Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2816820

EP2816820 - Moving-magnet transducer [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.03.2016
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.03.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 27.04.2016  [2016/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Jetvox Acoustic Corp.
No. 22, Dalin Road
Taoyuan County
Taoyuan City / TW
[2014/52]
Inventor(s)01 / Huang, To-Teng
No. 22, Dalin Rd., Taoyuan County
Taoyuan City / TW
 [2014/52]
Representative(s)Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Kennedydamm 55 / Rossstrasse
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/52]Viering, Jentschura & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Kennedydamm 55 / Rossstrasse
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date13181320.622.08.2013
[2014/52]
Priority number, dateTW2013021159720.06.2013         Original published format: TW 102211597
[2014/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2816820
Date:24.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/52]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2816820
Date:29.04.2015
Language:EN
[2015/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.03.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04R11/02
[2014/52]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/52]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Wandler mit beweglichem Magnet[2014/52]
English:Moving-magnet transducer[2014/52]
French:Transducteur à aimant mobile[2014/52]
Examination procedure22.08.2013Examination requested  [2014/52]
30.10.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/17]
07.12.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2016/17]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.201503   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO2005027570  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1,2,15 * the whole document * [I] 3-14;
 [I]US2005123166  (CHEN LEE-LONG [TW], et al) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [I]US4000381  (PLICE GERALD W, et al) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [X]US2004156527  (STILES ENRIQUE M [US], et al) [X] 1,15 * the whole document *;
 [A]KR20080004956  (YEA IL ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [A]EP1441560  (WANG CHAO-LANG [TW]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2005090705  (CHO JIN H [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0548579  (TIBBETTS INDUSTRIES [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *