Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2693717

EP2693717 - System and method of high volume rule engine related applications [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.03.2016
Database last updated on 15.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Verint Systems Limited
33 Maskit Street Herzelia
Pituach / IL
[2014/06]
Inventor(s)01 / Goldfarb, Eithan
14 Lotus St.
Ness Ziona / IL
02 / Yitshak, Yishay
c/o Verint Systems Ltd
33 Maskit Street
Herzilia / IL
 [2014/06]
Representative(s)Bibby, William Mark , et al
Mathisen & Macara LLP
Communications House
South Street
Staines-upon-Thames
Middlesex, TW18 4PR / GB
[2014/06]
Application number, filing date13178332.629.07.2013
[2014/06]
Priority number, dateIL2012022117429.07.2012         Original published format: IL 22117412
IL2012022117729.07.2012         Original published format: IL 22117712
[2014/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2693717
Date:05.02.2014
Language:EN
[2014/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2693717
Date:06.05.2015
Language:EN
[2015/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.10.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/06
[2014/06]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/19]
Former [2014/06]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:System und Verfahren für Anwendungen in Bezug auf Regelmaschinen mit hohem Durchsatz[2014/06]
English:System and method of high volume rule engine related applications[2014/06]
French:Système et procédé d'applications liées à un moteur de règles à volume élevé[2014/06]
Examination procedure01.08.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/37]
09.12.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.03.2015Fee for grant paid
30.03.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.03.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.12.2014
Opposition(s)09.02.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/15]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU29.07.2013
AL06.05.2015
AT06.05.2015
BE06.05.2015
CY06.05.2015
CZ06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
IT06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
MC06.05.2015
MK06.05.2015
MT06.05.2015
NL06.05.2015
PL06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
SE06.05.2015
SI06.05.2015
SK06.05.2015
SM06.05.2015
TR06.05.2015
IE29.07.2015
LU29.07.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
[2018/46]
Former [2018/29]HU29.07.2013
AT06.05.2015
BE06.05.2015
CY06.05.2015
CZ06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
IT06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
MC06.05.2015
MK06.05.2015
MT06.05.2015
NL06.05.2015
PL06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
SE06.05.2015
SI06.05.2015
SK06.05.2015
SM06.05.2015
TR06.05.2015
IE29.07.2015
LU29.07.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
Former [2017/39]HU29.07.2013
AT06.05.2015
BE06.05.2015
CY06.05.2015
CZ06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
IT06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
MC06.05.2015
MT06.05.2015
NL06.05.2015
PL06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
SE06.05.2015
SI06.05.2015
SK06.05.2015
IE29.07.2015
LU29.07.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
Former [2017/22]AT06.05.2015
BE06.05.2015
CZ06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
IT06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
MC06.05.2015
MT06.05.2015
PL06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
SI06.05.2015
SK06.05.2015
IE29.07.2015
LU29.07.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
Former [2016/37]AT06.05.2015
BE06.05.2015
CZ06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
IT06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
MC06.05.2015
PL06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
SI06.05.2015
SK06.05.2015
IE29.07.2015
LU29.07.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
Former [2016/33]AT06.05.2015
CZ06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
IT06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
MC06.05.2015
PL06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
SI06.05.2015
SK06.05.2015
IE29.07.2015
LU29.07.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
Former [2016/24]AT06.05.2015
CZ06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
IT06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
MC06.05.2015
PL06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
SI06.05.2015
SK06.05.2015
LU29.07.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
Former [2016/21]AT06.05.2015
CZ06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
IT06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
MC06.05.2015
PL06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
SK06.05.2015
LU29.07.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
Former [2016/15]AT06.05.2015
CZ06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
MC06.05.2015
PL06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
SK06.05.2015
LU29.07.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
Former [2016/13]AT06.05.2015
CZ06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
MC06.05.2015
PL06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
SK06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
Former [2016/10]AT06.05.2015
CZ06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
PL06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
SK06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
Former [2016/09]AT06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
Former [2016/07]AT06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
Former [2015/51]AT06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
Former [2015/50]ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
Former [2015/49]ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
PT07.09.2015
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0909072  (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0044] * * figures 5A, 5B, 9 *;
 [A]EP1304849  (STONESOFT CORP [FI]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0035] * * figures 3-5, 6A, *
by applicantUS7139837
 US6857018
 US8005945
 US2011102157
 US2010195653
 US2009182867
 US2004095936
    - "Deep Packet Inspection using Parallel Bloom Filters", SARANG DHARMAPURIKAR; PRAVEEN KRISHNAMURTHY; TODD SPROULL; JOHN LOCKWOOD, Hot Interconnects, IEEE COMPUTER SOCIETY, (200401), pages 52 - 61