Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2706704

EP2706704 - Home appliance and online system including the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  29.01.2018
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GB
published on 20.11.2019  [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
LG Twin Towers
20, Yeouido-dong
Youngdungpo-gu
Seoul 150-721 / KR
[2015/14]
Former [2014/11]For all designated states
LG Electronics, Inc.
LG Twin Towers, 20, Yoido-dong, Youngdungpo-gu
Seoul 150-721 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Park, Junpil
LG Electronics Inc. IP Group, 391-2
Gaeumjeong-dong, Changwon-si
641-711 Gyeongnam / KR
02 / Ha, Mikyung
LG Electronics Inc. IP Group, 391-2
Gaeumjeong-dong, Changwon-si
641-711 Gyeongnam / KR
03 / Sung, Byunggee
LG Electronics Inc. IP Group, 391-2
Gaeumjeong-dong, Changwon-si
641-711 Gyeongnam / KR
 [2014/11]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/15]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [2014/11]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date13183129.905.09.2013
[2014/11]
Priority number, dateKR2012009894606.09.2012         Original published format: KR 20120098946
[2014/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2706704
Date:12.03.2014
Language:EN
[2014/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2706704
Date:08.04.2015
Language:EN
[2015/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.11.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/28
[2014/11]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/11]
TitleGerman:Haushaltsgerät und Onlinesystem[2014/46]
English:Home appliance and online system including the same[2014/11]
French:Appareil ménager et système en ligne comprenant celui-ci[2014/11]
Former [2014/11]Haushaltsgerät und Onlinesystem damit
Examination procedure04.10.2013Examination requested  [2014/11]
12.09.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.10.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.02.2015Fee for grant paid
23.02.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
23.02.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.10.2014
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  07.01.2016   
Dr. Jordan, Volker
Am Vogelherd 2a
82110 Germering / DE
Opponent's representative
Jordan, Volker Otto Wilhelm
Weickmann & Weickmann
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Postfach 860 820
81635 München / DE
 02  08.01.2016   
Electrolux Rothenburg GmbH Factory and Development
Fürther Strasse 246
90429 Nürnberg / DE
Opponent's representative
Schwan Schorer & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Bauerstrasse 22
80796 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2016/07]
Opponent(s)01  07.01.2016   
Dr. Jordan, Volker
Am Vogelherd 2a
82110 Germering / DE
Opponent's representative
Jordan, Volker Otto Wilhelm
Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 860 820
81635 München / DE
 02  08.01.2016   
Electrolux Rothenburg GmbH Factory and Development
Fürther Strasse 246
90429 Nürnberg / DE
Opponent's representative
Schwan Schorer & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Bauerstrasse 22
80796 München / DE
Former [2016/06]
Opponent(s)01  07.01.2016   
Dr. Jordan, Volker
Am Vogelherd 2a
82110 Germering / DE
Opponent's representative
Jordan, Volker Otto Wilhelm
Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 860 820
81635 München / DE
16.02.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
23.08.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
07.12.2017Date of oral proceedings
30.01.2018Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
30.01.2018Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition29.03.2018Appeal received No.  T0876/18
11.06.2018Statement of grounds filed
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU05.09.2013
AL08.04.2015
AT08.04.2015
BE08.04.2015
BG08.04.2015
CY08.04.2015
CZ08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
MC08.04.2015
MK08.04.2015
MT08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
RS08.04.2015
SE08.04.2015
SI08.04.2015
SK08.04.2015
SM08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
IE05.09.2015
LU05.09.2015
CH30.09.2016
LI30.09.2016
GB05.09.2018
[2019/47]
Former [2018/46]HU05.09.2013
AL08.04.2015
AT08.04.2015
BE08.04.2015
BG08.04.2015
CY08.04.2015
CZ08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
MC08.04.2015
MK08.04.2015
MT08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
RS08.04.2015
SE08.04.2015
SI08.04.2015
SK08.04.2015
SM08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
IE05.09.2015
LU05.09.2015
CH30.09.2016
LI30.09.2016
Former [2018/29]HU05.09.2013
AT08.04.2015
BE08.04.2015
BG08.04.2015
CY08.04.2015
CZ08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
MC08.04.2015
MK08.04.2015
MT08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
RS08.04.2015
SE08.04.2015
SI08.04.2015
SK08.04.2015
SM08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
IE05.09.2015
LU05.09.2015
CH30.09.2016
LI30.09.2016
Former [2017/39]HU05.09.2013
AT08.04.2015
BE08.04.2015
BG08.04.2015
CY08.04.2015
CZ08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
MC08.04.2015
MT08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
RS08.04.2015
SE08.04.2015
SI08.04.2015
SK08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
IE05.09.2015
LU05.09.2015
CH30.09.2016
LI30.09.2016
Former [2017/22]AT08.04.2015
BE08.04.2015
CZ08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
MC08.04.2015
MT08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
RS08.04.2015
SI08.04.2015
SK08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
IE05.09.2015
LU05.09.2015
Former [2016/37]AT08.04.2015
BE08.04.2015
CZ08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
MC08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
RS08.04.2015
SI08.04.2015
SK08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
IE05.09.2015
LU05.09.2015
Former [2016/33]AT08.04.2015
CZ08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
MC08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
RS08.04.2015
SI08.04.2015
SK08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
IE05.09.2015
LU05.09.2015
Former [2016/24]AT08.04.2015
CZ08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
MC08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
RS08.04.2015
SI08.04.2015
SK08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
LU05.09.2015
Former [2016/23]AT08.04.2015
CZ08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
MC08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
RS08.04.2015
SK08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
LU05.09.2015
Former [2016/21]AT08.04.2015
CZ08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
RS08.04.2015
SK08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
LU05.09.2015
Former [2016/10]AT08.04.2015
CZ08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
RS08.04.2015
SK08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
Former [2016/09]AT08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
RS08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
Former [2016/07]AT08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
RS08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
Former [2015/51]AT08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
RS08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
Former [2015/50]FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
RS08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
Former [2015/49]FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
RS08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
PT10.08.2015
Documents cited:Search[X]EP1233602  (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]) [X] 1-15 * page 6, paragraph 44 - page 7, paragraph 60 * * page 7, paragraph 64 - page 8, paragraph 72 * * page 10, paragraph 102 - page 13, paragraph 133 * * figures 1, 3, 4, 11, 13 *;
 [XP]WO2013015656  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [XP] 1-15 * page 9, paragraph 83 - page 15, paragraph 137 * * page 18, paragraph 167 - page 19, paragraph 183 * * page 34, paragraph 319 - page 37, paragraph 337 * * figures 2, 4, 5 *;
 [A]JP2003225491  (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [A] 1-15 * page 5, paragraph 47 - page 6, paragraph 51 * * page 8, paragraph 82 - page 10, paragraph 105 * * figures 1, 7, 9 *;
 [A]JP2005185460  (TOSHIBA CORP, et al) [A] 1-15 * page 3, paragraph 8 - page 4, paragraph 10 * * page 5, paragraph 16 - page 7, paragraph 29 * * figures 1, 3-6 *
OppositionEP1233602
 US7464426
 DE102010063083
 WO2013015656
 EP2737660
 JP2004350930
 EP1402101
 US2008224834
 US2002075160
 US2009195404
 US2009006970
 US3398460
 JP2003225491
 JP2005185460
    - "Smart Appliances Steal the Show at CES 2012", (20120121), URL: https://plassappliance.wordpress.com/ 2012/01/21 /smart-appliances-steal- the-show-at-ces-2012, XP055276526
    - "?Samsung rolls out smart appliances at CES 2012 (smart fridge, Android powered washer and dryer)", YouTube-Video screenshot, (20120114), URL: https://www.youtube.com/watch?v=ZAhiHY5KtXk, XP055276589