Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP2842620 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2842620



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 172
14.04.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
14.04.2020 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
14.04.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
08.04.2020 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
07.04.2020 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 9
07.04.2020 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
01.04.2020 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 7
12.03.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
12.03.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
12.03.2020 Withdrawal of an appeal Appeal 1
03.03.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
03.03.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
03.03.2020 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
31.01.2020 F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) Appeal 2
28.01.2020 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
23.01.2020 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
23.01.2020 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
20.12.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
20.12.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
20.12.2019 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
15.10.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
15.10.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
15.10.2019 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
28.08.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
28.08.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
28.08.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
16.08.2019 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
16.08.2019 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
16.08.2019 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 8
16.08.2019 Means of redress Search / examination 2
15.10.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
15.10.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
15.10.2018 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
23.08.2018 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
20.08.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
20.08.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
20.08.2018 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
18.04.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
18.04.2018 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
15.01.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
15.01.2018 Description Search / examination 1
15.01.2018 Drawings Search / examination 6
15.01.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
15.01.2018 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
14.12.2017 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
08.12.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
08.12.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
08.12.2017 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
21.11.2017 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 3
31.07.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
31.07.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
21.07.2017 Examination started Search / examination 1
02.09.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
02.09.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
02.09.2015 Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO Search / examination 3
09.03.2015 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
04.02.2015 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
19.02.2014 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
19.02.2014 European search opinion Search / examination 3
19.02.2014 European search report Search / examination 6
19.11.2013 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
19.11.2013 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
19.11.2013 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
19.11.2013 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
05.11.2013 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 2
05.11.2013 Partial European search report Search / examination 3
23.10.2013 Search started Search / examination 1
26.08.2013 Abstract Search / examination 1
26.08.2013 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
26.08.2013 Claims Search / examination 2
26.08.2013 Description Search / examination 29
26.08.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
26.08.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
26.08.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
26.08.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
26.08.2013 Drawings Search / examination 6
26.08.2013 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4