2017 | PT | 03.05.2017 | RO | 03.05.2017 | RS | 03.05.2017 | SE | 03.05.2017 | SI | 03.05.2017 | SK | 03.05.2017 | SM | 03.05.2017 | TR | 03.05.2017 | IE | 09.07.2017 | LU | 09.07.2017 | MT | 09.07.2017 | BE | 31.07.2017 | CH | 31.07.2017 | FR | 31.07.2017 | LI | 31.07.2017 | BG | 03.08.2017 | GR | 04.08.2017 | IS | 03.09.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 09.07.2013 | |
AT | 03.05.2017 | ||
CY | 03.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
MK | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PT | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
TR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IE | 09.07.2017 | ||
LU | 09.07.2017 | ||
MT | 09.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
FR | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 09.07.2013 | |
AT | 03.05.2017 | ||
CY | 03.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
MK | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
TR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IE | 09.07.2017 | ||
LU | 09.07.2017 | ||
MT | 09.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
FR | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 09.07.2013 | |
AT | 03.05.2017 | ||
CY | 03.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
MK | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
IE | 09.07.2017 | ||
LU | 09.07.2017 | ||
MT | 09.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
FR | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 09.07.2013 | |
AT | 03.05.2017 | ||
CY | 03.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
IE | 09.07.2017 | ||
LU | 09.07.2017 | ||
MT | 09.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
FR | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 09.07.2013 | |
AT | 03.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
IE | 09.07.2017 | ||
LU | 09.07.2017 | ||
MT | 09.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
FR | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
IE | 09.07.2017 | ||
LU | 09.07.2017 | ||
MT | 09.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
FR | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
IE | 09.07.2017 | ||
LU | 09.07.2017 | ||
MT | 09.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
FR | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
IE | 09.07.2017 | ||
LU | 09.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
FR | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
IE | 09.07.2017 | ||
LU | 09.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
FR | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
IE | 09.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
FR | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP2290799 (CONVERTEAM TECHNOLOGY LTD [GB]) [X] 1-4,10,11,17 * paragraphs [0002] , [0005] , [0008] , [0014] , [0015] , [0016] , [0023] , [0024] , [0027] , [0033]; figures 1A,2A,3A,5 * [Y] 1-5; | [Y]EP2293407 (CONVERTEAM TECHNOLOGY LTD [GB]) [Y] 1-6,9,13-21 * paragraphs [0005] , [0007] , [0009] , [0010] , [0015] *; | [Y]GB2458476 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [Y] 5,9 * page 2 - page 3; figures 1-7 *; | [Y]EP2447962 (NEXANS [FR]) [Y] 5,9 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0011] - [0013] - [0019] *; | [Y]US2013026831 (SIHLER CHRISTOF MARTIN [DE], et al) [Y] 13-15,19,20 * paragraphs [0001] - [0002]; figure 1 * | [Y] - SONG-MANGUELLE J ET AL, "A Modular Stacked DC transmission and distribution system for long distance subsea applications", ENERGY CONVERSION CONGRESS AND EXPOSITION (ECCE), 2012 IEEE, IEEE, (20120915), doi:10.1109/ECCE.2012.6342218, ISBN 978-1-4673-0802-1, pages 4437 - 4444, XP032467049 [Y] 1-6,9,13-21 * page 4437 - page 4441 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ECCE.2012.6342218 | [A] - P. MONJEAN ET AL, "Topologies comparison of multi-cell medium frequency transformer for offshore farms", 9TH IET INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON AC AND DC POWER TRANSMISSION (ACDC 2010), (20100101), doi:10.1049/cp.2010.0979, ISBN 978 1 84919 308 5, pages O44 - O44, XP055107200 [A] 1-21 * figures 1,4,5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/cp.2010.0979 | by applicant | US2010133901 |