Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2704257

EP2704257 - Antenna having three operating frequency bands and method for manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  10.08.2018
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  24.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.08.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 12.09.2018  [2018/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Arcadyan Technology Corp.
4F, No.9 Park Avenue II Science-Based Industrial Park
Hsinchu 300 / TW
[2014/10]
Inventor(s)01 / Huang, Chih-Yung
No.222, 1st Side St.
Dongshi Dist.
423 Taichung City / TW
02 / Lo, Kuo-Chang
No. 449, 4th Neighborhood
Xinglong Rd.
Toufen Township
351 Miaoli County / TW
03 / Fang, Jen-Hsiang
4F., No.10, Aly. 7, Ln. 298
Sec. 2, Guangfu Rd
East Dist.
300 Hsinchu City / TW
 [2014/10]
Representative(s)Bradl, Joachim , et al
Patentanwalt
Lorscher Strasse 24a
68519 Viernheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/10]Bradl, Joachim , et al
Patentanwalt
Schelmengrubweg 25
69198 Schriesheim / DE
Application number, filing date13182971.504.09.2013
[2014/10]
Priority number, dateTW2012013222104.09.2012         Original published format: TW 101132221
[2014/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2704257
Date:05.03.2014
Language:EN
[2014/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.01.2014
ClassificationInternational:H01Q1/24, H01Q5/00, H01Q9/04, H01Q9/40, H01Q9/42
[2014/10]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/10]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Antenne mit drei Frequenzbändern und entsprechendes Verfahren[2014/10]
English:Antenna having three operating frequency bands and method for manufacturing the same[2014/10]
French:Antenne à trois bandes de fréquences et méthode correspondante[2014/10]
Examination procedure05.09.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.09.2014Examination requested  [2014/42]
28.03.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.07.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.04.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/37]
04.05.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2018/37]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.03.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
15.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.201705   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2012050704  (QUALCOMM INC [US]; JENWATANAVET JATUPUM [US]; TRAN ALLEN MINH-TRIET [U) [X] 1-3 * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0065]; figure 7b *;
 [X]US2004104853  (CHEN PO-CHAO [TW]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0032]; figures 4-6 *;
 [A]JP2000068736  (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2003058168  (SADLER ROBERT A [US] ET AL) [A] 1 * the whole document *
by applicantTWI351787B
 TWI333715B
 US7256743
 US7242352