Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2824628

EP2824628 - Direct debit procedure [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.01.2016
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.07.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vodafone Holding GmbH
Mannesmannufer 2
40213 Düsseldorf / DE
[2015/03]
Inventor(s)01 / Strasding, Nikolai
Heinrich-Klausmann-Str. 80
47809 Krefeld / DE
02 / Ritzmann, Mark
Münsterstrasse 28
40477 Düsseldorf / DE
 [2015/03]
Representative(s)Jostarndt Patentanwalts-AG
Philipsstrasse 8
52068 Aachen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/03]Jostarndt, Hans-Dieter
Jostarndt Patentanwalts-AG
Brüsseler Ring 51
52074 Aachen / DE
Application number, filing date13175965.610.07.2013
[2015/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2824628
Date:14.01.2015
Language:EN
[2015/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.01.2014
ClassificationInternational:G06Q20/20, G06Q20/32, G06Q20/38, G06Q20/40
[2015/03]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/29]
Former [2015/03]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Lastschrifteinzugsverfahren[2015/03]
English:Direct debit procedure[2015/03]
French:Procédure de débit direct[2015/03]
Examination procedure05.06.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.06.2015Examination requested  [2015/29]
20.07.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.01.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.10.2016Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.11.2016
11.11.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
17.11.2016Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Appeal following examination16.01.2017Appeal received No.  T0768/17
14.03.2017Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.07.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
22.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
24.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
30.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
25.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO2010019670  (VIVOTECH INC [US]; KUMAR PRADEEP [US]) [X] 1,14,15 * page 5 - page 14; figures 1-3; claims 1-6 * [I] 2-13;
 [I]EP2605202  (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA]) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0073]; figures 3a-5 *;
 [I]EP2584769  (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA]) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0033]; figures 1-7 *;
 [I]US2013139230  (KOH LIANG SENG [US] ET AL) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0147] - paragraph [0174]; figures 2A-9 *;
 [I]US2012124394  (BRUDNICKI DAVID [US] ET AL) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0031]; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US2013073404  (NARENDRA SIVA G [US] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-22 *;
 [A]EP2106108  (MOTOROLA INC [US] MOTOROLA MOBILITY LLC [US]) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-6 *;
 [A]WO2010032215  (LOGOMOTION SRO [SK]; FLOREK MIROSLAV [SK]; MASARYK MICHAL [SK]) [A] 1-15 * page 3 - page 7 *;
 [A]US2012032789  (ICHIMARU NORIHIRO [JP] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0160] *;
 [A]US2011078081  (PIRZADEH KIUSHAN [US] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0080] *;
 [A]US2010306076  (TAVEAU SEBASTIEN [US] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * claims 1-15 *;
 [A]EP2339521  (VODAFONE HOLDING GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *