Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2666867

EP2666867 - DNA encoding ring zinc-finger protein and the use of the DNA in vectors and bacteria and in plants [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  03.11.2015
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip31.07.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Board Of Trustees Of Michigan State University
450 Administration Building
East Lansing, Michigan 48824-1046 / US
[2014/01]
Former [2013/48]For all designated states
The Board Of Trustees Operating Michigan State University
2727 Alliance Drive
Lansing MI 48910 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Han, Kyung-Hwan
3595 Van Atta Road
Okemos, MI 48864 / US
02 / Ko, Jae-heung
3035-2b Trappers Cove Trail
Lansing, MI 48910 / US
 [2014/10]
Former [2013/52]01 / Han, Kyung-hwan
1640 Boulevard Drive
Okemos, MI 48864 / US
02 / Ko, Jae-heung
3035-2b Trappers Cove Trail
Lansing, MI 48910 / US
Representative(s)Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Partnerschaft mbB von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten
Postfach 13 03 91
20103 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/48]Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Partnerschaft mbB von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten
Rothenbaumchaussee 58
20148 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date13181042.612.07.2007
[2013/48]
Priority number, dateUS2006048494712.07.2006         Original published format: US 484947
[2013/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2666867
Date:27.11.2013
Language:EN
[2013/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.10.2013
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/82, A01H5/00
[2013/48]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2013/48]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:DNA zur RING-Zinkfingerprotein-Codierung und Verwendung der DNA in Vektoren und Bakterien sowie in Pflanzen[2013/48]
English:DNA encoding ring zinc-finger protein and the use of the DNA in vectors and bacteria and in plants[2013/48]
French:ADN codant la protéine du domaine RING et l'utilisation de l'ADN dans des vecteurs, des bactéries et des plantes[2013/48]
Examination procedure07.05.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/25]
01.07.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.10.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.11.2016Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 28.11.2016
28.11.2016Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
05.12.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination09.02.2017Appeal received No.  T1073/17
05.04.2017Statement of grounds filed
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP07810352.0  / EP2046962
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070810352) is  22.08.2011
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
20.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
20.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
20.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
20.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
28.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
27.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
27.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
27.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
27.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 12
29.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 13
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2004031349  (MENDEL BIOTECHNOLOGY INC [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * page109-110:"Plant size: Dwarfed plants";; sequence 376 *;
 [X]US2006107345  (ALEXANDROV NICKOLAI [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * sequence 27863 *;
 [Y]WO2004076638  (MENDEL BIOTECHNOLOGY INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * claims 1-41; sequences 1201, 178 *;
 [XP]US2007044171  (KOVALIC DAVID K [US], et al) [XP] 1-15 * claims 1-3; sequence 128125 *
 [X]  - "SubName: Full=Putative RING zinc finger protein; SubName: Full=T23O15.13;", UniProt, (20000501), Database accession no. Q9SI09, URL: EBI, XP002591597 [X] 1-15 * the whole document *
 [X]  - KO J-H ET AL, "Upregulation of an Arabidopsis RING-H2 Gene, XERICO, confers drought tolerance through increased abscisic acid biosynthesis", PLANT JOURNAL, BLACKWELL SCIENCE, OXFORD, GB, (20060101), vol. 47, doi:10.1111/J.1365-313X.2006.02782.X, ISSN 1365-313X, pages 343 - 355, XP008102321 [X] 1-15 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-313X.2006.02782.x
 [I]  - KATHERINE LB BORDEN ET AL, "The RING finger domain: a recent example of a sequence-structure family", CURRENT OPINION IN STRUCTURAL BIOLOGY, (19960601), vol. 6, no. 3, doi:10.1016/S0959-440X(96)80060-1, ISSN 0959-440X, pages 395 - 401, XP055083140 [I] 1-15 * figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0959-440X(96)80060-1
 [Y]  - MEHTAP SAHIN-CEVIK ET AL, "Isolation and characterization of a novel RING-H2 finger gene induced in response to cold and drought in the interfertile Citrus relative Poncirus trifoliata", PHYSIOLOGIA PLANTARUM, (20060101), vol. 126, no. 1, doi:10.1111/j.1399-3054.2005.00589.x, ISSN 0031-9317, pages 153 - 161, XP055083142 [Y] 1-15 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1399-3054.2005.00589.x
by applicantUS4683195
 US4683202
 US4965188
 US5352605
 WO9514098
 US5584807
 US6074859
 US5976796
 US5674713
 US5618682
 US5270163
 US5837458
 US5830721
 US5811238
 US5733731
 US5223409
 US5198346
 US5096815
 US5187267
 US5057422
 US5981839
 US6051757
 US5981840
 US5824877
 US4940838
 EP0116718
 WO8402913
 WO0200919
 WO0200920
 US5501967
 US5846795
 US5500360
 US5173410
 US5965794
 US5977438
 US5866785
 WO9307278
 US2004107463
 US2002102695
 US2002023280
 US2002160378
 US2004009476
 US2004078852
 US2004019927
 US2006021088
 US2006041961
 US2006041962
 US2002059663
 US2004045049
 US6670528
 WO0216655
 WO2004092398
 WO2004061122
 US2002019997
 US2002023279
 US5985666
 US2005028234
 WO03062455
 WO2004090141
 US2004091878
 US5451513
 US5545817
 US5545818
 WO9516783
 EP0292435
 US4945050
 EP0332581
 WO9413822
    - ZIMMERMANN ET AL., PLANT PHYSIOL., (2004), vol. 136, pages 2621 - 2632
    - KIPREOS; PAGANO, GENOME BIOL., (20001110), vol. 1, no. 5
    - THOMPSON ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1997), vol. 24, pages 4876 - 4882
    - KUMAR ET AL., BIOINFORMATICS, (2001), vol. 17, pages 1244 - 1245
    - CORPET, NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1988), vol. 16, no. 22, pages 10881 - 10890
    - SMITH; WATERMAN, ADV. APPL. MATH., (1981), vol. 2, page 482
    - NEEDLEMAN; WUNSCH, J. MOL. BIOL., (1970), vol. 48, page 443
    - PEARSON; LIPMAN, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. (U.S.A., (1988), vol. 85, page 2444
    - SAMBROOK ET AL., Molecular Cloning: A Laboratory Manual, 2.sup.nd ed.,, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS, (1989), pages 9.50 - 51,11.48
    - KACIAN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1972), vol. 69, pages 3038 - 3042
    - CHAMBERLIN ET AL., NATURE, (1970), vol. 228, page 227
    - WU; WALLACE, GENOMICS, (1989), vol. 4, page 560
    - MANIATIS ET AL., SCIENCE, (1987), vol. 236, page 1237
    - GARBARINO; BELKNAP, PLANT MOL. BIOL., (1994), vol. 24, pages 119 - 127
    - SAMBROOK ET AL., Molecular Cloning: A Laboratory Manual, 2.sup.nd ed.,, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS, (1989), pages 16.7 - 16.8
    - GRAHAM; VAN DER EB, VIROL, (1973), vol. 52, page 456
    - DEWET ET AL., MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1987), vol. 7, page 725
    - CARTHEW, CURR. OPIN. CELL BIOL., (2001), vol. 13, no. 2, pages 244 - 248
    - WESLEY ET AL., THE PLANT JOURNAL, (2001), vol. 27, no. 6, pages 581 - 590
    - SAMBROOK ET AL., Molecular Cloning: A Laboratory Manual, 2.sup.nd ed.,, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS, (1989), pages 9.31 - 9.58
    - HERSKOWITZ, NATURE, (1987), vol. 329, pages 219 - 222
    - LAGNA; HEMMATI-BRIVANLOU, CURR. TOPICS DEVEL. BIOL., (1998), vol. 36, pages 75 - 98
    - LAI ET AL., PLANT PHYSIOL., (2004), vol. 134, pages 1586 - 1597
    - LAITY ET AL., CURR. OPIN. STRUCT. BIOL., (2001), vol. 11, pages 9 - 46
    - FREEMONT ET AL., CELL, (1991), vol. 64, pages 483 - 484
    - FREEMONT, CURR. BIOL., (2000), vol. 10, pages R84 - 87
    - SAURIN ET AL., TRENDS BIOCHEM. SCI, (1996), vol. 21, pages 208 - 214
    - JOAZEIRO ET AL., SCIENCE, (1999), vol. 286, pages 309 - 312
    - FREEMONT, ANN. NY ACAD. SCI., (1993), vol. 684, pages 174 - 192
    - SAURIN ET AL., TRENDS BIOCHEM. SCI., (1996), vol. 21, pages 208 - 214
    - JENSEN ET AL., FEBS LETT., (1998), vol. 436, pages 283 - 287
    - DENG ET AL., CELL, (1992), vol. 71, pages 791 - 801
    - TORII ET AL., EMBO J., (1998), vol. 17, pages 5577 - 5587
    - SERRANO; GUZMAN, GENETICS, (2004), vol. 167, pages 919 - 929
    - XU; LI, PLANT MOL. BIOL., (2003), vol. 53, pages 37 - 50
    - MOLNÁR ET AL., PLANTA, (2002), vol. 215, pages 127 - 133
    - JOAZEIRO ET AL., SCIENCE, (1999), vol. 286, no. 5438, pages 309 - 312
    - JOAZEIRO; WEISSMAN, CELL, (2000), vol. 102, no. 5, pages 549 - 52
    - GRAY ET AL., PLANT CELL, (2002), vol. 14, pages 2137 - 2144
    - TAKAI ET AL., PLANT J., (2002), vol. 30, pages 447 - 455
    - MATSUDA ET AL., PLANT CELL PHYSIOL., (1998), vol. 39, pages 545 - 554
    - MATSUDA ET AL., J. CELL SCI., (2001), vol. 114, pages 1949 - 1957
    - TORII, EMBO J., (1998), vol. 17, pages 5577 - 5587
    - HARE ET AL., CURR. OPIN. PLANT BIOL., (2003), vol. 6, pages 453 - 462
    - VIERSTRA, TRENDS PLANT SCI., (2003), vol. 8, pages 135 - 142
    - DILL ET AL., CELL, (2004), vol. 16, pages 1392 - 1405
    - GAGNE ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2004), vol. 101, pages 6803 - 6808
    - DHARMASIRI ET AL., NATURE, (2005), vol. 435, pages 441 - 445
    - KOSHIBA, TRENDS PLANT SCI., (2002), vol. 7, pages 41 - 48
    - HIMMELBACH ET AL., CURR. OPIN. PLANT BIOL., (2003), vol. 6, pages 470 - 479
    - BLATT, ANNUAL REVIEW OF CELL AND DEVELOPMENTAL BIOLOGY, (2000), vol. 16, pages 221 - 241
    - OLOF, JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (2000), vol. 300, pages 1005 - 1016
    - WANG ET AL., PLANT SCI., (2004), vol. 166, no. 3, pages 609 - 616
    - WAHL, METH.ENZYMOL., (1987), vol. 152, pages 399 - 407
    - TRIGLIA ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1988), vol. 16, page 8186
    - LAGERSTROM, PCR METHODS APPLIC., (1991), vol. 1, pages 111 - 19
    - PARKER ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1991), vol. 19, pages 3055 - 60
    - LIU; WHITTIER, GENOMICS, (19950210), vol. 25, no. 3, pages 674 - 81
    - LIU ET AL., PLANT J., (199509), vol. 8, no. 3, pages 457 - 63
    - BACK; CHAPPELL, PNAS, (1996), vol. 93, pages 6841 - 6845
    - STRYER, Biochemistry, FREEMAN AND CO., (1981), pages 17 - 21
    - MOORE; ARNOLD, NAT BIOTECH., (1996), vol. 14, pages 458 - 67
    - LEUNG ET AL., TECHNIQUE, (1989), vol. 1, pages 11 - 15
    - ECKERT; KUNKEL, PCR METHODS APPL., (1991), vol. 1, pages 17 - 24
    - CALDWELL; JOYCE, PCR METHODS APPL., (1992), vol. 2, pages 28 - 33
    - ZHAO; ARNOLD, NUC. ACIDS. RES., (1997), vol. 25, pages 1307 - 08
    - SMITH, NATURE, (1994), vol. 370, pages 324 - 25
    - NARANG, TETRAHEDRON LETT., (1983), vol. 39, no. 1, pages 3 - 22
    - ITAKURA ET AL., Recombinant DNA, ELSEVIER, (1981), pages 273 - 289
    - ITAKURA; 1984, ANNU. REV. BIOCHEM., vol. 53, page 323
    - ITAKURA ET AL., SCIENCE, (1977), vol. 198, page 1056
    - IKE ET AL., NUCL. ACID RES., (1983), vol. 11, page 477
    - SCOTT ET AL., SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 249, pages 386 - 390
    - ROBERTS ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1992), vol. 89, pages 2429 - 2433
    - DEVLIN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 249, pages 404 - 406
    - CWIRLA ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1990), vol. 87, pages 6378 - 6382
    - BEN-BASSAT ET AL., J. BACTERIOL., (1987), vol. 169, pages 751 - 757
    - MILLER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1987), vol. 84, pages 2718 - 1722
    - EL-KHATIB ET AL., TREE PHYSIOL., (200407), vol. 24, no. 7, pages 729 - 36
    - SUN ET AL., SHENG WU GONG CHENG XUE BAO., (200207), vol. 18, pages 481 - 5
    - SAMBROOK ET AL., Molecular Cloning, A Laboratory Manual, COLD SPRING HARBOR PRESS
    - CHAO ET AL., PLANT PHYSIOL, (1999), vol. 120, pages 979 - 992
    - BEACHY ET AL., EMBO J., (1985), vol. 4, pages 3047 - 3053
    - ODELL ET AL., NATURE, (1985), vol. 313, page 810
    - ROSENBERG ET AL., GENE, (1987), vol. 56, page 125
    - GUERINEAU ET AL., MOL. GEN. GENET., (1991), vol. 262, page 141
    - PROUDFOOT, CELL, (1991), vol. 64, page 671
    - SANFACON ET AL., GENES DEV., (1991), vol. 5, page 141
    - MOGEN ET AL., PLANT CELL, (1990), vol. 2, page 1261
    - MUNROE ET AL., GENE, (1990), vol. 91, page 151
    - BALLAS ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1989), vol. 17, page 7891
    - JOSHI ET AL., NUCLEIC ACID RES., (1987), vol. 15, page 9627
    - MESSING; VIERRA, GENE, (1982), vol. 19, page 259
    - BEVAN ET AL., NATURE, (1983), vol. 304, page 184
    - WHITE ET AL., NUCL ACIDS RES., (1990), vol. 18, page 1062
    - SPENCER, THEOR. APPL. GENET., (1990), vol. 79, page 625
    - BLOCHLINGER; DIGGELMANN, MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1984), vol. 4, page 2929
    - BOUROUIS ET AL., EMBO J., (1983), vol. 2, page 1099
    - HERRERA-ESTRELLA, NATURE, (1983), vol. 303, pages 209 - 213
    - FRALEY ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI, USA, (1983), vol. 80, pages 4803 - 4807
    - HORSCH ET AL., SCIENCE, (1984), vol. 223, pages 496 - 498
    - DEBLOCK, EMBO J., (1984), vol. 3, pages 1681 - 1689
    - HINCHEE ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1988), vol. 6, page 915
    - ISHIDA ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1996), vol. 14, page 745
    - SCHELL, SCIENCE, (1987), vol. 237, page 1176
    - OOSUMI ET AL., PLANTA, (2005), pages 1 - 12
    - CAO ET AL., PLANT CELL REP, (1998), vol. 18, pages 266 - 270
    - BELLUCCI ET AL., PLANT CELL TISS ORG CULT, (2000), vol. 62, pages 141 - 151
    - GALILI ET AL., TRANSGENIC RES, (2000), vol. 9, pages 137 - 144
    - TRIEU ET AL., PLANT JOURNAL, (2000), vol. 22, pages 531 - 541
    - WANG ET AL., PLANT CELL REP, (2000), vol. 20, pages 213 - 219
    - CHAKRABORTY ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2000), vol. 97, pages 3724 - 3729
    - MAIMANN ET AL., PLANT JOURNAL, (2000), vol. 23, pages 747 - 758
    - VAN ROEKEL ET AL., PLANT CELL REP, (1993), vol. 12, pages 644 - 647
    - GUERCHE ET AL., MOL GEN GENET, (1990), vol. 221, pages 306 - 314
    - JAASKA, GENETIC RESOURCES & CROP EVOL, (1997), vol. 44, pages 557 - 574
    - MÜLLER ET AL., TRANSGENIC RES, (2001), vol. 10, pages 435 - 444
    - NIU ET AL., PLANT CELL REP, (2000), vol. 19, pages 304 - 310
    - UEMATSU ET AL., PLANT CELL REPORTS, (1991), vol. 10, pages 286 - 290
    - FITCH ET AL., PLANT CELL REPORTS, (1990), vol. 9, pages 189 - 194
    - VARDI ET AL., PLANT SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 69, pages 199 - 206
    - JAMES ET AL., Genetic Engineering of Crop Plants, BUTTERWORTHS, (1990), pages 239 - 248
    - NEHRA ET AL., PLANT CELL REPORTS, (1990), vol. 9, pages 10 - 13
    - MULLINS ET AL., BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (1990), vol. 8, pages 1041 - 1045
    - SERRES ET AL., J AMERICAN SOC. FOR HORTICULTURAL SCI., (1992), vol. 117, pages 174 - 180
    - HAMMERSLAG, J AMERICA SOC. FOR HORTICULTURAL SCI, (1988), vol. ILL, pages 164 - 166
    - MANTE ET AL., BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (1991), vol. 9, pages 853 - 857
    - PIEGEL-ROY ET AL., ZEITSCHRIFT FUR PFLANZENPHYSIOLOGIE, (1983), vol. 109, pages 41 - 48
    - SVAB ET AL., PNAS, (1990), vol. 87, page 8526
    - STAUB; MALIGA, PLANT CELL, (1992), vol. 4, page 39
    - STAUB; MALIGA, EMBO J., (1993), vol. 12, page 601
    - SVAB; MALIGA, PNAS, (1993), vol. 90, page 913
    - CROSSWAY, MOL. GEN. GENET, (1985), vol. 202, page 179
    - KRENS ET AL., NATURE, (1982), vol. 296, page 72
    - CROSSWAY ET AL., BIOTECHNIQUES, (1986), vol. 4, page 320
    - FRALEY, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., USA, (1982), vol. 79, page 1859
    - PASZKOWSKI ET AL., EMBO J., (1984), vol. 3, page 2717
    - HAYASHIMOTO ET AL., PLANT PHYSIOL., (1990), vol. 93, page 857
    - FROMM ET AL., PRO. NATL ACAD. SCI. USA, (1985), vol. 82, page 5824
    - RIGGS ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1986), vol. 83, page 5602
    - MCCABE ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1988), vol. 6, page 923
    - WEISSINGER ET AL., ANNUAL REV. GENET., (1988), vol. 22, page 421
    - SANFORD ET AL., PARTICULATE SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, (1987), vol. 5, page 27
    - SVAB ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1990), vol. 87, page 8526
    - CHRISTOU ET AL., PLANT PHYSIOL., (1988), vol. 87, page 671
    - MCCABE ET AL., BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (1988), vol. 6, page 923
    - KLEIN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1988), vol. 85, page 4305
    - KLEIN ET AL., BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (1988), vol. 6, page 559
    - KLEIN ET AL., PLANT PHYSIOL., (1988), vol. 91, page 4404
    - FROMM ET AL., BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (1990), vol. 8, page 833
    - GORDON-KAMM ET AL., PLANT CELL, (1990), vol. 2, page 603
    - KOZIEL ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1993), vol. 11, page 194
    - HILL ET AL., EUPHYTICA, (1995), vol. 85, page 119
    - KOZIEL ET AL., ANNALS OF THE NEW YORK ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, (1996), vol. 792, page 164
    - SHIMAMOTO ET AL., NATURE, (1989), vol. 338, page 274
    - CHRISTOU ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1991), vol. 9, page 957
    - DATTA ET AL., BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (1990), vol. 8, page 736
    - VASIL ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1993), vol. 11, page 1553
    - WEEKS ET AL., PLANT PHYSIOL., (1993), vol. 102, page 1077
    - WAN ET AL., PLANT PHYSIOL., (1994), vol. 104, page 37
    - JAHNE ET AL., THEOR. APPL. GENET., (1994), vol. 89, page 525
    - KNUDSEN; MULLER, PLANTA, (1991), vol. 185, page 330
    - UMBECK ET AL., BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (1987), vol. 5, page 263
    - CASAS ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, page 11212
    - SOMERS ET AL., BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (1992), vol. 10, page 1589
    - TORBERT, PLANT CELL REPORTS, (1995), vol. 14, page 635
    - WEEKS, PLANT PHYSIOL., (1993), vol. 102, page 1077
    - NEHRA ET AL., THE PLANT JOURNAL, (1994), vol. 5, page 285
    - EVANS ET AL., Handbook of Plant Cell Cultures, MACMILLAN PUBLISHING CO., (1983), vol. 1
    - VASIL I. R., Cell Culture and Somatic Cell Genetics of Plants, ACAD. PRESS, (1984), vol. I, III
    - XIANG ET AL., PLANT MOL BIOL., (1999), vol. 40, no. 4, pages 711 - 7
    - HAN ET AL., TRANSGENIC RESEARCH, (1997), vol. 6, pages 415 - 420
    - CLOUGH; BENT, PLANT J., (1998), vol. 16, pages 735 - 743
    - QIN; ZEEVAART, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1999), vol. 96, pages 15354 - 15361
    - CORNISH; ZEEVAART, PLANT PHYSIOL., (1984), vol. 76, pages 1029 - 1035
    - KO ET AL., PLANT PHYSIOL., (2004), vol. 135, pages 1069 - 1083
    - KO; HAN, PLANT MOL. BIOL., (2004), vol. 55, pages 433 - 453
    - HENNIG ET AL., PLANT MOL BIOL, (2003), vol. 53, pages 457 - 465
    - LIU ET AL., BIOINFORMATICS, (2002), vol. 18, pages 1593 - 1599
    - LOCKHART ET AL., NAT BIOTECHNOL, (1996), vol. 14, pages 1675 - 1680
    - MENGES ET AL., PLANT MOL BIOL, (2003), vol. 53, pages 423 - 442
    - REDMAN ET AL., PLANT J, (2004), vol. 38, pages 545 - 561
    - IUCHI ET AL., PLANT J., (2001), vol. 27, pages 325 - 333
    - KUSHIRO ET AL., EMBO J., (2004), vol. 23, pages 1647 - 1656
    - SAITO ET AL., PLANT PHYSIOL., (2004), vol. 134, pages 1439 - 1449
    - YAMAGUCHI-SHINOZAKI; SHINOZAKI, MOL. GEN. GENET., (1993), vol. 236, pages 331 - 340
    - TAN ET AL., PLANT J., (2003), vol. 35, pages 44 - 56
    - FINKELSTEIN ET AL., PLANT CELL, (2002), vol. 14, pages 15 - 45
    - QIN; ZEEVAART, PLANT PHYSIOL., (2002), vol. 128, pages 544 - 551
    - LECHNER, GENE, (2002), vol. 290, pages 63 - 71
    - TYERS; JORGENSEN, CURR. OPIN. GENET. DEV., (2000), vol. 10, pages 54 - 6
    - JOAZEIRO; WEISSMAN, CELL, (2000), vol. 102, pages 549 - 552
    - GRAY ET AL., GENES DEV., (1999), vol. 13, pages 1678 - 1691
    - DILL ET AL., PLANT CELL, (2004), vol. 16, pages 1392 - 1405
    - LAI ET AL., EMBO J., (2004), vol. 23, pages 1647 - 1656
    - YANG ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1999), vol. 96, pages 11416 - 11421
    - ZHAO ET AL., PLANT PHYSIOL., (2003), vol. 133, pages 203 - 217
    - BAI ET AL., CELL, (1996), vol. 86, pages 263 - 274
    - PICKART; EDDINS, BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (2004), vol. 1695, pages 55 - 72
    - TURK ET AL., PLANT PHYSIOL., (2003), vol. 133, pages 1643 - 1653
    - KIM ET AL., PLANT J., (2005), vol. 41, pages 710 - 721
    - MARTIN ET AL., PLANTA, (1996), vol. 200, pages 159 - 166
    - XIONG ET AL., DEV. CELL, (2001), vol. 1, pages 771 - 781
    - ZIMMERMANN ET AL., PLANT PHYSIO!, (2004), vol. 136, pages 2621 - 2632
    - FINKELSTEIN; GIBSON, CURR. OPIN. PLANT BIOL., (2002), vol. 5, pages 26 - 32
    - FEDOROFF, SCI STKE, (2002), page RE10
    - GAZZARRINI; MCCOURT, ANN. BOT. (LOND, (2003), vol. 91, pages 605 - 612
    - ROCK; SUN, PLANTA, (2005), vol. 222, pages 98 - 106
    - STATES ET AL., METHODS: A COMPANION TO METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, (199108), vol. 3, no. 1, pages 66 - 70
    - STATES ET AL., NAT. GENET., (1993), vol. 3, pages 266 - 72
    - ALTSCHUL ET AL., MOL. BIOL, (1990), vol. 215, pages 403 - 410