Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2685357

EP2685357 - Input method and electronic device using pen input device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  12.08.2016
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.07.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
[N/P]
Former [2014/03]For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Ji, Daehyun
c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129 Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si
443-742 Gyeonggi-do / KR
02 / Kim, Joonwoo
c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129 Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si
443-742 Gyeonggi-do / KR
03 / Baek, Dongcheol
c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129 Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si
443-742 Gyeonggi-do / KR
04 / Oh, Taekeun
c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129 Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si
443-742 Gyeonggi-do / KR
 [2014/03]
Representative(s)Nederlandsch Octrooibureau
P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS The Hague / NL
[2014/03]
Application number, filing date13175799.909.07.2013
[2014/03]
Priority number, dateKR2012007532411.07.2012         Original published format: KR 20120075324
[2014/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2685357
Date:15.01.2014
Language:EN
[2014/03]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2685357
Date:25.02.2015
Language:EN
[2015/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.01.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/0354, G06F3/0488
[2014/03]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/40]
Former [2014/03]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Eingabeverfahren und elektronische Vorrichtung mit Stifteingabevorrichtung[2014/03]
English:Input method and electronic device using pen input device[2014/03]
French:Procédé d'entrée et dispositif électronique utilisant un dispositif de stylo d'entrée[2014/03]
Examination procedure05.08.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.08.2015Examination requested  [2015/40]
18.03.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.07.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.09.2017Date of oral proceedings
28.11.2017Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
14.12.2017Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination14.02.2018Appeal received No.  T1503/18
18.04.2018Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.03.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
10.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
29.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
25.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
24.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XYI]US2010182284  (TREMBLAY CHRISTOPHER JASON [CA]) [X] 1-7,11-16,18 * Claim 9; paragraphs [0044] - [0055] - [0072] - [0080] - [0107] - [0108] - [0118] - [0121]; figures 1A-C, 4A-C, 13 * [Y] 8,9,17 [I] 10,19;
 [IY]US2010044121  (SIMON STEVEN H [US] ET AL) [I] 1-7,11,12,16 * paragraphs [0010] , [0 11] , [0 95] - [0133] - [ 136] , [ 190]; figures 8-21 * [Y] 8,9,17