Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
06.03.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] |
18.11.2019 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
06.11.2019 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
22.05.2019 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
24.09.2018 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
03.10.2017 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
25.09.2017 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
25.07.2017 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
29.03.2017 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
17.03.2017 | First examination report | |
28.09.2016 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
28.09.2015 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
25.09.2015 | Change - designated states | published on 28.10.2015 [2015/44] |
25.09.2015 | Change - request for examination | published on 28.10.2015 [2015/44] |
21.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant | |
17.03.2015 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 18.03.2015 [2015/12] |
13.02.2015 | Request for examination filed | published on 18.03.2015 [2015/12] |