Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2713481

EP2713481 - Method of manufacturing a rotor for electric motors and rotor manufactured using said method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  20.07.2018
Database last updated on 22.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2018New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mavel S.r.l.
Via Gressoney, 29
11026 Pont Saint Martin (AO) / IT
For all designated states
IFP Energies nouvelles
1 & 4 avenue de Bois-Préau
92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR
[2017/44]
Former [2015/09]For all designated states
Mavel S.r.l.
Via Gressoney, 29
11026 Pont Saint Martin (AO) / IT
For all designated states
IFP Energies nouvelles
1 & 4, avenue de Bois-Préau
92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR
Former [2014/14]For all designated states
Mavel S.r.l.
Via Gressoney, 29
11026 Pont Saint Martin (AO) / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Bettoni, Davide
Via Gressoney, 29
11026 PONT SAINT MARTIN AO / IT
02 / Bertoldo, Andrea
Via Gressoney, 29
11026 PONT SAINT MARTIN AO / IT
 [2014/14]
Representative(s)IFP Energies nouvelles
Département Propriété Industrielle
Rond Point de l'échangeur de Solaize
BP3
69360 Solaize / FR
[N/P]
Former [2014/14]Colombo, Stefano Paolo , et al
MARCHI & PARTNERS S.r.l. Via G.B. Pirelli, 19
20124 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date13184197.512.09.2013
[2014/14]
Priority number, dateIT2012MI0160626.09.2012         Original published format: IT MI20121606
[2014/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2713481
Date:02.04.2014
Language:EN
[2014/14]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2713481
Date:17.01.2018
Language:EN
[2018/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:H02K1/27, H02K15/03, H01F7/02, H01F41/02
[2018/03]
Former International [2014/14]H02K1/27, H02K15/03
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/34]
Former [2014/14]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Rotors für Elektromotoren und mit diesem Verfahren hergestellter Rotor[2014/14]
English:Method of manufacturing a rotor for electric motors and rotor manufactured using said method[2014/14]
French:Procédé de fabrication d'un rotor pour moteurs électriques et rotor fabriqué utilisant ce procédé[2014/14]
Examination procedure12.09.2013Date on which the examining division has become responsible
05.03.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.07.2018Examination requested  [2018/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
30.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
02.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
01.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XYI]GB2483967  (DYSON TECHNOLOGY LTD [GB]) [X] 1,4,8,10,11 * page 12, line 23 - page 13, line 3; figures 3,4 * [Y] 9 [I] 2,3;
 [Y]US2504824  (GEORGE EDGAR C) [Y] 9 * column 1, lines 53-57; figure 1 *;
 [A]US2008175978  (SCHUSTER JOHANN [DE], et al) [A] 5-7 * paragraphs [0007] , [0015] , [0016] *