blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2830352


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
10.04.2015 Withdrawal of application published on  13.05.2015  [2015/20]
28.01.2015 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  28.01.2015  [2015/05]
26.12.2014 Request for examination filed published on  28.01.2015  [2015/05]