Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2690890

EP2690890 - Methods and apparatus for improving speech understanding in a large crowd [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  11.02.2015
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Starkey Laboratories, Inc.
6600 Washington Avenue South
Eden Prairie, MN 55344 / US
[2014/05]
Inventor(s)01 / Zhang, Tao
8602 Zachman Circle
Eden Prairie, MN Minnesota 55344 / US
 [2014/05]
Representative(s)Dentons UK and Middle East LLP
One Fleet Place
London EC4M 7WS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/05]Maury, Richard Philip
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London
WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date13177632.023.07.2013
[2014/05]
Priority number, dateUS201261674581P23.07.2012         Original published format: US 201261674581 P
[2014/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2690890
Date:29.01.2014
Language:EN
[2014/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.10.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04R25/00
[2014/05]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/05]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Verbesserung des Sprachverständnisses in einer großen Menge[2014/05]
English:Methods and apparatus for improving speech understanding in a large crowd[2014/05]
French:Procédés et appareil pour améliorer la compréhension de la parole dans une grande foule[2014/05]
Examination procedure23.07.2013Examination requested  [2014/05]
25.07.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.09.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.01.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.01.2016Date of oral proceedings
27.01.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
27.01.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination05.04.2016Appeal received No.  T1436/16
06.06.2016Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.09.2014
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
12.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
11.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
08.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]US2009047994  (SOMMER PETER [DK] ET AL) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0053] *;
 [X]US2007286350  (KRAUSE LEE S [US] ET AL) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0084] *;
 [A]US2010086152  (RANK MIKE LIND [DK] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0049] *;
 [A]US2005135644  (QI YINGYONG [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0042] *;
 [A]US2012114158  (GYSIN STEFAN [CH]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0041] *