EP2824124 - Polymeric dispersing agent [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.12.2015 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.01.2016 [2016/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/03] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gädt, Torben Traunerstrasse 23A 83278 Traunstein / DE | 02 /
Winklbauer, Martin Spielhof 58 84553 Halsbach / DE | 03 /
Grassl, Harald Buchenstr. 17 84550 Feichten / DE | 04 /
Schinabeck, Michael Irling 5 83352 Altenmarkt / DE | 05 /
Hillesheim, Nina Herzog-Otto-Str. 32 83308 Trostberg / DE | 06 /
Hungerhuber, Antonia Eichenstrasse 13 83308 Trostberg / DE | [2015/03] | Representative(s) | Gastner, Thomas, et al BASF Construction Solutions GmbH Abteilung GVX/DT Dr.-Albert-Frank-Strasse 32 83308 Trostberg / DE | [2015/03] | Application number, filing date | 13176235.3 | 12.07.2013 | [2015/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2824124 | Date: | 14.01.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C08F220/28, C04B24/24, C04B24/14 | [2015/03] | CPC: |
C08F220/286 (EP,US);
C04B11/00 (US);
C04B16/04 (US);
C04B24/246 (EP,US);
C04B28/14 (EP,US);
C04B2103/408 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C04B28/14, C04B24/246 (US,EP);
C08F220/286, C08F230/02 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POLYMERES DISPERGIERMITTEL | [2015/03] | English: | Polymeric dispersing agent | [2015/03] | French: | Agent de dispersion polymère | [2015/03] | Examination procedure | 12.07.2013 | Examination requested [2015/03] | 15.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/03] | 24.08.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/03] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2015 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3855364 (STECKLER R) [A] 1-8 * column 1, lines 4-8 * * column 1, lines 54-58 * * column 2, lines 41-48 * * example 1 *; | [AD]JP2000327386 (TAIHEIYO CEMENT CORP) [AD] 1-13 * paragraphs [0001] , [0013]; example 1 *; | [A]EP1923409 (KAO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-8* paragraphs [0001] , [0045]; claim 1 * | by applicant | US4009062 | JP2000327386 | EP1743877 | EP1767504 | EP1972643 | EP1975136 | WO2010076093 | WO2010109335 | US8058377 |