Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2848488

EP2848488 - Method and arrangement for handover warning in a vehicle having autonomous driving capabilities [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  21.07.2017
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  21.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Volvo Car Corporation
40531 Göteborg / SE
[2015/12]
Inventor(s)01 / Davidsson, Staffan
Byggmästaregatan 5
42668 Västra Frölunda / SE
02 / Chen, Sicheng
Gibraltargatan 92
41279 GÖTEBORG / SE
 [2015/12]
Representative(s)Valea AB
Box 1098
405 23 Göteborg / SE
[N/P]
Former [2017/34]Volvo Car Corporation
405 31 Göteborg / SE
Former [2015/12]Kraenzmer, Martin , et al
Volvo Car Corporation
Intellectual Property
Dept 50094 HBBVN
405 31 Göteborg / SE
Application number, filing date13184098.512.09.2013
[2015/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2848488
Date:18.03.2015
Language:EN
[2015/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2848488
Date:23.08.2017
Language:EN
[2017/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.04.2014
ClassificationInternational:B60W50/14, B60K28/06, B60W50/08, B60W50/00
[2017/18]
Former International [2015/12]B60W50/14, B60K28/06, B60W50/08
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/44]
Former [2015/12]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Einrichtung zur Übergabewarnung in einem Fahrzeug mit autonomer Fahrfähigkeit[2015/12]
English:Method and arrangement for handover warning in a vehicle having autonomous driving capabilities[2015/12]
French:Procédé et agencement pour avertissement de transfert de commande dans un véhicule possédant des capacités de conduite autonome[2015/12]
Examination procedure20.05.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.09.2015Examination requested  [2015/44]
03.02.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.05.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.06.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.10.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.05.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.07.2017Fee for grant paid
05.07.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.07.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.02.2016
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  23.05.2018   
WABCO Europe BVBA
Chaussee de la Hulpe 166
1170 Brussels / BE
Opponent's representative
Lüdtke, Thomas
Advopat Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Theaterstraße 6
30159 Hannover / DE
 [2018/26]
13.07.2018Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
05.11.2018Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
23.06.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
30.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU12.09.2013
AT23.08.2017
CY23.08.2017
CZ23.08.2017
DK23.08.2017
EE23.08.2017
ES23.08.2017
FI23.08.2017
HR23.08.2017
IT23.08.2017
LT23.08.2017
LV23.08.2017
MC23.08.2017
MK23.08.2017
NL23.08.2017
PL23.08.2017
RO23.08.2017
RS23.08.2017
SI23.08.2017
SK23.08.2017
SM23.08.2017
IE12.09.2017
LU12.09.2017
MT12.09.2017
BE30.09.2017
CH30.09.2017
LI30.09.2017
FR23.10.2017
BG23.11.2017
NO23.11.2017
GR24.11.2017
IS23.12.2017
[2019/51]
Former [2019/47]HU12.09.2013
AT23.08.2017
CY23.08.2017
CZ23.08.2017
DK23.08.2017
EE23.08.2017
ES23.08.2017
FI23.08.2017
HR23.08.2017
IT23.08.2017
LT23.08.2017
LV23.08.2017
MC23.08.2017
NL23.08.2017
PL23.08.2017
RO23.08.2017
RS23.08.2017
SI23.08.2017
SK23.08.2017
SM23.08.2017
IE12.09.2017
LU12.09.2017
MT12.09.2017
BE30.09.2017
CH30.09.2017
LI30.09.2017
FR23.10.2017
BG23.11.2017
NO23.11.2017
GR24.11.2017
IS23.12.2017
Former [2019/31]HU12.09.2013
AT23.08.2017
CZ23.08.2017
DK23.08.2017
EE23.08.2017
ES23.08.2017
FI23.08.2017
HR23.08.2017
IT23.08.2017
LT23.08.2017
LV23.08.2017
MC23.08.2017
NL23.08.2017
PL23.08.2017
RO23.08.2017
RS23.08.2017
SI23.08.2017
SK23.08.2017
SM23.08.2017
IE12.09.2017
LU12.09.2017
MT12.09.2017
BE30.09.2017
CH30.09.2017
LI30.09.2017
FR23.10.2017
BG23.11.2017
NO23.11.2017
GR24.11.2017
IS23.12.2017
Former [2018/43]AT23.08.2017
CZ23.08.2017
DK23.08.2017
EE23.08.2017
ES23.08.2017
FI23.08.2017
HR23.08.2017
IT23.08.2017
LT23.08.2017
LV23.08.2017
MC23.08.2017
NL23.08.2017
PL23.08.2017
RO23.08.2017
RS23.08.2017
SI23.08.2017
SK23.08.2017
SM23.08.2017
IE12.09.2017
LU12.09.2017
MT12.09.2017
BE30.09.2017
CH30.09.2017
LI30.09.2017
FR23.10.2017
BG23.11.2017
NO23.11.2017
GR24.11.2017
IS23.12.2017
Former [2018/39]AT23.08.2017
CZ23.08.2017
DK23.08.2017
EE23.08.2017
ES23.08.2017
FI23.08.2017
HR23.08.2017
IT23.08.2017
LT23.08.2017
LV23.08.2017
MC23.08.2017
NL23.08.2017
PL23.08.2017
RO23.08.2017
RS23.08.2017
SI23.08.2017
SK23.08.2017
SM23.08.2017
IE12.09.2017
LU12.09.2017
BE30.09.2017
CH30.09.2017
LI30.09.2017
FR23.10.2017
BG23.11.2017
NO23.11.2017
GR24.11.2017
IS23.12.2017
Former [2018/36]AT23.08.2017
CZ23.08.2017
DK23.08.2017
EE23.08.2017
ES23.08.2017
FI23.08.2017
HR23.08.2017
IT23.08.2017
LT23.08.2017
LV23.08.2017
MC23.08.2017
NL23.08.2017
PL23.08.2017
RO23.08.2017
RS23.08.2017
SK23.08.2017
SM23.08.2017
IE12.09.2017
LU12.09.2017
BE30.09.2017
CH30.09.2017
LI30.09.2017
BG23.11.2017
NO23.11.2017
GR24.11.2017
IS23.12.2017
Former [2018/34]AT23.08.2017
CZ23.08.2017
DK23.08.2017
EE23.08.2017
ES23.08.2017
FI23.08.2017
HR23.08.2017
IT23.08.2017
LT23.08.2017
LV23.08.2017
MC23.08.2017
NL23.08.2017
PL23.08.2017
RO23.08.2017
RS23.08.2017
SK23.08.2017
SM23.08.2017
IE12.09.2017
LU12.09.2017
CH30.09.2017
LI30.09.2017
BG23.11.2017
NO23.11.2017
GR24.11.2017
IS23.12.2017
Former [2018/26]AT23.08.2017
CZ23.08.2017
DK23.08.2017
EE23.08.2017
ES23.08.2017
FI23.08.2017
HR23.08.2017
IT23.08.2017
LT23.08.2017
LV23.08.2017
MC23.08.2017
NL23.08.2017
PL23.08.2017
RO23.08.2017
RS23.08.2017
SK23.08.2017
SM23.08.2017
BG23.11.2017
NO23.11.2017
GR24.11.2017
IS23.12.2017
Former [2018/25]AT23.08.2017
CZ23.08.2017
DK23.08.2017
EE23.08.2017
ES23.08.2017
FI23.08.2017
HR23.08.2017
IT23.08.2017
LT23.08.2017
LV23.08.2017
NL23.08.2017
PL23.08.2017
RO23.08.2017
RS23.08.2017
SK23.08.2017
SM23.08.2017
BG23.11.2017
NO23.11.2017
GR24.11.2017
IS23.12.2017
Former [2018/21]AT23.08.2017
CZ23.08.2017
DK23.08.2017
ES23.08.2017
FI23.08.2017
HR23.08.2017
LT23.08.2017
LV23.08.2017
NL23.08.2017
PL23.08.2017
RS23.08.2017
BG23.11.2017
NO23.11.2017
GR24.11.2017
IS23.12.2017
Former [2018/12]AT23.08.2017
ES23.08.2017
FI23.08.2017
HR23.08.2017
LT23.08.2017
LV23.08.2017
NL23.08.2017
PL23.08.2017
RS23.08.2017
BG23.11.2017
NO23.11.2017
GR24.11.2017
IS23.12.2017
Former [2018/11]AT23.08.2017
ES23.08.2017
FI23.08.2017
HR23.08.2017
LT23.08.2017
NL23.08.2017
PL23.08.2017
RS23.08.2017
BG23.11.2017
NO23.11.2017
GR24.11.2017
IS23.12.2017
Former [2018/10]AT23.08.2017
FI23.08.2017
HR23.08.2017
LT23.08.2017
NL23.08.2017
RS23.08.2017
NO23.11.2017
Former [2018/08]FI23.08.2017
LT23.08.2017
NL23.08.2017
NO23.11.2017
Former [2018/07]LT23.08.2017
NO23.11.2017
Documents cited:Search[XY]DE102011082375  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,6,8-10 * paragraphs [0010] , [0 11] , [0 17] , [0 26] , [0 36] , [0 46]; figure -; claim - * [Y] 4,7;
 [XA]EP2314490  (AUDI AG [DE]) [X] 1,9,10 * paragraphs [0008] , [0 13] , [0 14] , [0 15] , [0022] , [0 27] , [0 28]; figure -; claim - * [A] 2-8;
 [Y]DE102011118551  (CONTINENTAL TEVES AG & CO OHG [DE]) [Y] 4 * paragraphs [0013] , [0 19] , [0 30] , [0 36]; figure -; claim - *;
 [A]DE102006039682  (AUDI AG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * abstract *;
 [Y]DE10024227  (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [Y] 7 * abstract *;
 [A]JPH1191397  (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-10 * abstract *
ExaminationUS2008065293
 US2005080565
by applicantUS8433470
OppositionDE102011082375
 EP2314490
 DE102011118551
 DE102006039682
 DE10024227
 JPH1191397
 US2008065293
 US2005080565
 US8433470
 DE102009050404
 DE102010022433
 US7639148
 DE10039795
    - Jens Gayko, "Chapter 34 - Lane Departure Warning", Jens Gayko, Winner et al., Handbuch Fahrerassistenzsysteme, (20090000), pages 543 - 553, XP055491595