Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2709097

EP2709097 - Driving method and apparatus of liquid crystal display apparatus, and liquid crystal display apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  25.10.2019
Database last updated on 21.02.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  02.07.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  11.05.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  26.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 27.11.2019  [2019/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BOE Technology Group Co., Ltd.
No. 10 Jiuxianqiao Rd.
Chaoyang District
Beijing 100015 / CN
For all designated states
Hefei BOE Optoelectronics Technology Co., Ltd.
No. 2177, Tonglingbei Road
Hefei, Anhui 230012 / CN
[2019/48]
Former [2014/12]For all designated states
Boe Technology Group Co. Ltd.
No. 10 Jiuxianqiao Rd.
Chaoyang District
Beijing 100015 / CN
For all designated states
Hefei BOE Optoelectronics Technology Co., Ltd.
No. 2177 Tonglingbei Road
Hefei Anhui
230012 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / Lu, Haifeng
No. 9 Dize Rd., BDA
100176 Beijing / CN
02 / Li, Hengbin
No. 9 Dize Rd., BDA
100176 Beijing / CN
 [2014/12]
Representative(s)Klunker IP Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Destouchesstraße 68
80796 München / DE
[2019/48]
Former [2014/12]Höhfeld, Jochen
Klunker Schmitt-Nilson Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68
80796 München / DE
Application number, filing date13182700.802.09.2013
[2014/12]
Priority number, dateCN20121033949513.09.2012         Original published format: CN201210339495
[2014/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2709097
Date:19.03.2014
Language:EN
[2014/12]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2709097
Date:16.11.2016
Language:EN
[2016/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2709097
Date:27.11.2019
Language:EN
[2019/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.10.2016
ClassificationInternational:G09G3/36
[2014/12]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/26]
Former [2014/12]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Antriebsverfahren und -vorrichtung einer Flüssigkristallanzeigevorrichtung und Flüssigkristallanzeigevorrichtung[2014/12]
English:Driving method and apparatus of liquid crystal display apparatus, and liquid crystal display apparatus[2014/12]
French:Procédé et appareil de commande d'appareil d'affichage à cristaux liquides et appareil d'affichage à cristaux liquides[2014/12]
Examination procedure02.09.2013Date on which the examining division has become responsible
16.05.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.05.2017Examination requested  [2017/26]
09.05.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
29.06.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.07.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.10.2019Fee for grant paid
21.10.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.10.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.05.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
27.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
25.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
24.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2012062610  (TAI SHIHHSIN [TW], et al) [X] 1-7 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0020] * [I] 8-13;
 [A]US2010053147  (CHOI YUNG-SEOK [KR], et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraph [0055] *