Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2848584

EP2848584 - A connecting device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  12.02.2016
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.02.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 16.03.2016  [2016/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MICRO MATIC A/S
Holkebjergvej 48
5250 Odense SV / DK
[2015/12]
Inventor(s)01 / Larsen, Morten Helvig
Vibekevej 48
5250 Odense SV / DK
02 / Dahl, Benny
Torpvej 10
5260 Odense S / DK
 [2015/12]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Dragsted A/S
Rådhuspladsen 16
1550 Copenhagen V / DK
[2015/12]
Application number, filing date13184337.713.09.2013
[2015/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2848584
Date:18.03.2015
Language:EN
[2015/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.02.2014
ClassificationInternational:B67D7/02, B67D1/08
[2015/12]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/12]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verbindungsvorrichtung[2015/12]
English:A connecting device[2015/12]
French:Dispositif de connexion[2015/12]
Examination procedure13.09.2013Examination requested  [2015/12]
19.09.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/11]
02.11.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2016/11]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.201503   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2005247371  (CHADBOURNE RICHARD [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * paragraphs [0016] , [0 53] , [0 54] , [0 70] , [0 74] , [0 76] , [0 81] - [0083] - [0 88] * * figures 1, 4-11 *;
 [Y]WO2012166341  (CARRIER CORP [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * paragraph [0040]; figure 2 *;
 [XY]US4784299  (STENGER DONALD R [US]) [X] 13 * column 2, line 26 - line 41 * * column 3, line 1 - column 4, line 57 * * figures 5-8 * [Y] 9-11;
 [A]USRE32354E  (CHESTER SAVAGE) [A] 1,12 * figures 1, 2 *