Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2784378

EP2784378 - Solid state lighting device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.09.2015
Database last updated on 12.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.09.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 28.10.2015  [2015/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Toshiba Lighting & Technology Corporation
1-201-1 Funakoshi-cho
Yokosuka-shi, Kanagawa 237-8510 / JP
[2014/40]
Inventor(s)01 / Matsuba, Yoshiaki
c/o Toshiba Lighting & Technology Corporation
1-201-1, Funakoshi-cho
Yokosuka-shi
Kanagawa 237-8510 / JP
 [2014/40]
Representative(s)Bokinge, Ole
Awapatent AB
Junkersgatan 1
582 35 Linköping / SE
[2014/40]
Application number, filing date13183840.111.09.2013
[2014/40]
Priority number, dateJP2013006296325.03.2013         Original published format: JP 2013062963
[2014/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2784378
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/40]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2784378
Date:08.10.2014
[2014/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.09.2014
ClassificationInternational:F21V8/00
[2014/41]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/40]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Festkörperbeleuchtungsvorrichtung[2014/40]
English:Solid state lighting device[2014/40]
French:Dispositif d'éclairage à l'état solide[2014/40]
Examination procedure11.09.2013Examination requested  [2014/40]
09.04.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/44]
27.05.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2015/44]
Documents cited:Search[XY]US2006002678  (WEBER MICHAEL F [US] ET AL) [X] 1-5,7,8 * paragraphs [0002] , [0151] , [0064]; figures 13,11 * [Y] 6;
 [XY]US2006001036  (JACOB CHERIAN [US] ET AL) [X] 1,3,4 * paragraph [0030]; figure 2 * [Y] 6;
 [X]US2012140436  (YANG HAITAO [US] ET AL) [X] 1 * figure 14 *