blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2829613


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
18.12.2015 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  20.01.2016  [2016/03]
05.09.2015 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
03.09.2015 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
28.01.2015 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  28.01.2015  [2015/05]
26.12.2014 Request for examination filed published on  28.01.2015  [2015/05]