Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2784378


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
25.09.2015 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  28.10.2015  [2015/44]
26.05.2015 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
01.10.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  01.10.2014  [2014/40]
05.09.2014 Publication of search report published on  08.10.2014  [2014/41]
05.09.2014 Change - classification published on  08.10.2014  [2014/41]
29.08.2014 Request for examination filed published on  01.10.2014  [2014/40]