Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2703888

EP2703888 - A pellicle for EUV [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  08.02.2019
Database last updated on 18.06.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  18.11.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  01.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip08.02.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 13.03.2019  [2019/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd.
6-1, Otemachi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0004 / JP
[2014/10]
Inventor(s)01 / Yamada, Motoyuki
Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd.
13-1, Isobe 2-chome
Annaka-shi
Gunma Gunma 3790195 / JP
02 / Akiyama, Shoji
Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd.
13-1, Isobe 2-chome
Annaka-shi
Gunma Gunma 3790195 / JP
 [2019/11]
Former [2014/10]01 / Yamada, Motoyuki
Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd.
13-1, Isobe 2-chome
Annaka-shi, Gunma
Gunma Gunma 3790195 / JP
02 / Akiyama, Shoji
Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd.
13-1, Isobe 2-chome
Annaka-shi
Gunma Gunma 3790195 / JP
Representative(s)Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf
Candidplatz 15
81543 München / DE
[2019/11]
Former [2014/10]Solf, Alexander
Patentanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf Candidplatz 15
81543 München / DE
Application number, filing date13182570.502.09.2013
[2014/10]
Priority number, dateJP2012019308203.09.2012         Original published format: JP 2012193082
[2014/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2703888
Date:05.03.2014
Language:EN
[2014/10]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2703888
Date:27.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2703888
Date:13.03.2019
Language:EN
[2019/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:G03F1/00, G03F1/24, G03F1/62, G03F1/64
[2014/10]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/10]
TitleGerman:Pellikel für EUV Lithographie[2014/10]
English:A pellicle for EUV[2014/10]
French:Pellicule pour UV extrême[2014/10]
Examination procedure02.09.2013Date on which the examining division has become responsible
17.05.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.05.2018Examination requested  [2018/27]
19.11.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.01.2019Fee for grant paid
30.01.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.01.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.11.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
13.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
12.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
11.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XDA]EP2423747  (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [XD] 1-3 * abstract * * figures 1,2A,2B * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0061] * [A] 4;
 [YA]US2011063733  (YEO JONG-SOUK [US], et al) [Y] 1 * abstract * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0048] * * paragraphs [0023] - [0027]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0057] * [A] 2-4;
 [YA]US2008124633  (NAGAI SATOSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0009] , [0039] - [0047] * [A] 2-4