blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2830352 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2830352



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 128
24.07.2013 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4
24.07.2013 Drawings Search / examination 18
24.07.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
24.07.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
24.07.2013 Description Search / examination 48
24.07.2013 Claims Search / examination 6
24.07.2013 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
24.07.2013 Abstract Search / examination 1
09.01.2014 Search started Search / examination 1
30.01.2014 European search report Search / examination 1
30.01.2014 European search opinion Search / examination 3
30.01.2014 Document annexed to the Extended European Search Report Search / examination 6
30.01.2014 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
06.06.2014 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 24
18.06.2014 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
08.01.2015 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
23.01.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
02.02.2015 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
24.02.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
02.04.2015 Withdrawal of application Search / examination 1
08.04.2015 Final instructions in case of withdrawal of application Search / examination 1
15.04.2015 Confirmation of withdrawal of application/closure of proceedings Search / examination 1