Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2813366

EP2813366 - Fixed thermal head print mechanism with controlled gear play [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.01.2017
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
APS Trading OOD
Microelectronica Industrial Zone
2140 Botevgrad / BG
[2014/51]
Inventor(s)01 / Montagutelli, Denis
1 Rue de l'Hommeau
49100 Angers / FR
 [2014/51]
Representative(s)Benatov, Samuil Gabriel
Dr. EMIL BENATOV & PARTNERS
6, Asen Peykov Str.
1113 Sofia / BG
[N/P]
Former [2014/51]Benatov, Emil Gabriel , et al
Dr. Emil Benatov & Partners
Asen Peykov Str. No. 6
1113 Sofia / BG
Application number, filing date13177105.718.07.2013
[2014/51]
Priority number, dateEP2013017174812.06.2013         Original published format: EP 13171748
[2014/51]
Previously filed application, dateEP2013017174812.06.2013
[2014/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2813366
Date:17.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2813366
Date:23.03.2016
Language:EN
[2016/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.09.2014
ClassificationInternational:B41J11/04, B41J11/20, B41J29/38
[2014/51]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/29]
Former [2014/51]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Druckmechanismus mit festem Wärmekopf mit gesteuertem Getrieberadspiel[2014/51]
English:Fixed thermal head print mechanism with controlled gear play[2014/51]
French:Mecanisme d'impression thermique a tête fixe et jeu d'engrenage réduit[2014/51]
Examination procedure04.06.2015Examination requested  [2015/29]
15.10.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.01.2016Fee for grant paid
18.01.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
26.01.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.10.2015
Opposition(s)02.01.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU18.07.2013
AL23.03.2016
AT23.03.2016
BE23.03.2016
CY23.03.2016
CZ23.03.2016
DK23.03.2016
EE23.03.2016
ES23.03.2016
FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
IT23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
MC23.03.2016
MK23.03.2016
NL23.03.2016
PL23.03.2016
RO23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
SI23.03.2016
SK23.03.2016
SM23.03.2016
TR23.03.2016
BG23.06.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
IE18.07.2016
LU18.07.2016
IS23.07.2016
PT25.07.2016
CH31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
MT31.07.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU18.07.2013
AT23.03.2016
BE23.03.2016
CY23.03.2016
CZ23.03.2016
DK23.03.2016
EE23.03.2016
ES23.03.2016
FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
IT23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
MC23.03.2016
MK23.03.2016
NL23.03.2016
PL23.03.2016
RO23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
SI23.03.2016
SK23.03.2016
SM23.03.2016
TR23.03.2016
BG23.06.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
IE18.07.2016
LU18.07.2016
IS23.07.2016
PT25.07.2016
CH31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
MT31.07.2016
Former [2018/32]HU18.07.2013
AT23.03.2016
BE23.03.2016
CY23.03.2016
CZ23.03.2016
DK23.03.2016
EE23.03.2016
ES23.03.2016
FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
IT23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
MC23.03.2016
MK23.03.2016
NL23.03.2016
PL23.03.2016
RO23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
SI23.03.2016
SK23.03.2016
SM23.03.2016
BG23.06.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
IE18.07.2016
LU18.07.2016
IS23.07.2016
PT25.07.2016
CH31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
MT31.07.2016
Former [2018/30]HU18.07.2013
AT23.03.2016
BE23.03.2016
CY23.03.2016
CZ23.03.2016
DK23.03.2016
EE23.03.2016
ES23.03.2016
FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
IT23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
MC23.03.2016
MK23.03.2016
NL23.03.2016
PL23.03.2016
RO23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
SI23.03.2016
SK23.03.2016
SM23.03.2016
BG23.06.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
IE18.07.2016
LU18.07.2016
IS23.07.2016
PT25.07.2016
CH31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
Former [2017/37]AT23.03.2016
BE23.03.2016
CZ23.03.2016
DK23.03.2016
EE23.03.2016
ES23.03.2016
FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
IT23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
MC23.03.2016
NL23.03.2016
PL23.03.2016
RO23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
SI23.03.2016
SK23.03.2016
SM23.03.2016
BG23.06.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
IE18.07.2016
LU18.07.2016
IS23.07.2016
PT25.07.2016
CH31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
Former [2017/25]AT23.03.2016
BE23.03.2016
CZ23.03.2016
DK23.03.2016
EE23.03.2016
ES23.03.2016
FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
IT23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
MC23.03.2016
NL23.03.2016
PL23.03.2016
RO23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
SI23.03.2016
SK23.03.2016
SM23.03.2016
BG23.06.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
IS23.07.2016
PT25.07.2016
CH31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
Former [2017/19]AT23.03.2016
BE23.03.2016
CZ23.03.2016
DK23.03.2016
EE23.03.2016
ES23.03.2016
FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
IT23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
MC23.03.2016
NL23.03.2016
PL23.03.2016
RO23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
SK23.03.2016
SM23.03.2016
BG23.06.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
IS23.07.2016
PT25.07.2016
CH31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
Former [2017/07]AT23.03.2016
BE23.03.2016
CZ23.03.2016
DK23.03.2016
EE23.03.2016
ES23.03.2016
FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
IT23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
NL23.03.2016
PL23.03.2016
RO23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
SK23.03.2016
SM23.03.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
IS23.07.2016
PT25.07.2016
Former [2017/03]AT23.03.2016
BE23.03.2016
CZ23.03.2016
EE23.03.2016
ES23.03.2016
FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
IT23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
NL23.03.2016
PL23.03.2016
RO23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
SK23.03.2016
SM23.03.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
IS23.07.2016
PT25.07.2016
Former [2016/51]AT23.03.2016
CZ23.03.2016
EE23.03.2016
ES23.03.2016
FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
NL23.03.2016
PL23.03.2016
RO23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
SK23.03.2016
SM23.03.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
IS23.07.2016
PT25.07.2016
Former [2016/50]AT23.03.2016
CZ23.03.2016
EE23.03.2016
ES23.03.2016
FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
NL23.03.2016
PL23.03.2016
RO23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
SK23.03.2016
SM23.03.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
IS23.07.2016
Former [2016/49]EE23.03.2016
FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
NL23.03.2016
PL23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
IS23.07.2016
Former [2016/48]FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
NL23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
IS23.07.2016
Former [2016/40]FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
NL23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
Former [2016/39]FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
Former [2016/36]FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
Former [2016/35]FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
Documents cited:Search[AD]WO9817475  (AXIOHM TRANSACTION SOLUTIONS [US]; BERTALAN JOHN [US]; COOPER JEFFERY) [AD] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]JP2011056691  (SEIKO INSTR INC) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]FR2923411  (A P S ENGINEERING SARL [FR] A P S ENGINEERING [FR]) [A] 1 * page 6 - page 7 *;
 [A]EP2305478  (SEIKO INSTR INC [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document *