Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2674487

EP2674487 - Large-scale production of soluble hyaluronidase [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  24.03.2015
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.10.2019Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Halozyme, Inc.
11388 Sorrento Valley Road
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
[2013/51]
Inventor(s)01 / Baker, David
12290 Summerbreeze Lane
San Diego, CA 92128 / US
02 / Bookbinder, Louis
14823 Gable Ridge Road
San Diego, CA 92128 / US
 [2013/51]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/51]Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date13184202.306.03.2009
[2013/51]
Priority number, dateUS20080068622P06.03.2008         Original published format: US 68622 P
[2013/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2674487
Date:18.12.2013
Language:EN
[2013/51]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2674487
Date:26.02.2014
Language:EN
[2014/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.01.2014
ClassificationInternational:C12N9/26
[2013/51]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2013/51]
Extension statesAL12.09.2013
BA12.09.2013
RS12.09.2013
TitleGerman:Massenfertigung von löslicher Hyaluronidase[2013/51]
English:Large-scale production of soluble hyaluronidase[2013/51]
French:Production à large échelle d'hyaluronidase soluble[2013/51]
Examination procedure12.09.2013Examination requested  [2013/51]
18.08.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.09.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.03.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.01.2016Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 29.01.2016
29.01.2016Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
01.02.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination01.04.2016Appeal received No.  T1471/16
02.06.2016Statement of grounds filed
24.01.2020Date of oral proceedings
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP09718114.3  / EP2268805
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20090718114) is  04.04.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
12.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
12.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
24.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
24.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
24.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
26.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 10
22.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[X]US2004268425  (BOOKBINDER LOUIS H [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * paragraphs [0369] - [0370] * * examples 7,8 *;
 [X]JP2007119384  (SANSHO SEIYAKU KK) [X] 1-14 * the whole document * * paragraph [0031] *
by applicantUS5292509
 US6745776
 WO8802261
 US2004268425
 US2005260186
 US2006104968
    - J BIOL. CHEM., (1969), vol. 243, pages 3552 - 3559
    - CARILLO, H.; LIPTON, D., SIAM J APPLIED MATH, (1988), vol. 48, page 1073
    - CARILLO ET AL., SIAM J APPLIED MATH, (1988), vol. 48, page 1073
    - PEARSON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1988), vol. 85, page 2444
    - DEVEREUX, J. ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (1984), vol. 12, no. 1, page 387
    - ATSCHUL, S.F. ET AL., J MOLEC BIOL, (1990), vol. 215, page 403
    - NEEDLEMAN ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1970), vol. 48, page 443
    - SMITH; WATERMAN, ADV. APPL. MATH., (1981), vol. 2, page 482
    - GRIBSKOV ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1986), vol. 14, page 6745
    - SCHWARTZ AND DAYHOFF,, ATLAS OF PROTEIN SEQUENCE AND STR UCTURE, NATIONAL BIOMEDICAL RESEARCH FOUNDATION, (1979), pages 353 - 358
    - BIOCHEM., (1972), vol. 11, page 1726
    - FROST ET AL., ANAL BIOCHEMISTRY, (1997), vol. 251, pages 263 - 269
    - DANILKOVITCH-MIAGKOVA ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA., (2003), vol. 100, no. 8, pages 4580 - 5
    - FROST ET AL., BIOCHEM BIOPHYS RES COMMUN., (1997), vol. 236, no. 1, pages 10 - 5
    - DUBENSKY ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1984), vol. 81, no. 23, pages 7529 - 33
    - FAVRE ET AL., GENE THERAPY, (2000), vol. 7, no. 16, pages 1417 - 20
    - NETTELBLADT ET AL., AM. REV. RESP. DIS., (1991), vol. 139, pages 759 - 762
    - WALDENSTROM ET AL., J. CLIN. INVEST., (1991), vol. 88, no. 5, pages 1622 - 1628
    - HA'LLGREN ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1990), vol. 171, pages 2063 - 2076
    - WELLS ET AL., TRANSPLANTATION, (1990), vol. 50, pages 240 - 243
    - WALLANDER ET AL., TRANSPLANT. INT., (1993), vol. 6, pages 133 - 137
    - HAELLGREN ET AL., J CLIN INVEST, (1990), vol. 185, pages 668 - 673
    - WALDENSTRDM ET AL., EUR. J. CLIN. INVEST., (1993), vol. 23, pages 277 - 282
    - DE MAEYER ET AL., INT. J. CANCER, (1992), vol. 51, pages 657 - 660
    - PAWLOWSKI ET AL., INT. J. CANCER, (1979), vol. 23, pages 105 - 109
    - ST CROIX ET AL., CANCER LETT, (199809), vol. 131, no. 1, pages 35 - 44
    - BAUMGARTNER ET AL., REG. CANCER TREAT., (1988), vol. 1, pages 55 - 58
    - ZANKER ET AL., PROC. AMER. ASSOC. CANCER RES., (1986), vol. 27, page 390
    - LAURENT ET AL., ACTA NEUROL SCAND, (199609), vol. 94, no. 3, pages 194 - 206
    - MACLEAN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1976), vol. 194, no. 4261, pages 199 - 200
    - KOLODGIE ET AL., ARTERIOSCLER THROMB VASC BIOL., (2002), vol. 22, no. 10, pages 1642 - 8
    - BJERMER ET AL., BR MED J (CLIN RES ED, (1987), vol. 295, no. 6602, pages 803 - 6
    - FEW ET AL., AMER. J. MATEM. CHILD NURS., (1987), vol. 12, pages 23 - 26
    - PAUL ET AL., J HAND SURG., (1997), vol. 22, no. 2, pages 219 - 21
    - ELDER ET AL., LANCET, (1980), pages 648 - 649
    - PRZYSIECKI ET AL., PNAS, (1987), vol. 84, pages 7856 - 7860
    - HARVEY ET AL., J BIOL CHEM, vol. 278, pages 8363 - 8369
    - MAUM ET AL., PROT SCI, vol. 14, pages 1171 - 1180
    - FROST; STERN, ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1997), vol. 251, pages 263 - 269
    - DELPECH ET AL., ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1995), vol. 229, pages 35 - 41
    - TAKAHASHI ET AL., ANAL. BIOCHEM., (2003), vol. 322, pages 257 - 263