blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2659861

EP2659861 - Handle for manipulating a catheter tip, catheter system and medical insertion system for inserting a self-expandable heart valve stent [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2013/45]Handle For Manipulating A Catheter Tip, Catheter System And Medical Insertion System For Inserting A Self-Expandable Heart Valve Stent
[2018/31]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  08.05.2024
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  08.02.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  01.07.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  05.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.05.2024Revocation of patentpublished on 12.06.2024 [2024/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
JenaValve Technology, Inc.
4 Cromwell
Irvine, CA 92618 / US
[2022/08]
Former [2016/16]For all designated states
JenaValve Technology, Inc.
7545 Irvine Center Drive, Suite 100
Irvine, CA 92618 / US
Former [2014/36]For all designated states
JenaValve Technology GmbH
Guerickestrasse 25
80805 München / DE
Former [2013/45]For all designated states
JenaValve Technology Inc.
Regus Business Centre Wilmington Downtown 1000 N. West Street, Suite 1200
Wilmington, DE 19801 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Straubinger, Helmut
Am Vogelacker 10 a
85609 Aschheim / DE
02 / Jung, Johannes
Im Oberdorf 13 a
75181 Pforzheim-Huchenfeld / DE
03 / Guyenot, Volker
Otto-Engau-Str. 4a
07749 Jena / DE
04 / Peschel, Thomas
Closewitzestr. 21
07743 Jena / DE
05 / Damm, Christoph
Schäfferstr. 6
07743 Jena / DE
 [2014/01]
Former [2013/45]01 / Straubinger, Helmut
Am Vogelacker 10 a
85609 Aschheim / DE
02 / Jung, Johannes
Im Speitel 103
76229 Karlsruhe / DE
03 / Guyenot, Volker
Otto-Engau-Str. 4a
07749 Jena / DE
04 / Peschel, Thomas
Closewitzestr. 21
07743 Jena / DE
05 / Damm, Christoph
Schäfferstr. 6
07743 Jena / DE
Representative(s)Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte
Postfach 10 26 05
86016 Augsburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2019/11]Trinks, Ole, et al
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 10 26 05
86016 Augsburg / DE
Former [2013/45]Trinks, Ole, et al
Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Depotstrasse 5 1/2
86199 Augsburg / DE
Application number, filing date13178309.412.05.2008
[2013/45]
Priority number, dateEP2007000972815.05.2007         Original published format: EP 07009728
US2007081209514.06.2007         Original published format: US 812095
EP2007011031814.06.2007         Original published format: EP 07110318
[2013/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2659861
Date:06.11.2013
Language:EN
[2013/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2659861
Date:13.03.2019
Language:EN
[2019/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.09.2013
ClassificationIPC:A61F2/95, A61F2/24
[2019/11]
CPC:
A61F2/2436 (EP,US); A61F2/2427 (US); A61F2/9517 (EP,US);
A61M25/0147 (EP,US); A61F2/2418 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2013/45]A61F2/24
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2013/45]
TitleGerman:Griff zur Manipulation einer Katheterspitze, Kathetersystem und medizinisches Einführsystem zum Einführen eines selbstexpandierbaren Herzklappenstents[2013/45]
English:Handle for manipulating a catheter tip, catheter system and medical insertion system for inserting a self-expandable heart valve stent[2018/31]
French:Poignée permettant de manipuler une pointe de cathéter, cathéter et système d'insertion médical permettant d'insérer une endoprothèse valvulaire cardiaque auto-dilatable[2013/45]
Former [2013/45]Handle For Manipulating A Catheter Tip, Catheter System And Medical Insertion System For Inserting A Self-Expandable Heart Valve Stent
Examination procedure29.07.2013Examination requested  [2013/45]
17.01.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.02.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.06.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.03.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.07.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.03.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.07.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.10.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.01.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.07.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.12.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
28.01.2019Fee for grant paid
28.01.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
28.01.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP08749437.3  / EP2150210
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20080749437) is  04.08.2011
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  13.12.2019  17.12.2019  ADMISSIBLE
Edwards Lifesciences Corporation, Law Department
One Edwards Way
Irvine, CA 92614 / US
Opponent's representative
Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
 [2020/04]
09.01.2020Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
29.05.2020Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
18.05.2021Date of oral proceedings
26.07.2021Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
26.07.2021Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
21.03.2024Legal effect of revocation of patent [2024/24]
24.04.2024Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition04.10.2021Appeal received No.  T1685/21
04.10.2021Payment of appeal fee
06.12.2021Statement of grounds filed
21.03.2024Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
24.04.2024Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal
21.09.2021Appeal received No.  T1685/21
21.09.2021Payment of appeal fee
03.12.2021Statement of grounds filed
21.03.2024Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
24.04.2024Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal
21.03.2024Date of oral proceedings
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent
28.01.2019Request for further processing filed
28.01.2019Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
08.02.2019Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
29.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
29.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
29.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
29.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
21.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
14.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
18.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
11.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 11
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU12.05.2008
AT13.03.2019
CY13.03.2019
CZ13.03.2019
DK13.03.2019
EE13.03.2019
ES13.03.2019
FI13.03.2019
HR13.03.2019
IT13.03.2019
LT13.03.2019
LV13.03.2019
MC13.03.2019
MT13.03.2019
NL13.03.2019
PL13.03.2019
RO13.03.2019
SE13.03.2019
SI13.03.2019
SK13.03.2019
TR13.03.2019
LU12.05.2019
BE31.05.2019
CH31.05.2019
LI31.05.2019
BG13.06.2019
NO13.06.2019
GR14.06.2019
IS13.07.2019
PT13.07.2019
[2021/34]
Former [2021/32]HU12.05.2008
AT13.03.2019
CY13.03.2019
CZ13.03.2019
DK13.03.2019
EE13.03.2019
ES13.03.2019
FI13.03.2019
HR13.03.2019
IT13.03.2019
LT13.03.2019
LV13.03.2019
MC13.03.2019
NL13.03.2019
PL13.03.2019
RO13.03.2019
SE13.03.2019
SI13.03.2019
SK13.03.2019
TR13.03.2019
LU12.05.2019
BE31.05.2019
CH31.05.2019
LI31.05.2019
BG13.06.2019
NO13.06.2019
GR14.06.2019
IS13.07.2019
PT13.07.2019
Former [2021/26]AT13.03.2019
CY13.03.2019
CZ13.03.2019
DK13.03.2019
EE13.03.2019
ES13.03.2019
FI13.03.2019
HR13.03.2019
IT13.03.2019
LT13.03.2019
LV13.03.2019
MC13.03.2019
NL13.03.2019
PL13.03.2019
RO13.03.2019
SE13.03.2019
SI13.03.2019
SK13.03.2019
TR13.03.2019
LU12.05.2019
BE31.05.2019
CH31.05.2019
LI31.05.2019
BG13.06.2019
NO13.06.2019
GR14.06.2019
IS13.07.2019
PT13.07.2019
Former [2020/26]AT13.03.2019
CZ13.03.2019
DK13.03.2019
EE13.03.2019
ES13.03.2019
FI13.03.2019
HR13.03.2019
IT13.03.2019
LT13.03.2019
LV13.03.2019
MC13.03.2019
NL13.03.2019
PL13.03.2019
RO13.03.2019
SE13.03.2019
SI13.03.2019
SK13.03.2019
TR13.03.2019
LU12.05.2019
BE31.05.2019
CH31.05.2019
LI31.05.2019
BG13.06.2019
NO13.06.2019
GR14.06.2019
IS13.07.2019
PT13.07.2019
Former [2020/17]AT13.03.2019
CZ13.03.2019
DK13.03.2019
EE13.03.2019
ES13.03.2019
FI13.03.2019
HR13.03.2019
IT13.03.2019
LT13.03.2019
LV13.03.2019
MC13.03.2019
NL13.03.2019
PL13.03.2019
RO13.03.2019
SE13.03.2019
SI13.03.2019
SK13.03.2019
TR13.03.2019
LU12.05.2019
CH31.05.2019
LI31.05.2019
BG13.06.2019
NO13.06.2019
GR14.06.2019
IS13.07.2019
PT13.07.2019
Former [2020/11]AT13.03.2019
CZ13.03.2019
DK13.03.2019
EE13.03.2019
ES13.03.2019
FI13.03.2019
HR13.03.2019
IT13.03.2019
LT13.03.2019
LV13.03.2019
MC13.03.2019
NL13.03.2019
PL13.03.2019
RO13.03.2019
SE13.03.2019
SI13.03.2019
SK13.03.2019
LU12.05.2019
CH31.05.2019
LI31.05.2019
BG13.06.2019
NO13.06.2019
GR14.06.2019
IS13.07.2019
PT13.07.2019
Former [2020/09]AT13.03.2019
CZ13.03.2019
DK13.03.2019
EE13.03.2019
ES13.03.2019
FI13.03.2019
HR13.03.2019
IT13.03.2019
LT13.03.2019
LV13.03.2019
MC13.03.2019
NL13.03.2019
PL13.03.2019
RO13.03.2019
SE13.03.2019
SK13.03.2019
BG13.06.2019
NO13.06.2019
GR14.06.2019
IS13.07.2019
PT13.07.2019
Former [2020/07]AT13.03.2019
CZ13.03.2019
EE13.03.2019
ES13.03.2019
FI13.03.2019
HR13.03.2019
IT13.03.2019
LT13.03.2019
LV13.03.2019
MC13.03.2019
NL13.03.2019
PL13.03.2019
RO13.03.2019
SE13.03.2019
SK13.03.2019
BG13.06.2019
NO13.06.2019
GR14.06.2019
IS13.07.2019
PT13.07.2019
Former [2020/04]AT13.03.2019
CZ13.03.2019
EE13.03.2019
ES13.03.2019
FI13.03.2019
HR13.03.2019
IT13.03.2019
LT13.03.2019
LV13.03.2019
NL13.03.2019
PL13.03.2019
RO13.03.2019
SE13.03.2019
SK13.03.2019
BG13.06.2019
NO13.06.2019
GR14.06.2019
IS13.07.2019
PT13.07.2019
Former [2020/03]AT13.03.2019
CZ13.03.2019
EE13.03.2019
ES13.03.2019
FI13.03.2019
HR13.03.2019
IT13.03.2019
LT13.03.2019
LV13.03.2019
NL13.03.2019
PL13.03.2019
RO13.03.2019
SE13.03.2019
SK13.03.2019
BG13.06.2019
NO13.06.2019
GR14.06.2019
PT13.07.2019
Former [2020/01]CZ13.03.2019
EE13.03.2019
ES13.03.2019
FI13.03.2019
HR13.03.2019
IT13.03.2019
LT13.03.2019
LV13.03.2019
NL13.03.2019
PL13.03.2019
RO13.03.2019
SE13.03.2019
SK13.03.2019
BG13.06.2019
NO13.06.2019
GR14.06.2019
PT13.07.2019
Former [2019/49]CZ13.03.2019
EE13.03.2019
ES13.03.2019
FI13.03.2019
HR13.03.2019
IT13.03.2019
LT13.03.2019
LV13.03.2019
NL13.03.2019
RO13.03.2019
SE13.03.2019
SK13.03.2019
BG13.06.2019
NO13.06.2019
GR14.06.2019
PT13.07.2019
Former [2019/48]ES13.03.2019
FI13.03.2019
HR13.03.2019
IT13.03.2019
LT13.03.2019
LV13.03.2019
NL13.03.2019
SE13.03.2019
BG13.06.2019
NO13.06.2019
GR14.06.2019
PT13.07.2019
Former [2019/47]ES13.03.2019
FI13.03.2019
HR13.03.2019
IT13.03.2019
LT13.03.2019
LV13.03.2019
NL13.03.2019
SE13.03.2019
BG13.06.2019
NO13.06.2019
GR14.06.2019
Former [2019/46]FI13.03.2019
HR13.03.2019
IT13.03.2019
LT13.03.2019
LV13.03.2019
NL13.03.2019
SE13.03.2019
BG13.06.2019
NO13.06.2019
GR14.06.2019
Former [2019/39]FI13.03.2019
HR13.03.2019
LT13.03.2019
LV13.03.2019
NL13.03.2019
SE13.03.2019
BG13.06.2019
NO13.06.2019
GR14.06.2019
Former [2019/38]FI13.03.2019
LT13.03.2019
SE13.03.2019
BG13.06.2019
NO13.06.2019
GR14.06.2019
Former [2019/37]FI13.03.2019
LT13.03.2019
SE13.03.2019
NO13.06.2019
GR14.06.2019
Former [2019/34]FI13.03.2019
LT13.03.2019
SE13.03.2019
NO13.06.2019
Former [2019/33]FI13.03.2019
LT13.03.2019
NO13.06.2019
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2004028399  (COOK INC [US], et al) [X] 1* the whole document *
by applicantWO2004019825
 EP20070110318
 WO2007EP61117
 EP20080151963
OppositionUS2002082584
 WO2004019825
 US2004127912
 WO2004082527
 WO2004103162
 WO2006065949
 US2006155363
 WO2006076890
 US2006173524
 WO2006127765
 WO2006138173
 US2007073389
    - "Endovascular options", Eric J. Topol, Textbook of Interventional Cardiology. 4TH ED., SAUNDERS, (20030000), pages 499-503, 949 - 953, XP055669675
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.