Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2696288

EP2696288 - Static tainting analysis system and method for taint analysis of computer program code [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/07]Static tainting analysis system and method for taint analysis of computer program code-lysis
[2017/42]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.08.2018
Database last updated on 19.02.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.09.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  30.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.03.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 10.04.2019  [2019/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Synopsys, Inc.
700 East Middlefield Road
Mountain View, CA 94043-4033 / US
[2015/04]
Former [2014/07]For all designated states
Coverity, Inc.
185 Berry Street
San Francisco, CA 94107-1750 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Scott, Roger H.
2409 River Oaks Drive
Lafayette, Indiana 47905 / US
02 / Chou, Andy C.
434 Kansas St.
San Francisco, California 94107 / US
 [2017/42]
Former [2014/07]01 / Scott, Roger H.
2409 River Oaks Drive
Lafayette, IN Indiana 47905 / US
02 / Chou, Andy C.
434 Kansas St.
San Francisco, CA California 94107 / US
Representative(s)Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Joachimsthaler Straße 10-12
10719 Berlin / DE
[2017/42]
Former [2014/07]Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Joachimstaler Strasse 12
10719 Berlin / DE
Application number, filing date13179799.508.08.2013
[2014/07]
Priority number, dateUS20121357002408.08.2012         Original published format: US201213570024
[2014/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2696288
Date:12.02.2014
Language:EN
[2014/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2696288
Date:18.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.01.2014
ClassificationInternational:G06F11/36
[2014/07]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/42]
Former [2014/07]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Statisches verderbendes Analysesystem und Verfahren der Verderbungsanalyse von Computerprogramm-Code[2017/42]
English:Static tainting analysis system and method for taint analysis of computer program code[2017/42]
French:Système d'analyse de teinture statique et procédé d'analyse de teinture d'altération statique système et code de programme informatique[2017/42]
Former [2014/07]Statisches verderbendes Analysesystem und Verfahren der Verderbungsanalyse von Computerprogramm-Codelyse
Former [2014/07]Static tainting analysis system and method for taint analysis of computer program code-lysis
Former [2014/07]Système d'analyse de teinture statique et procédé d'analyse de teinture d'altération statique système et code-lyse de programme informatique
Examination procedure08.08.2013Examination requested  [2014/07]
12.08.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.03.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.08.2017Fee for grant paid
03.08.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
03.08.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  31.03.2017
Opposition(s)19.07.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
11.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
14.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
IT18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
MC18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RO18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SI18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
[2019/15]
Former [2018/52]AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
IT18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RO18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SI18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/40]AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
IT18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RO18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/39]AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
IT18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/37]AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/35]AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/24]AT18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/22]ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
NO18.01.2018
Former [2018/17]NL18.10.2017
Documents cited:Search[A]US2010058475  (THUMMALAPENTA SURESH [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figure 4 * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0032] *;
 [A]US2012185943  (TRIPP OMER [IL]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0021] *
 [A]  - "ISO/IEC JTC 1/SC 22/WG 14 N 1624 Information Technology - Programming languages, their environments and system software interfaces - C Secure Coding Rules", ISO/IEC, INET, (20120626), pages 1 - 88, URL: http://www.open-std.org/jtc1/sc22/wg14/www/docs/n1624.pdf, (20131218), XP055094301 [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [4.15] * * paragraph [05.6] * * paragraph [5.10] - paragraph [5.11] * * page 81, paragraph 5.10 - page 81, paragraph 5.11 *
 [A]  - ASIA SLOWINSKA ET AL, "Pointless tainting?", PROCEEDINGS OF THE FOURTH ACM EUROPEAN CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER SYSTEMS, EUROSYS '09, New York, New York, USA, (20090101), doi:10.1145/1519065.1519073, ISBN 978-1-60-558482-9, page 61, XP055094302 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [03.2] * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [5.3.3] *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1519065.1519073
 [A]  - ASIA SLOWINSKA ET AL, "Pointer tainting still pointless", ACM SIGOPS OPERATING SYSTEMS REVIEW, (20100817), vol. 44, no. 3, doi:10.1145/1842733.1842748, ISSN 0163-5980, page 88, XP055094303 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [02.2] * * paragraph [0004] *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1842733.1842748