Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2824588

EP2824588 - Merging sets of data objects for display [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  23.03.2018
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip22.10.2019Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BlackBerry Limited
2200 University Avenue East
Waterloo, ON N2K 0A7 / CA
[2015/03]
Inventor(s)01 / Runstedler, Christopher James
c/o BlackBerry Limited
295 Phillip Street
Extension 75424
Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA
02 / Scriver, Aaron David
c/o BlackBerry Limited
295 Phillip Street
Extension 75326
Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA
 [2015/03]
Representative(s)MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/03]Patel, Binesh
Barker Brettell LLP
100 Hagley Road
Edgbaston
Birmingham West Midlands
B16 8QQ / GB
Application number, filing date13176257.712.07.2013
[2015/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2824588
Date:14.01.2015
Language:EN
[2015/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.12.2013
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/30
[2015/03]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/03]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Zusammenführen von Datenobjekten zur Anzeige[2015/03]
English:Merging sets of data objects for display[2015/03]
French:Fusion d'ensembles d'objets de données pour affichage[2015/03]
Examination procedure12.07.2013Examination requested  [2015/03]
13.07.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.03.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.07.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.03.2019Date of oral proceedings
09.04.2019Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
09.04.2019Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination19.06.2019Appeal received No.  T2853/19
19.08.2019Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.03.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
27.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
27.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
29.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2010262638  (FITZGERALD RICHARD [GB]) [X] 1-3,13,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0063] * * paragraph [0087] - paragraph [0104] * * paragraph [0112] - paragraph [0116] * * paragraph [0125] - paragraph [0142] * * paragraph [0146] - paragraph [0147] * [I] 4-14;
 [A]US2013117692  (PADMANABHAN UDIYAN [US] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0068] * * paragraph [0073] * * paragraph [0085] * * paragraph [0115] - paragraph [0116] *;
 [A]US2003076322  (OUZTS TODD [US] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0038] *