Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2829613

EP2829613 - Biomarkers of liver diseases and uses thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.12.2015
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.12.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 20.01.2016  [2016/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Istituto Nazionale Di Genetica Molecolare-INGM
Via Francesco Sforza 35
20122 Milano / IT
[2015/05]
Inventor(s)01 / Abrignani, Sergio
Via Rinascente 2
53040 Serre di Rapolano (SI) / IT
02 / Pagani, Massimiliano
Piazza Salvo D'Acquisto 40
24069 Trescore Balneario (BG) / IT
03 / De Francesco, Raffaele
Via Tolstoi 1
20146 Milano / IT
 [2015/05]
Representative(s)Capasso, Olga , et al
De Simone & Partners SpA
Via Vincenzo Bellini, 20
00198 Roma / IT
[N/P]
Former [2015/05]Capasso, Olga , et al
De Simone & Partners S.p.A.
Via Vincenzo Bellini, 20
00198 Roma / IT
Application number, filing date13178245.026.07.2013
[2015/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2829613
Date:28.01.2015
Language:EN
[2015/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.12.2013
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/68
[2015/05]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/05]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Biomarker von Lebererkrankungen und Verwendungen davon[2015/05]
English:Biomarkers of liver diseases and uses thereof[2015/05]
French:Biomarqueurs de maladies du foie et leurs utilisations[2015/05]
Examination procedure26.07.2013Examination requested  [2015/05]
29.07.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/03]
04.09.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2016/03]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.201503   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2011027332  (ISTITUTO NAZ DI GENETICA MOLECOLARE INGM [IT], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * page 3, line 27 - page 5, line 16; example 1; tables 1-2 * * claims 8-9 *;
 [X]CN101368213  (UNIV NANJING [CN]) [X] 1,2,5,8,9,15 * abstract * * examples 2-3; tables 1-2 *;
 [A]WO2013095941  (VALLEY HEALTH SYSTEM [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 2, line 2 - line 3; claim 1 *;
 [A]CN101921863  (CHINA PLA GENERAL HOSPITAL) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]CN102888453  (CHINESE PLA GENERAL HOSPITAL) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [XI]  MARABITA, F., "Single Nucleotide Polymorphisms and circulating microRNAs for monitoring HCV disease progression: an integrated approach. Tesi di dottorato, Università degli Studi di Milano-Bicocca, 2011.", Milan, (20110329), pages 75 - 110, Bicocca Open Archive, URL: http://boa.unimib.it/bitstream/10281/29993/1/phd_unimib_716450.pdf, (20131113), XP002716249 [X] 1-9,11,13-15 * page 75 - page 110 * [I] 10,12
 [L]  MARABITA, F., "Single Nucleotide Polymorphisms and circulating microRNAs for monitoring HCV disease progression: an integrated approach", (20110329), Bicocca Open Archive, URL: http://hdl.handle.net/10281/29993, (20131113), XP002716280 [L] * abstract *
 [XDI]  GUI, JUNHAO ET AL, "Serum microRNA characterization identifies miR - 885 - 5p as a potential marker for detecting liver pathologies", CLINICAL SCIENCE, (20110301), vol. 120, no. 5, doi:10.1042/CS20100297, ISSN 0143-5221, pages 183 - 193, XP055047582 [XD] 1-6,8,9,15 * abstract * * page 184, column 1, paragraph 4 - page 186, column 1, paragraph 1; figure 4 * * page 188, column 1, paragraph 3 - page 189, column 2, paragraph 1 * * page 191, column 1, paragraph 4 - page 192, column 1, paragraph 1 * [I] 7,10-14

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1042/CS20100297
 [XA]  GIRARD ET AL, "miR-122, a paradigm for the role of microRNAs in the liver", JOURNAL OF HEPATOLOGY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20080212), vol. 48, no. 4, doi:10.1016/J.JHEP.2008.01.019, ISSN 0168-8278, pages 648 - 656, XP022534926 [X] 8,9 * abstract * [A] 1-7

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jhep.2008.01.019
 [AD]  C COULOUARN ET AL, "Loss of miR-122 expression in liver cancer correlates with suppression of the hepatic phenotype and gain of metastatic properties", ONCOGENE, (20090720), vol. 28, no. 40, doi:10.1038/onc.2009.211, ISSN 0950-9232, pages 3526 - 3536, XP055087939 [AD] 1-15 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/onc.2009.211
 [A]  XUE ZHAO ET AL, "The role and clinical implications of microRNAs in hepatocellular carcinoma", SCIENCE CHINA LIFE SCIENCES, SP SCIENCE CHINA PRESS, HEIDELBERG, (20121031), vol. 55, no. 10, doi:10.1007/S11427-012-4384-X, ISSN 1869-1889, pages 906 - 919, XP035131479 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 908, column 1, paragraph 3 - column 2, paragraph 1 * * page 912, column 1, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11427-012-4384-x
by applicantWO2008010558
    BARTEL DP, CELL, (2009), vol. 136, pages 215 - 233,
    GUO H ET AL., NATURE, (2010), vol. 466, pages 835 - 840,
    VOLINIA S ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2006), vol. 103, page 2257,
    0'CONNELL RM ET AL., NATURE, (2010), vol. 10, pages 111 - 122,
    JOPLING CL ET AL., SCIENCE, (2005), vol. 309, pages 1577 - 1581,
    LIANG Y ET AL., BMC GENOMICS, (2007), vol. 8, pages 16610.1186,1471 - 2164,8-166,
    LU J ET AL., NATURE, (2005), vol. 435, pages 834 - 838,
    CHEN X ET AL., CELL RES, (2008), vol. 18, pages 997 - 1006,
    MITCHELL PS ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2008), vol. 105, pages 10513 - 10518,
    GILAD S ET AL., PLOS ONE, (2008), vol. 3, page 314810.1371,
    REID G ET AL., CRITICAL REVIEWS IN ONCOLOGY/HEMATOLOGY, (2011), vol. 80, pages 193 - 208,
    KOSAKA N ET AL., CANCER SCIENCE, (2010), vol. 101, pages 2087 - 2092,
    ETHERIDGE A ET AL., MUTAT RES, (2011), vol. 717, pages 85 - 90,
    LAUER GM; WALKER BD, N ENGL J MED, (2001), vol. 345, pages 41 - 52,
    MANNS MP ET AL., THE LANCET, (2001), vol. 358, pages 958 - 965,
    FRIED MW ET AL., N ENGL J MED, (2002), vol. 347, pages 975 - 982,
    KIM WR ET AL., HEPATOLOGY, (2008), vol. 47, pages 1363 - 1370,
    NATHWANI RA ET AL., HEPATOLOGY, (2005), vol. 41, pages 380 - 382,
    KORONES DN ET AL., AM. J. HEMATOL., (2001), vol. 66, pages 46 - 48,
    BRUIX J ET AL., J HEPATOL, (2001), vol. 35, pages 421 - 430,
    DANIELE B ET AL., GASTROENTEROLOGY, (2004), vol. 127, pages 108 - 12,
    GEBO KA ET AL., HEPATOLOGY, (2002), vol. 36, pages 84 - 92,
    KUTAY H ET AL., J CELL BIOCHEM, (2006), vol. 99, pages 671 - 678,
    GRAMANTIERI L ET AL., CANCER RESEARCH, (2007), vol. 67, pages 6092 - 6099,
    MENG F ET AL., GASTROENTEROLOGY, (2007), vol. 133, pages 647 - 658,
    VARNHOLT H ET AL., HEPATOLOGY, (2008), vol. 47, pages 1223 - 1232,
    URA S ET AL., HEPATOLOGY, (2009), vol. 49, pages 1098 - 1112,
    CHEN X-M, WORLD J GASTROENTEROL, (2009), vol. 15, pages 1665 - 1672,
    LEWIS AP, JOPLING CL: BIOCHEM. SOC. TRANS, (2010), vol. 38, pages 1553 - 1557,
    VANDESOMPELE J, GENOME BIOL, (2002), vol. 3,
    ANDERSEN CL ET AL., CANCER RESEARCH, (2004), vol. 64, pages 5245 - 5250,
    THERY C ET AL., Curr Protoc Cell Biol,
    MESTDAGH P ET AL., GENOME BIOL, (2009), vol. 10,
    VANDESOMPELE J; KUBISTA M, PFAFFL MW: REFERENCE GENE VALIDATION SOFTWARE FOR IMPROVED NORMALIZATION, (2008), pages 1 - 18,
    RANDALL G ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2007), vol. 104, pages 12884 - 12889,
    ARROYO JD ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2011), vol. 108, pages 5003 - 5008,
    CHANG J ET AL., RNA BIOL, (2004), vol. 1, pages 106 - 113,
    BERESFORD PJ, JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (2001), vol. 276, pages 43285 - 43293,
    CHOWDHURY D; LIEBERMAN J, ANNU REV IMMUNOL, (2008), vol. 26, pages 389 - 420,
    KRÜTZFELDT J ET AL., NATURE, (2005), vol. 438, pages 685 - 689,
    WANG K ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2009), vol. 106, pages 4402 - 4407,
    ZHANG Y ET AL., CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, (2010),
    STARKEY LEWIS PJ ET AL., HEPATOLOGY, (2011), vol. 54, pages 1767 - 1776,
    CERMELLI S ET AL., PLOS ONE, (2011), vol. 6, page 2393710.1371,
    GUI J ET AL., CLIN. SCI., (2011), vol. 120, pages 183 - 193,
    KROH EM ET AL., METHODS, (2010), vol. 50, pages 298 - 301,
    RACANELLI V ET AL., HEPATOLOGY, (2006), vol. 43, pages S54 - S62,
    ABRAHAM C; CHO JH, N ENGL J MED, (2009), vol. 361, pages 2066 - 2078,
    VALADI H ET AL., NAT CELL BIOL, (2007), vol. 9, pages 654 - 659,
    GIBBINGS DJ ET AL., NATURE, (2009), vol. 11, pages 1143 - 1149,
    GIBBINGS D ET AL., TRENDS CELL BIOL, (2010), vol. 20, pages 491 - 501,
    FORNARI F ET AL., CANCER RESEARCH, (2009), vol. 69, pages 5761 - 5767,
    COULOUARN C ET AL., ONCOGENE, (2009), vol. 28, pages 3526 - 3536,
    AFANASYEVA EA ET AL., CELL DEATH AND DIFFERENTIATION, (2011), vol. 18, pages 974 - 984,
    LIU Z ET AL., MOLECULAR CELL, (2008), vol. 29, pages 665 - 678,
    ZENG R ET AL., J PROTEOME RES, (2011),