Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2685357 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201310288732 EP13175799



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2019204941Global Dossier 04.07.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201615095328 11.04.2016
US201916297859 11.03.2019
US201313936560 08.07.2013
KR20120075324 11.07.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10228776Global Dossier 12.03.2019B2
US2016224139 04.08.2016A1
Priority number Date
US201615095328 11.04.2016
US201313936560 08.07.2013
KR20120075324 11.07.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US9310896Global Dossier 12.04.2016B2
US2014015811 16.01.2014A1
Priority number Date
KR20120075324 11.07.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR101999119BGlobal Dossier 12.07.2019B1
KR20140008637 22.01.2014A
Priority number Date
KR20120075324 11.07.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN103543851Global Dossier 29.01.2014A
Priority number Date
KR20120075324 11.07.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2685357Global Dossier 25.02.2015A3
EP2685357 15.01.2014A2
Priority number Date
KR20120075324 11.07.2012