Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2674722

EP2674722 - Method of determining a deviation from expected jam conditions [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.04.2019
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  27.04.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  11.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip14.02.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 18.03.2020 [2020/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TomTom Traffic B.V.
De Ruijterkade 154
1011 AC Amsterdam / NL
[2017/02]
Former [2013/51]For all designated states
TomTom Development Germany GmbH
Maximilianallee 4
04129 Leipzig / DE
Inventor(s)01 / MIETH, Peter
Pflugerstr. 57
12047 Berlin / DE
02 / LORKOWSKI, Stefan
Germanenstraße 3
12 524 Berlin / DE
03 / SCHÄFER, Ralf-Peter
Minkwitzweg 25
12557 Berlin / DE
04 / WITTE, Nikolaus
Sonnenburgerstr. 58A
10 437 Berlin / DE
 [2013/51]
Representative(s)Siem, Max Yoe Shé
TomTom International B.V.
De Ruyterkade 154
1011 AC Amsterdam / NL
[2018/22]
Former [2013/51]Dobson, Adrian
TomTom International B.V.
IP Creation
De Ruyterkade 154
1011 AC Amsterdam / NL
Application number, filing date13183612.402.02.2012
[2013/51]
Priority number, dateUS201161439011P03.02.2011         Original published format: US 201161439011 P
GB2011001311229.07.2011         Original published format: GB 201113112
[2013/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2674722
Date:18.12.2013
Language:EN
[2013/51]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2674722
Date:10.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2674722
Date:30.05.2018
Language:EN
[2018/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.08.2014
ClassificationInternational:G01C21/32, G01C21/34, G08G1/01
[2013/51]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/22]
Former [2013/51]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Bestimmung einer Abweichung von erwarteten Blockierungsbedingungen[2013/51]
English:Method of determining a deviation from expected jam conditions[2013/51]
French:Procédé de détermination d'un écart par rapport à des conditions d'embouteillage attendues[2013/51]
Examination procedure10.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.03.2015Examination requested  [2015/16]
10.12.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.04.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.09.2017Date of oral proceedings
05.12.2017Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
12.12.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.04.2018Fee for grant paid
13.04.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
13.04.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP12704019.4  / EP2671048
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20120704019) is  31.07.2014
Opposition(s)01.03.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
23.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
22.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
17.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
14.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL30.05.2018
AT30.05.2018
CY30.05.2018
CZ30.05.2018
DK30.05.2018
EE30.05.2018
ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
IT30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
MC30.05.2018
PL30.05.2018
RO30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
SI30.05.2018
SK30.05.2018
SM30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
GR31.08.2018
IE02.02.2019
LU02.02.2019
BE28.02.2019
CH28.02.2019
LI28.02.2019
[2020/12]
Former [2020/09]AL30.05.2018
AT30.05.2018
CY30.05.2018
CZ30.05.2018
DK30.05.2018
EE30.05.2018
ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
IT30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
MC30.05.2018
PL30.05.2018
RO30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
SI30.05.2018
SK30.05.2018
SM30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
GR31.08.2018
IE02.02.2019
LU02.02.2019
CH28.02.2019
LI28.02.2019
Former [2020/04]AL30.05.2018
AT30.05.2018
CY30.05.2018
CZ30.05.2018
DK30.05.2018
EE30.05.2018
ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
IT30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
MC30.05.2018
PL30.05.2018
RO30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
SI30.05.2018
SK30.05.2018
SM30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
GR31.08.2018
LU02.02.2019
CH28.02.2019
LI28.02.2019
Former [2019/51]AL30.05.2018
AT30.05.2018
CY30.05.2018
CZ30.05.2018
DK30.05.2018
EE30.05.2018
ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
IT30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
MC30.05.2018
PL30.05.2018
RO30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
SI30.05.2018
SK30.05.2018
SM30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
GR31.08.2018
LU02.02.2019
Former [2019/47]AT30.05.2018
CY30.05.2018
CZ30.05.2018
DK30.05.2018
EE30.05.2018
ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
IT30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
MC30.05.2018
PL30.05.2018
RO30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
SI30.05.2018
SK30.05.2018
SM30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
GR31.08.2018
LU02.02.2019
Former [2019/45]AT30.05.2018
CY30.05.2018
CZ30.05.2018
DK30.05.2018
EE30.05.2018
ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
IT30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
MC30.05.2018
PL30.05.2018
RO30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
SI30.05.2018
SK30.05.2018
SM30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
GR31.08.2018
Former [2019/26]AT30.05.2018
CY30.05.2018
CZ30.05.2018
DK30.05.2018
EE30.05.2018
ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
IT30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
PL30.05.2018
RO30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
SI30.05.2018
SK30.05.2018
SM30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
GR31.08.2018
Former [2019/11]AT30.05.2018
CY30.05.2018
CZ30.05.2018
DK30.05.2018
EE30.05.2018
ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
IT30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
PL30.05.2018
RO30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
SK30.05.2018
SM30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
GR31.08.2018
Former [2019/10]AT30.05.2018
CY30.05.2018
CZ30.05.2018
DK30.05.2018
EE30.05.2018
ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
PL30.05.2018
RO30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
SK30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
GR31.08.2018
Former [2019/09]CY30.05.2018
DK30.05.2018
EE30.05.2018
ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
GR31.08.2018
Former [2019/08]CY30.05.2018
DK30.05.2018
ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
GR31.08.2018
Former [2018/52]CY30.05.2018
ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
GR31.08.2018
Former [2018/51]CY30.05.2018
ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
Former [2018/50]CY30.05.2018
ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
Former [2018/49]CY30.05.2018
ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
Former [2018/47]ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
NO30.08.2018
Documents cited:Search[I]EP1640691  (AISIN AW CO [JP]) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0031] , [0041] , [0047] , [0054] - [0056]; claims 1-9 *;
 [A]US5428545  (MAEGAWA SHOUITI [JP], et al) [A] 1,9,13-15 * column 24, line 34 - column 25, line 20; figure 29 *;
 [A]EP1736735  (AISIN AW CO [JP]) [A] 1,9,13-15 * paragraphs [0024] , [0046] , [0047] *;
 [A]EP2180456  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1,9,13-15 * paragraph [0045]; figure 6 *