Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2830352

EP2830352 - Efficient discard mechanism in small cell deployment [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  10.04.2015
Database last updated on 26.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.04.2015Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 13.05.2015  [2015/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Panasonic Intellectual Property Corporation of America
20000 Mariner Avenue, Suite 200
Torrance, CA 90503 / US
[2015/05]
Inventor(s)01 / Mallick, Prateek Basu
Panasonic R&D Center Germany GmbH
Monzastrasse 4c
63225 Langen / DE
02 / Loehr, Joachim
Panasonic R&D Center Germany GmbH
Monzastrasse 4c
63225 Langen / DE
 [2015/05]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/05]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser
Anwaltssozietät
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date13177864.924.07.2013
[2015/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2830352
Date:28.01.2015
Language:EN
[2015/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.01.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04W28/08
[2015/05]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/05]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Effizienter Verwerfungsmechanismus in kleinzelligem Einsatz[2015/05]
English:Efficient discard mechanism in small cell deployment[2015/05]
French:Mécanisme d'abandon efficace dans un déploiement à petites cellules[2015/05]
Examination procedure24.07.2013Examination requested  [2015/05]
02.04.2015Application withdrawn by applicant  [2015/20]
Documents cited:Search[A]  - NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS (RAPPORTEUR), "Email Discussion Report on U-Plane Alternatives [81bis#19]", vol. RAN WG2, no. Fukuoka, Japan; 20130520 - 20130524, (20130510), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-131621 SCE UPLANE EMAIL DISCUSSION, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG2_RL2/TSGR2_82/Docs/, (20130510), XP050699806 [A] 1-15 * page 32 - page 35 * * page 19 - page 23 *
 [A]  - INTERDIGITAL COMMUNICATIONS, "User Plane Architecture for Dual-Connectivity", vol. RAN WG2, no. Fukuoka, Japan; 20130520 - 20130524, (20130511), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-131939 USER PLANE ARCHITECTURE FOR DUAL CONNECTIVITY, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FR, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG2_RL2/TSGR2_82/Docs/, (20130511), XP050700091 [A] 1-15 * Section 2.2.3 * * section 2.1 *
by applicant   - LTE - The UMTS Long Term Evolution FROM THEORY TO PRACTICE
    - The UMTS Long Term Evolution FROM THEORY TO PRACTICE