EP2664357 - Defibrillation shock strength determination technology [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.02.2016 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 10.01.2018 [2018/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Swerdlow, Charles D. 457 Kenter Avenue Los Angeles, CA 90049 / US | For all designated states Shivkumar, Kalyanam 919 Levering Avenue Los Angeles, CA / US | [2013/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2013/47] | Representative(s) | Laine IP Oy Porkkalankatu 24 00180 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2015/14] | Karvinen, Leena Maria Oy Jalo Ant-Wuorinen Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 4-6 A 00120 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2013/47] | Karvinen, Leena Maria Oy Jalo Ant-Wuorinen Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 4-6 A 00120 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 13180020.3 | 09.04.2003 | [2013/47] | Priority number, date | US20020372402P | 15.04.2002 Original published format: US 372402 P | US20030351143 | 27.01.2003 Original published format: US 351143 | [2013/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2664357 | Date: | 20.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2664357 | Date: | 01.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/39, // A61N1/05, A61N1/365 | [2013/47] | CPC: |
A61N1/3943 (EP,US);
A61N1/38 (EP,US);
A61N1/3987 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2013/47] | Title | German: | Defibrillationsschockstärkenbestimmungstechnik | [2013/47] | English: | Defibrillation shock strength determination technology | [2013/47] | French: | Technologie de détermination de la force de choc de défibrillation | [2013/47] | Examination procedure | 20.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/26] | 19.11.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.02.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03719679.7 / EP1515779 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030719679) is 18.04.2013 | Opposition(s) | 05.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.04.2003 | AT | 01.04.2015 | BE | 01.04.2015 | BG | 01.04.2015 | CY | 01.04.2015 | CZ | 01.04.2015 | DK | 01.04.2015 | EE | 01.04.2015 | ES | 01.04.2015 | FI | 01.04.2015 | IT | 01.04.2015 | MC | 01.04.2015 | NL | 01.04.2015 | RO | 01.04.2015 | SE | 01.04.2015 | SI | 01.04.2015 | SK | 01.04.2015 | TR | 01.04.2015 | IE | 09.04.2015 | LU | 09.04.2015 | CH | 30.04.2015 | LI | 30.04.2015 | GB | 01.07.2015 | GR | 02.07.2015 | PT | 03.08.2015 | [2018/02] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 09.04.2003 | |
AT | 01.04.2015 | ||
BE | 01.04.2015 | ||
BG | 01.04.2015 | ||
CY | 01.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
IT | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SE | 01.04.2015 | ||
SI | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
TR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IE | 09.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
GB | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/37] | AT | 01.04.2015 | |
BE | 01.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
IT | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SI | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
IE | 09.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
GB | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 01.04.2015 | |
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
IT | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SI | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
IE | 09.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
GB | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 01.04.2015 | |
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
IT | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
IE | 09.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
GB | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 01.04.2015 | |
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
IT | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
IE | 09.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | AT | 01.04.2015 | |
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
IT | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 01.04.2015 | |
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
IT | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | AT | 01.04.2015 | |
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
IT | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 01.04.2015 | |
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | AT | 01.04.2015 | |
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 01.04.2015 | |
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/42] | NL | 01.04.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US6246908 (CHATTIPAKORN NIPON [US], et al) [X] 1 * columns 3, 8-9; figures 2-5,7 * [I] 2-13; | [A]WO9856461 (SULZER INTERMEDICS INC [US]) [A] 2-13 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0473002 (CARDIAC PACEMAKERS INC [US], et al) [A] 2-13 * the whole document * | by applicant | US5531770 | US5105809 | US5346506 | US5954753 | US5564422 | - SWERDLOW CD; MARTIN DJ; KASS RM; DAVIE S; MANDEL WJ; GANG ES; CHEN PS, "The zone of vulnerability to T-wave shocks in humans", J CARDIOVASC ELECTROPHYSIOL, (1997), vol. 8, pages 145 - 54 | - SWERDLOW CD; MARTIN DJ; KASS RM; DAVIE S; MANDEL WJ; GANG ES; CHEN PS, "The Zone of Vulnerability to T-wave shocks in Humans", J CARDIOVASC ELECTROPHYSIOL., (1997), vol. 8, pages 145 - 54 | - SWERDLOW CD., "Implantation of cardioverter defibrillators without induction of ventricular fibrillation", CIRCULATION, (2001), vol. 103, pages 2159 - 64 |