blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2829613 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2829613



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 131
15.12.2015 Final instructions (application deemed to be withdrawn/application refused) Search / examination 1
04.09.2015 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of examination fee/designation fee/non-reply to Written Opinion) Search / examination 2
04.09.2015 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
02.02.2015 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
08.01.2015 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
06.12.2013 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
06.12.2013 Document annexed to the Extended European Search Report Search / examination 24
06.12.2013 European search opinion Search / examination 5
06.12.2013 European search report Search / examination 4
11.11.2013 Search started Search / examination 1
29.10.2013 Notice on debiting of fees Search / examination 1
09.10.2013 (Partial) set of drawings filed in response to formal objections Search / examination 1
09.10.2013 Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies Search / examination 1
07.10.2013 Note on telephone consultation Search / examination 1
02.10.2013 (Partial) set of drawings filed in response to formal objections Search / examination 6
02.10.2013 (Partial) set of drawings filed in response to formal objections Search / examination 6
02.10.2013 Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies Search / examination 1
07.08.2013 Deficiencies in application documents - annex C Search / examination 3
05.08.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
05.08.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
05.08.2013 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
26.07.2013 Abstract Search / examination 1
26.07.2013 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
26.07.2013 Claims Search / examination 2
26.07.2013 Converted Sequence Listing Search / examination 4
26.07.2013 Description Search / examination 35
26.07.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
26.07.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
26.07.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
26.07.2013 Drawings Search / examination 12
26.07.2013 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5