Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2807948

EP2807948 - Method for producing a toothbrush [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/49]Method for producing a toothbrush and toothbrush produced thereby
[2017/47]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.01.2019
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  09.02.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  26.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CH, LI
published on 02.10.2019  [2019/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Gillette Company LLC
One Gillette Park
Boston, MA 02127 / US
[2016/49]
Former [2014/49]For all designated states
The Gillette Company
One Gillette Park
Boston, MA 02127 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Bresselschmidt, Andreas
Braun GmbH
Frankfurter Strasse 145
61476 Kronberg/Taunus / DE
02 / Birk, Andreas
Braun GmbH
Frankfurter Strasse 145
61476 Kronberg/Taunus / DE
03 / Schulz, Holger
Braun GmbH
Frankfurter Strasse 145
61476 Kronberg/Taunus / DE
04 / Stegmann, Wolfgang
Braun GmbH
Frankfurter Strasse 145
61476 Kronberg/Taunus / DE
05 / Ganninger, Jochen
Braun GmbH
Frankfurter Strasse 145
61476 Kronberg/Taunus / DE
06 / Herzog, Karl
Marquardstraße 29
60489 Frankfurt a.M. / DE
07 / Reuschenbach, Andreas
Braun GmbH
Frankfurter Strasse 145
61476 Kronberg/Taunus / DE
08 / Jöst, Michael
Friedhofstrasse 6
63179 Obertshausen / DE
 [2014/49]
Representative(s)Töpert, Verena Clarita
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
IP Department
Sulzbacher Straße 40-50
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
[N/P]
Former [2018/11]Töpert, Verena Clarita
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
Patent Department
Frankfurter Str. 145
61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE
Former [2014/49]Joos, Uta Susanne
Braun GmbH
Patentabteilung
Frankfurter Straße 145
61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE
Application number, filing date13183147.105.09.2013
[2014/49]
Priority number, dateEP2013016970129.05.2013         Original published format: EP 13169701
[2014/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2807948
Date:03.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2807948
Date:14.03.2018
Language:EN
[2018/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.02.2014
ClassificationInternational:A46B9/04, A46D3/00, B29C45/16
[2014/49]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/34]
Former [2014/49]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Zahnbürste[2017/47]
English:Method for producing a toothbrush[2017/47]
French:Procédé pour produire une brosse à dents[2017/47]
Former [2014/49]Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Zahnbürste und dadurch hergestellte Zahnbürste
Former [2014/49]Method for producing a toothbrush and toothbrush produced thereby
Former [2014/49]Procédé pour produire une brosse à dents et brosse à dents ainsi produite
Examination procedure27.05.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.05.2015Examination requested  [2015/28]
10.07.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: designation fee not paid in time
27.10.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.01.2018Fee for grant paid
30.01.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.01.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.10.2017
Opposition(s)17.12.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2019/08]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees
TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL
14.07.2015Request for further processing filed
14.07.2015Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
28.07.2015Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
08.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
12.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL14.03.2018
AT14.03.2018
CY14.03.2018
CZ14.03.2018
DK14.03.2018
EE14.03.2018
ES14.03.2018
FI14.03.2018
HR14.03.2018
IT14.03.2018
LT14.03.2018
LV14.03.2018
MC14.03.2018
PL14.03.2018
RO14.03.2018
RS14.03.2018
SE14.03.2018
SI14.03.2018
SK14.03.2018
SM14.03.2018
BG14.06.2018
NO14.06.2018
GR15.06.2018
PT16.07.2018
IE05.09.2018
LU05.09.2018
BE30.09.2018
CH30.09.2018
LI30.09.2018
[2019/40]
Former [2019/38]AL14.03.2018
AT14.03.2018
CY14.03.2018
CZ14.03.2018
DK14.03.2018
EE14.03.2018
ES14.03.2018
FI14.03.2018
HR14.03.2018
IT14.03.2018
LT14.03.2018
LV14.03.2018
MC14.03.2018
PL14.03.2018
RO14.03.2018
RS14.03.2018
SE14.03.2018
SI14.03.2018
SK14.03.2018
SM14.03.2018
BG14.06.2018
NO14.06.2018
GR15.06.2018
PT16.07.2018
IE05.09.2018
LU05.09.2018
BE30.09.2018
Former [2019/33]AL14.03.2018
AT14.03.2018
CY14.03.2018
CZ14.03.2018
DK14.03.2018
EE14.03.2018
ES14.03.2018
FI14.03.2018
HR14.03.2018
IT14.03.2018
LT14.03.2018
LV14.03.2018
MC14.03.2018
PL14.03.2018
RO14.03.2018
RS14.03.2018
SE14.03.2018
SI14.03.2018
SK14.03.2018
SM14.03.2018
BG14.06.2018
NO14.06.2018
GR15.06.2018
PT16.07.2018
IE05.09.2018
LU05.09.2018
Former [2019/30]AL14.03.2018
AT14.03.2018
CY14.03.2018
CZ14.03.2018
DK14.03.2018
EE14.03.2018
ES14.03.2018
FI14.03.2018
HR14.03.2018
IT14.03.2018
LT14.03.2018
LV14.03.2018
MC14.03.2018
PL14.03.2018
RO14.03.2018
RS14.03.2018
SE14.03.2018
SI14.03.2018
SK14.03.2018
SM14.03.2018
BG14.06.2018
NO14.06.2018
GR15.06.2018
PT16.07.2018
LU05.09.2018
Former [2019/24]AL14.03.2018
AT14.03.2018
CY14.03.2018
CZ14.03.2018
DK14.03.2018
EE14.03.2018
ES14.03.2018
FI14.03.2018
HR14.03.2018
IT14.03.2018
LT14.03.2018
LV14.03.2018
MC14.03.2018
PL14.03.2018
RO14.03.2018
RS14.03.2018
SE14.03.2018
SI14.03.2018
SK14.03.2018
SM14.03.2018
BG14.06.2018
NO14.06.2018
GR15.06.2018
PT16.07.2018
Former [2019/13]AL14.03.2018
AT14.03.2018
CY14.03.2018
CZ14.03.2018
DK14.03.2018
EE14.03.2018
ES14.03.2018
FI14.03.2018
HR14.03.2018
IT14.03.2018
LT14.03.2018
LV14.03.2018
PL14.03.2018
RO14.03.2018
RS14.03.2018
SE14.03.2018
SI14.03.2018
SK14.03.2018
SM14.03.2018
BG14.06.2018
NO14.06.2018
GR15.06.2018
PT16.07.2018
Former [2019/08]AL14.03.2018
AT14.03.2018
CY14.03.2018
CZ14.03.2018
DK14.03.2018
EE14.03.2018
ES14.03.2018
FI14.03.2018
HR14.03.2018
IT14.03.2018
LT14.03.2018
LV14.03.2018
PL14.03.2018
RO14.03.2018
RS14.03.2018
SE14.03.2018
SK14.03.2018
SM14.03.2018
BG14.06.2018
NO14.06.2018
GR15.06.2018
PT16.07.2018
Former [2019/03]AL14.03.2018
AT14.03.2018
CY14.03.2018
CZ14.03.2018
EE14.03.2018
ES14.03.2018
FI14.03.2018
HR14.03.2018
IT14.03.2018
LT14.03.2018
LV14.03.2018
PL14.03.2018
RO14.03.2018
RS14.03.2018
SE14.03.2018
SK14.03.2018
SM14.03.2018
BG14.06.2018
NO14.06.2018
GR15.06.2018
PT16.07.2018
Former [2018/52]AL14.03.2018
AT14.03.2018
CY14.03.2018
CZ14.03.2018
EE14.03.2018
ES14.03.2018
FI14.03.2018
HR14.03.2018
IT14.03.2018
LT14.03.2018
LV14.03.2018
PL14.03.2018
RO14.03.2018
RS14.03.2018
SE14.03.2018
SK14.03.2018
SM14.03.2018
BG14.06.2018
NO14.06.2018
GR15.06.2018
Former [2018/50]AL14.03.2018
AT14.03.2018
CY14.03.2018
CZ14.03.2018
EE14.03.2018
ES14.03.2018
FI14.03.2018
HR14.03.2018
IT14.03.2018
LT14.03.2018
LV14.03.2018
PL14.03.2018
RO14.03.2018
RS14.03.2018
SE14.03.2018
SK14.03.2018
BG14.06.2018
NO14.06.2018
GR15.06.2018
Former [2018/47]AL14.03.2018
CY14.03.2018
ES14.03.2018
FI14.03.2018
HR14.03.2018
IT14.03.2018
LT14.03.2018
LV14.03.2018
RS14.03.2018
SE14.03.2018
BG14.06.2018
NO14.06.2018
GR15.06.2018
Former [2018/46]AL14.03.2018
CY14.03.2018
FI14.03.2018
HR14.03.2018
LT14.03.2018
LV14.03.2018
RS14.03.2018
SE14.03.2018
BG14.06.2018
NO14.06.2018
GR15.06.2018
Former [2018/40]CY14.03.2018
FI14.03.2018
HR14.03.2018
LT14.03.2018
LV14.03.2018
RS14.03.2018
SE14.03.2018
BG14.06.2018
NO14.06.2018
GR15.06.2018
Former [2018/37]CY14.03.2018
FI14.03.2018
HR14.03.2018
LT14.03.2018
NO14.06.2018
GR15.06.2018
Former [2018/35]CY14.03.2018
FI14.03.2018
HR14.03.2018
LT14.03.2018
NO14.06.2018
Documents cited:Search[XY]DE8814824U  (BLENDAX GMBH) [X] 15 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 2, paragraphs 3, 4, 5; figures 1, 2, 3 * [Y] 1-14;
 [YA]DE102009021482  (SCHIFFER FA M & C [DE]) [Y] 1-14 * paragraphs [0007] , [0 26] * [A] 15;
 [A]EP2077181  (PONZINI SPA [IT]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0013] , [0 53] , [0 82] *
by applicantEP1284618
 EP0602611