blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2830352 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201480050619 EP13177864 EP14167783 EP14741913 EP17173871



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2015011184Global Dossier 29.01.2015A1
Priority number Date
EP14167783 09.05.2014
EP13177864 24.07.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2018205661Global Dossier 19.07.2018A1
Priority number Date
US201614906888 21.01.2016
EP14167783 09.05.2014
US201815922750 15.03.2018
EP13177864 24.07.2013
WO2014EP65806 23.07.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9954789Global Dossier 24.04.2018B2
US2016164793 09.06.2016A1
Priority number Date
EP14167783 09.05.2014
EP13177864 24.07.2013
WO2014EP65806 23.07.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20160034911Global Dossier 30.03.2016A
Priority number Date
EP14167783 09.05.2014
EP13177864 24.07.2013
WO2014EP65806 23.07.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2019036998Global Dossier 07.03.2019A
Priority number Date
EP14167783 09.05.2014
EP13177864 24.07.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP6436436BGlobal Dossier 12.12.2018B2
JP2016527812 08.09.2016A
Priority number Date
EP14167783 09.05.2014
EP13177864 24.07.2013
WO2014EP65806 23.07.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3240328Global Dossier 01.11.2017A1
Priority number Date
EP14167783 09.05.2014
EP13177864 24.07.2013
EP14741913 23.07.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3025547Global Dossier 05.07.2017B1
EP3025547 01.06.2016A1
Priority number Date
EP14167783 09.05.2014
EP13177864 24.07.2013
EP14741913 23.07.2014
WO2014EP65806 23.07.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2830353Global Dossier 19.04.2017B1
EP2830353 28.01.2015A1
Priority number Date
EP14167783 09.05.2014
EP13177864 24.07.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN105580422Global Dossier 11.05.2016A
Priority number Date
EP14167783 09.05.2014
EP13177864 24.07.2013
WO2014EP65806 23.07.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2014295037B 24.08.2017B2
AU2014295037 11.02.2016A1
Priority number Date
EP14167783 09.05.2014
EP13177864 24.07.2013
WO2014EP65806 23.07.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2017248509B 16.05.2019B2
AU2017248509 09.11.2017A1
Priority number Date
EP14167783 09.05.2014
EP13177864 24.07.2013
AU2014295037 23.07.2014
AU2017248509 19.10.2017
WO2014EP65806 23.07.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2641834T 14.11.2017T3
Priority number Date
EP14167783 09.05.2014
EP13177864 24.07.2013
WO2014EP65806 23.07.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MX351988 03.11.2017B
MX2016001043 26.04.2016A
Priority number Date
EP14167783 09.05.2014
EP13177864 24.07.2013
WO2014EP65806 23.07.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
RU2660663 09.07.2018C2
RU2016101811 28.08.2017A
Priority number Date
EP14167783 09.05.2014
EP13177864 24.07.2013
WO2014EP65806 23.07.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
RU2018121714 28.03.2019A3
RU2018121714 06.03.2019A
Priority number Date
EP14167783 09.05.2014
EP13177864 24.07.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2830352Global Dossier 28.01.2015A1
Priority number Date
EP13177864 24.07.2013