Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2784378 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2784378



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 57
18.09.2015 Final instructions (application deemed to be withdrawn/application refused) Search / examination 1
27.05.2015 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of examination fee/designation fee/non-reply to Written Opinion) Search / examination 2
13.10.2014 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
05.09.2014 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
05.09.2014 European search opinion Search / examination 3
05.09.2014 European search report Search / examination 2
03.09.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
28.08.2014 Search started Search / examination 1
18.11.2013 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
13.11.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 16
11.09.2013 Abstract Search / examination 1
11.09.2013 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
11.09.2013 Claims Search / examination 2
11.09.2013 Description Search / examination 10
11.09.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
11.09.2013 Drawings Search / examination 6
11.09.2013 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4