Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2829373

EP2829373 - Positioning element and formwork assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.12.2015
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.12.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 20.01.2016  [2016/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HILTI Aktiengesellschaft
Feldkircherstrasse 100
9494 Schaan / LI
[2015/05]
Inventor(s)01 / Voulkidis, Orestis
Werdenbergstr. 24
9470 Buchs / CH
 [2015/05]
Representative(s)Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Corporate Intellectual Property
Feldkircherstrasse 100
Postfach 333
9494 Schaan / LI
[2015/05]
Application number, filing date13178155.126.07.2013
[2015/05]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2829373
Date:28.01.2015
Language:DE
[2015/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.11.2013
ClassificationInternational:B28B23/02, E04G21/18
[2015/05]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/05]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Positionierungselement und Schalungsbaugruppe[2015/05]
English:Positioning element and formwork assembly[2015/05]
French:Elément de positionnement et module de coffrage[2015/05]
Examination procedure26.07.2013Examination requested  [2015/05]
29.07.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/03]
03.09.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2016/03]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.201503   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO0120103  (CASSAR VICTOR EMMANUEL [AU]) [X] 1,2,4-6 * figure 1 * * page 4, line 21 * * page 5, line 1 - line 11 * [I] 7,8;
 [XI]DE1988962U  (DEUTSCHE EDELSTAHLWERKE AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,6 * figures 1,2 * [I] 5,7,8;
 [A]EP1293714  (HILTI AG [LI]) [A] 8 * figure 1 *
by applicantDE4237466
 DE8333171U